Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB759 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

                     	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 705 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 705 
(House Bill 759) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services – Sexual 
Assault Evidence Collection Kit Reporting Program 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim 
Services to establish and administer a certain reporting program relating to sexual 
assault evidence collection kits; requiring a law enforcement agency and a person 
with control or possession of a sexual assault evidence collection kit to report certain 
information to the program and comply with certain regulations; clarifying the uses 
for the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund; and generally relating to a sexual assault 
evidence collection kit reporting program.  
 
BY adding to 
 Article – Criminal Procedure 
Section 11–926.1 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – Public Safety 
Section 4–401 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2022 Replacement Volume) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Criminal Procedure 
 
11–926.1. 
 
 (A) (1) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 
VICTIM SERVICES SHALL ESTABL ISH AND ADMINISTER A REPORTING PROGRAM FO R 
TRACKING THE LOCATIO N, STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY FOR SEXUAL ASSAULT 
EVIDENCE COLLECTION KITS.  
 
 (2) THE REPORTING PROGRAM SHALL: 
 
 (I) TRACK THE LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF 
SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KITS IN THE STATE;  
  Ch. 705 	2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 (II) RECEIVE INFORMATION RELATING TO THE LOCA TION, 
STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY FROM ANY LAW ENFORCE MENT AGENCY OR 
PERSON WITH CONTROL OR POSSESSION OF A S EXUAL ASSAULT EVIDEN CE 
COLLECTION KIT ; AND 
 
 (III) ALLOW FOR A VICTIM O R A VICTIM’S REPRESENTATIVE TO 
TRACK THE LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT 
EVIDENCE COLLECTION KIT CONTAINING SAMPL ES TAKEN FROM THE VICTIM. 
 
 (3) (I) INFORMATION CONTAINED IN THE REPORTING SYS TEM IS 
NOT OPEN TO PUBLIC I NSPECTION. 
 
 (II) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 
YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES MAY DISCLOSE INFORMATION CONTAINE D IN THE 
REPORTING SYSTEM ONL Y TO: 
 
 1. THE VICTIM ABOUT WHOM 	THE INFORMATION 
PERTAINS;  
 
 2. A VICTIM’S REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE VICTIM ABOUT 
WHOM THE INFORMATION PERTAINS;  
 
 3. A SEXUAL ASSAULT CRI SIS PROGRAM ESTABLIS HED 
UNDER § 11–923 OF THIS SUBTITLE; 
 
 4. A CHILD ADVOCACY CEN TER ESTABLISHED UNDER § 
11–928 OF THIS SUBTITLE ;  
 
 5. A LAW ENFORCEMENT AG ENCY;  
 
 6. A STATE’S ATTORNEY;  
 
 7. A PERSON AUTHORIZED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE 
OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES TO RECEIVE T HE 
INFORMATION ; OR 
 
 8. A PERSON EN TITLED TO RECEIVE TH E INFORMATION 
BY FEDERAL OR STATE LAW, SUBPOENA, COURT RULE, OR COURT ORDER .  
 
 (B) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , BEGINNING 
OCTOBER 1, 2023, A LAW ENFORCEMENT AG ENCY OR ANY PERSON , INCLUDING A 
HEALTH CARE PROVIDER , FORENSIC LABORATORY , OR STATE’S ATTORNEY, THAT   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 705 
 
– 3 – 
HAS CONTROL OR POSSE SSION OF A SEXUAL AS SAULT EVIDENCE COLLE CTION KIT 
SHALL: 
 
 (I) REPORT LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY 
INFORMATION TO THE R EPORTING PROGRAM EST ABLISHED UNDER THIS SECTION 
IN A MANNER REQUIRED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 
YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES; AND 
 
 (II) COMPLY WITH ALL REGU LATIONS DEVELOPED BY THE 
GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES 
UNDER THIS SECTION .  
 
 (2) A LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY OR A PERSON , INCLUDING A 
HEALTH CARE PROVIDER , FORENSIC LABORATORY , OR STATE’S ATTORNEY, THAT 
HAD CONTROL OR POSSE SSION OF A SEXUAL AS SAULT EVIDENCE COLLE CTION KIT 
BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, AND HAS CONTROL OR P OSSESSION OF THE SEX UAL 
ASSAULT EVIDENCE COLLECTION KIT ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2023, SHALL 
REPORT LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY INFORMATION TO THE 
REPORTING PROGRAM ES TABLISHED UNDER THIS SECTION ON OR BEFORE 
DECEMBER 31, 2025. 
 
 (C) (1) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 
VICTIM SERVICES, IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MARYLAND SEXUAL ASSAULT 
EVIDENCE KIT POLICY AND FUNDING COMMITTEE, SHALL ADOPT ANY 
REGULATIONS NECESSAR Y TO CARRY OUT THIS SECTION.  
 
 (2) REGULATIONS ADOPTED B Y THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME 
PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES IN ACCORDANC E WITH THIS SECTION 
SHALL INCLUDE : 
 
 (I) REQUIREMENTS FOR REP ORTING THE LOCATION AND 
CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT EVI DENCE COLLECTION KIT TO THE 
PROGRAM ESTABLISHED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 
YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES UNDER THIS S ECTION; AND 
 
 (II) PROCEDURES FOR DISCL OSING INFORMATION AB OUT 
SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KITS INCLUDED IN THE REPO RTING 
PROGRAM, INCLUDING DISCLOSURE TO PARTIES AUTHORIZE D TO RECEIVE 
INFORMATION CONTAINE D IN THE REPORTING SYST EM.  
 
Article – Public Safety 
 
4–401.  Ch. 705 	2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 
 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 
 
 (2) “Forensic laboratory” means a facility, an entity, or a site that offers or 
performs forensic analysis and is owned or operated by the State, a county or municipal 
corporation in the State, or another governmental entity. 
 
 (3) “Fund” means the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund. 
 
 (4) “Law enforcement agency” means the Department of State Police or a 
police department of a county or municipal corporation in the State. 
 
 (b) There is a Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund. 
 
 (c) The purpose of the Fund is to provide law enforcement agencies with funding 
to pay for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits by forensic laboratories. 
 
 (d) The Executive Director of the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, 
and Victim Services shall: 
 
 (1) administer the Fund; 
 
 (2) establish and publish procedures for the distribution of funding to law 
enforcement agencies; 
 
 (3) ensure each jurisdiction in the State that has a forensic laboratory is 
able to access the Fund; 
 
 (4) consider the number of sexual assault incidents that were investigated 
by a law enforcement agency in the prior fiscal year when distributing funding; and 
 
 (5) submit a report with information on the distribution of funding to the 
General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, before 
September 1 each year. 
 
 (e) (1) The Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund that is not subject to § 7–302 of 
the State Finance and Procurement Article. 
 
 (2) The State Treasurer shall hold the Fund separately, and the 
Comptroller shall account for the Fund. 
 
 (f) The Fund consists of: 
 
 (1) money appropriated in the State budget to the Fund; 
 
 (2) any interest earnings of the Fund; and   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 705 
 
– 5 – 
 
 (3) any other money from any other source accepted for the benefit of the 
Fund. 
 
 (g) (1) The Fund may be used only for equipment, supplies, personnel, and 
outsourcing necessary for the testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits in forensic 
laboratories. 
 
 (2) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE FUND 
MAY BE USED FOR EQUI PMENT, SUPPLIES, PERSONNEL, AND OUTSOURCING 
NECESSARY FOR THE TE STING OF SEXUAL ASSA ULT EVIDENCE COLLECT ION KITS 
COLLECTED BEFORE OR AFTER THE ESTABLISHM ENT OF THE FUND.  
 
 (h) (1) The State Treasurer shall invest the money of the Fund in the same 
manner as other State money may be invested. 
 
 (2) Any interest earnings of the Fund, including interest earnings under 
subsection (f) of this section, shall be credited to the Fund. 
 
 (i) Expenditures from the Fund may be made only in accordance with the State 
budget. 
 
 (j) Money expended from the Fund for testing of sexual assault evidence 
collection kits is supplemental to and is not intended to take the place of funding that 
otherwise would be appropriated for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
October 1, 2023. 
 
Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2023.