Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB124 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/21/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0124*  
  
SENATE BILL 124 
E4   	3lr0763 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 32 
By: Senator Hester Senators Hester, Augustine, Brooks, Feldman, Kagan, 
Lewis Young, M. Washington, and Watson 
Requested: November 14, 2022 
Introduced and read first time: January 11, 2023 
Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 21, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Food System Resiliency Council 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing that the Maryland Food System Resiliency Council is in 3 
the Office of Resilience in the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; 4 
altering the process for electing a cochair of the Council; and generally relating to 5 
the Maryland Food System Resiliency Council.  6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 
 Article – Public Safety 8 
Section 14–1101 and 14–1102 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2022 Replacement Volume) 11 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 
 
Article – Public Safety 14 
 
14–1101. 15 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 16 
 
 (b) “Council” means the Maryland Food System Resiliency Council. 17  2 	SENATE BILL 124  
 
 
 
 (c) [“Director” means the Director of the Maryland Emergency Management 1 
Agency. 2 
 
 (d)] “Food council organization” means a local food council organization that is 3 
established in the State. 4 
 
14–1102. 5 
 
 (a) There is a Maryland Food System Resiliency Council IN THE OFFICE OF 6 
RESILIENCE IN THE DEPARTMENT .  7 
 
 (b) The Council consists of the following members: 8 
 
 (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 9 
the Senate; 10 
 
 (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of the 11 
House; 12 
 
 (3) the [Director] SECRETARY, or the [Director’s] SECRETARY’S 13 
designee; 14 
 
 (4) the Secretary of Human Services, or the Secretary’s designee; 15 
 
 (5) the Secretary of Agriculture, or the Secretary’s designee; 16 
 
 (6) the Secretary of Commerce, or the Secretary’s designee; 17 
 
 (7) the Executive Director of the Maryland Farm Bureau, or the Executive 18 
Director’s designee; 19 
 
 (8) the Executive Director of the Maryland Agricultural and 20 
Resource–Based Industry Development Corporation, or the Executive Director’s designee; 21 
 
 (9) the Dean of the University of Maryland College of Agriculture and 22 
Natural Resources, or the Dean’s designee; and 23 
 
 (10) the following members appointed by the [Director] SECRETARY: 24 
 
 (i) five representatives of five different food council organizations 25 
who are recommended by members of food council organizations; 26 
 
 (ii) one representative of the University of Maryland Extension; 27 
   	SENATE BILL 124 	3 
 
 
 (iii) one representative of the University of Maryland Eastern Shore 1 
Small Farm Program; 2 
 
 (iv) one representative of the Harry R. Hughes Center for 3 
Agro–Ecology; 4 
 
 (v) one representative of a public school system in the State who has 5 
experience in food security and local food procurement; 6 
 
 (vi) one representative of a statewide food security advocacy 7 
organization; 8 
 
 (vii) one farmer in the State; 9 
 
 (viii) one owner of a food business in the State; 10 
 
 (ix) one expert in food system policy; 11 
 
 (x) one expert on racial equity in the food system; 12 
 
 (xi) one expert on food system impacts on climate and the 13 
environment; 14 
 
 (xii) one expert on food nutrition and public health; and 15 
 
 (xiii) any other individual that the [Director] SECRETARY deems 16 
appropriate. 17 
 
 (c) The [Director] SECRETARY shall: 18 
 
 (1) ensure that all five geographic areas of the State are represented by the 19 
appointed members of the Council; and 20 
 
 (2) appoint a successor in the event of a vacancy on the Council. 21 
 
 (d) (1) (i) The term of a member of the Council appointed by the [Director] 22 
SECRETARY is 3 years. 23 
 
 (ii) An appointed member may not serve for more than 2 consecutive 24 
three year terms. 25 
 
 (2) At the end of a term, a member continues to serve until a successor is 26 
appointed and qualifies. 27 
 
 (3) A member who is appointed after a term has begun shall serve for the 28 
rest of the term or until a successor is appointed and qualifies. 29 
  4 	SENATE BILL 124  
 
 
 (e) A member of the Council: 1 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Council; but 2 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 3 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State Budget. 4 
 
 (f) A majority of the members then serving on the Council is a quorum. 5 
 
 (g) (1) (i) The [Director] SECRETARY, or the [Director’s] SECRETARY’S 6 
designee, and one member [representing a food council organization] who is elected in 7 
accordance with subparagraph (ii) of this paragraph shall cochair the Council. 8 
 
 (ii) At the first meeting of each year, the Council shall elect a cochair 9 
from among the [five] Council members [representing food council organizations] for a 10 
term of 1 year. 11 
 
 (2) The Secretary of Agriculture, or the Secretary’s designee, the Secretary 12 
of Human Services, or the Secretary’s designee, and the Dean of the University of Maryland 13 
College of Agriculture and Natural Resources, or the Dean’s designee shall co–vice chair 14 
the Council. 15 
 
 (h) (1) The Council may establish subcommittees to provide technical 16 
assistance to the Council. 17 
 
 (2) The Council may establish subcommittee topics and membership as the 18 
Council deems appropriate. 19 
 
 (i) The [Maryland Emergency Management Agency and the University of 20 
Maryland College of Agriculture and Natural Resources] DEPARTMENT shall provide staff 21 
for the Council[, as deemed necessary by the cochairs]. 22 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 23 
October 1, 2023. 24 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.