Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB115 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/15/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0115*  
  
SENATE BILL 115 
E3, D1, P1   	3lr0847 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 749 
By: Senator Jackson 
Requested: November 16, 2022 
Introduced and read first time: January 11, 2023 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 15, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Juvenile Court – Concurrent Jurisdiction – Juvenile Offenses on Military 2 
Installations 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing that the jurisdiction of the juvenile court is concurrent 4 
with that of a federal court sitting in the State over certain proceedings involving 5 
violations of federal law by a child under certain circumstances; and generally 6 
relating to the concurrent jurisdiction of the United States and the State over 7 
juvenile offenses.   8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 10 
Section 3–8A–03(a) and (b) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 15 
Section 3–8A–03(c) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 18 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 19 
 Article – General Provisions 20 
Section 6–202 21  2 	SENATE BILL 115  
 
 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 1 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 2 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 3 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 4 
 
Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 5 
 
3–8A–03. 6 
 
 (a) In addition to the jurisdiction specified in Subtitle 8 of this title, the court has 7 
exclusive original jurisdiction over: 8 
 
 (1) A child: 9 
 
 (i) Who is at least 13 years old alleged to be delinquent; or 10 
 
 (ii) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section, who is at least 11 
10 years old alleged to have committed an act: 12 
 
 1. That, if committed by an adult, would constitute a crime 13 
of violence, as defined in § 14–101 of the Criminal Law Article; or 14 
 
 2. Arising out of the same incident as an act listed in item 1 15 
of this item; 16 
 
 (2) A child who is in need of supervision; 17 
 
 (3) A child who has received a citation for a violation; 18 
 
 (4) Except as provided in subsection (d)(6) of this section, a peace order 19 
proceeding in which the respondent is a child; and 20 
 
 (5) Proceedings arising under the Interstate Compact on Juveniles. 21 
 
 (b) The court has concurrent jurisdiction over proceedings against an adult for 22 
the violation of § 3–8A–30 of this subtitle. However, the court may waive its jurisdiction 23 
under this subsection upon its own motion or upon the motion of any party to the 24 
proceeding, if charges against the adult arising from the same incident are pending in the 25 
criminal court. Upon motion by either the State’s Attorney or the adult charged under §  26 
3–8A–30 of this subtitle, the court shall waive its jurisdiction, and the adult shall be tried 27 
in the criminal court according to the usual criminal procedure. 28 
 
 (c) (1) The jurisdiction of the court is concurrent with that of the District Court 29 
in any criminal case arising under the compulsory public school attendance laws of this 30 
State. 31 
   	SENATE BILL 115 	3 
 
 
 (2) THE JURISDICTION OF T HE COURT IS CONCURRE NT WITH THAT 1 
OF A FEDERAL COURT S ITTING IN THE STATE OVER PROCEEDING S INVOLVING A 2 
VIOLATION OF FEDERAL LAW COMMITTED BY A CHILD ON A MILITARY INSTAL LATION 3 
OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE IF: 4 
 
 (I) THE FEDERAL COURT WAI VES EXCLUSIVE JURISD ICTION; 5 
AND  6 
 
 (II) THE VIOLATION OF FEDE RAL LAW IS ALSO A CR IME UNDER 7 
STATE LAW.  8 
 
Article – General Provisions 9 
 
6–202. 10 
 
 Notwithstanding § 6–201(a) OR § 6–203 of this subtitle, for the purpose of enforcing 11 
the civil or criminal laws of the State, the Governor may enter into an agreement with the 12 
United States to establish full or partial concurrent jurisdiction of the State and the United 13 
States over any land in the State held by the United States. 14 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 15 
October 1, 2023. 16 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.