Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB34 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0034*  
  
SENATE BILL 34 
M4   	3lr0991 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 389 
By: Senator Hester Senators Hester and Gallion 
Requested: November 20, 2022 
Introduced and read first time: January 11, 2023 
Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 7, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Agriculture – State Ombudsman Specialist for Value–Added 2 
Agriculture 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the State Ombudsman Specialist for Value–Added 4 
Agriculture as a position in the Department of Agriculture; and generally relating to 5 
the State Ombudsman Specialist for Value–Added Agriculture. 6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 
 Article – Agriculture 8 
Section 2–106 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 11 
 
BY adding to 12 
 Article – Agriculture 13 
Section 2–2201 and 2–2202 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 22. State 14 
Ombudsman Specialist for Value–Added Agriculture” 15 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 16 
 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 17 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 18 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 19 
 
Article – Agriculture 20  2 	SENATE BILL 34  
 
 
 
2–106. 1 
 
 (a) The following positions and units are included within the Department: 2 
 
 (1) The Maryland Agricultural Fair Board; 3 
 
 (2) The Chief of Weights and Measures; 4 
 
 (3) The State Chemist; 5 
 
 (4) The State Veterinarian; 6 
 
 (5) The State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; 7 
 
 (6) The State Soil Conservation Committee; 8 
 
 (7) The Maryland Agricultural Commission; 9 
 
 (8) The Maryland Horse Industry Board; 10 
 
 (9) The Maryland Winery and Grape Growers’ Advisory Board; [and] 11 
 
 (10) The Seafood Marketing Advisory Commission; AND 12 
 
 (11) THE STATE OMBUDSMAN SPECIALIST FOR VALUE–ADDED 13 
AGRICULTURE . 14 
 
 (b) The Secretary shall appoint the State Chemist, State Veterinarian, STATE 15 
OMBUDSMAN SPECIALIST FOR VALUE–ADDED AGRICULTURE , and Chief of Weights 16 
and Measures. 17 
 
 (c) The Department also includes any other position or unit which is declared 18 
within the Department pursuant to law. 19 
 
SUBTITLE 22. STATE OMBUDSMAN SPECIALIST FOR VALUE–ADDED 20 
AGRICULTURE . 21 
 
2–2201. 22 
 
 IN THIS SUBTITLE, “VALUE–ADDED AGRICULTURE ”: 23 
 
 (1) MEANS THE ALTERATION OR ENHANCEMENT OF A RAW 24 
AGRICULTURAL PRODUCT , INCLUDING LIVESTOCK , OR AN AGRICULTURAL S ERVICE 25 
IN A WAY THAT INCREA SES THE PRODUCT’S PRODUCT OR SERVICE ’S WORTH TO A 26   	SENATE BILL 34 	3 
 
 
CONSUMER AND BRINGS MORE REVE NUE TO A FARMER , PRODUCER, OR PROCESSOR ; 1 
AND 2 
 
 (2) INCLUDES ALL ENTERPRI SES, INCLUDING THOSE PROV IDING 3 
EQUINE ACTIVITIES , IN WHICH AN AGRICULT URAL BUSINESS OR THE 4 
AGRICULTURAL BUSINES S’S PRODUCTS OR SERVICES ARE ALTERED , MARKETED, 5 
PRODUCED, OR PROCESSED IN A WA Y THAT ADDS INCOME T O A FARMER, PRODUCER, 6 
OR PROCESSOR . 7 
 
2–2202. 8 
 
 (A) THE STATE OMBUDSMAN SPECIALIST FOR VALUE–ADDED 9 
AGRICULTURE SHALL : 10 
 
 (1) SERVE AS THE PRIMARY POINT OF CONTACT FOR INDIVIDUALS 11 
ENGAGING IN, OR INTERESTED IN EN GAGING IN, VALUE–ADDED AGRICULTURE IN 12 
THE STATE; 13 
 
 (2) PROVIDE INFORMATION R EGARDING STATE AND FEDERAL 14 
REGULATIONS RELATING TO VALUE–ADDED AGRICULTURE ; 15 
 
 (3) ACT AS A LIAISON BETW EEN STATE AND FEDERAL PAR TNERS 16 
INVOLVED IN VALUE –ADDED AGRICULTURE ; AND 17 
 
 (4) PERFORM ANY OTHER DUT Y OR FUNCTION THAT S UPPORTS 18 
VALUE–ADDED AGRICULTURE IN THE STATE, AS REQUIRED BY THE SECRETARY. 19 
 
 (B) THE STATE OMBUDSMAN SPECIALIST FOR VALUE–ADDED 20 
AGRICULTURE SHALL REC EIVE A SALARY AS PRO VIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET . 21 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That a Position Identification 22 
Number (PIN) shall be created in the Department of Agriculture for the State Ombudsman 23 
Specialist for Value–Added Agriculture. 24 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, during the fir st year after 25 
the initial appointment of the State Ombudsman Specialist for Value–Added Agriculture, 26 
the priority function of the Ombudsman Specialist is to focus on implementing the 27 
recommendations of the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Return to State Meat Process 28 
Inspection. 29 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 30 
October 1, 2023.  31