Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB424 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/02/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0424*  
  
SENATE BILL 424 
P2   	3lr1279 
SB 961/22 – B&T   	CF HB 261 
By: Senators Elfreth and Feldman 
Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2023 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Projects – Global Warming Potential of Materials 2 
(Buy Clean Maryland Act) 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of General Services to establish a maximum 4 
acceptable global warming potential for certain categories of eligible materials used 5 
in certain eligible projects; requiring the Department to review the maximum 6 
acceptable global warming potential for each category of eligible materials and 7 
authorizing the Department to make certain adjustments according to a certain 8 
schedule; prohibiting the Department from increasing the maximum acceptable 9 
global warming potential for a category of eligible materials; requiring a unit of State 10 
government to specify the eligible materials that will be used in an eligible project 11 
in the solicitation for an eligible project; requiring a successful bidder or offeror of an 12 
eligible project to submit certain information about each eligible material proposed 13 
to be used in an eligible project; prohibiting a contractor from installing any eligible 14 
materials on an eligible project until the contractor submits the required information 15 
for the eligible material; authorizing the Department to waive certain requirements 16 
concerning the use of eligible materials on eligible projects under certain 17 
circumstances; providing that the Department shall strive to achieve a continuous 18 
reduction of greenhouse gas emissions over time; and generally relating to the global 19 
warming potential of materials in public projects. 20 
 
BY adding to 21 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 22 
Section 4–901 through 4–905 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 9. Buy Clean 23 
Maryland Act” 24 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 25 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 26 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 27 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 28 
  2 	SENATE BILL 424  
 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 1 
 
SUBTITLE 9. BUY CLEAN MARYLAND ACT. 2 
 
4–901. 3 
 
 (A) IN THIS SUBTITLE THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 4 
INDICATED. 5 
 
 (B) “ELIGIBLE MATER IAL” MEANS ANY CEMENT OR CONCRETE MIXTURE 6 
USED IN THE CONSTRUC TION OF A PUBLIC PRO JECT. 7 
 
 (C) (1) “ELIGIBLE PROJECT ” MEANS A PUBLIC PROJE CT AS DEFINED IN § 8 
3–602 OF THIS ARTICLE. 9 
 
 (2) “ELIGIBLE PROJECT ” DOES NOT INCLUDE ANY MAINTENANCE 10 
PROGRAM FOR THE UP KEEP OF A PUBLIC PRO JECT. 11 
 
 (D) “GLOBAL WARMING POTENT IAL” MEANS THE DEGREE THA T A GIVEN 12 
MASS OF A CHEMICAL C ONTRIBUTES TO GLOBAL WARMING OVER A GIVEN TIME 13 
PERIOD WHEN COMPARED TO THE SAME MASS OF CARBON DIOXIDE . 14 
 
 (E) “GREENHOUSE GAS ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 2–1202 OF THE 15 
ENVIRONMENT ARTICLE. 16 
 
4–902. 17 
 
 IN ADMINISTERING THIS SUBTITLE, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL STRI VE TO 18 
ACHIEVE A CONTINUOUS REDUCTION OF GREENHO USE GAS EMISSIONS OV ER TIME. 19 
 
4–903. 20 
 
 (A) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2025, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ESTABLISH 21 
A MAXIMUM ACCEPTABLE GLOBAL WARMING POTEN TIAL FOR EACH CATEGO RY OF 22 
ELIGIBLE MATERIALS U SED IN AN ELIGIBLE P ROJECT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS 23 
SECTION. 24 
 
 (B) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 25 
 
 (1) BASE THE MAXIMUM ACC EPTABLE GLOBAL WARMI NG POTENTIAL 26 
ON THE INDUSTRY AVERAGE OF GLOB AL WARMING POTENTIAL EMISSIONS FOR THAT 27 
MATERIAL;  28 
   	SENATE BILL 424 	3 
 
 
 (2) DETERMINE THE INDUST RY AVERAGE OF GLOBAL WARMING 1 
POTENTIAL EMISSIONS , WHICH MAY INCLUDE TR ANSPORTATION –RELATED 2 
EMISSIONS, BY CONSULTING NATION ALLY OR INTERNATIONA LLY RECOGNIZED 3 
DATABASES OF ENVIRONM ENTAL PRODUCT DECLAR ATIONS; AND  4 
 
 (3) EXPRESS THE MAXIMUM ACCEPTABLE GLOBAL WA RMING 5 
POTENTIAL AS A NUMBE R THAT STATES THE MA XIMUM ACCEPTABLE GLO BAL 6 
WARMING POTENTIAL FO R EACH CATEGORY OF E LIGIBLE MATERIALS , CONSISTENT 7 
WITH CRITERIA IN AN ENVIRONMENTAL PRO DUCT DECLARATION . 8 
 
 (C) THE DEPARTMENT MAY : 9 
 
 (1) ESTABLISH ADDITIONAL SUBCATEGORIES WITHIN EACH 10 
CATEGORY OF ELIGIBLE MATERIAL WITH DISTIN CT MAXIMUM ACCEPTABL E GLOBAL 11 
WARMING POTENTIAL LI MITS; 12 
 
 (2) ESTABLISH A MAXIMUM ACCEPTABLE GLO BAL WARMING 13 
POTENTIAL FOR EACH M ATERIAL CATEGORY IN THE AGGREGATE ; AND  14 
 
 (3) CONSULT WITH ANY OTH ER RELEVANT UNIT OF STATE 15 
GOVERNMENT WHEN ESTA BLISHING A MAXIMUM A CCEPTABLE GLOBAL WAR MING 16 
POTENTIAL FOR EACH C ATEGORY OF ELIGIBLE MATERIALS USED IN AN ELIGIBLE 17 
PROJECT. 18 
 
 (D) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , BY JANUARY 19 
1, 2028, AND EVERY 3 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE DEPARTMENT SHALL REVI EW THE 20 
MAXIMUM ACCEPTABLE G LOBAL WARMING POTENT IAL FOR EACH CATEGOR Y OF 21 
ELIGIBLE MATERIALS A ND MAY ADJUST THE PO TENTIAL FOR ANY CATEG ORY TO 22 
REFLECT INDUSTRY CON DITIONS. 23 
 
 (2) THE DEPARTMENT MAY NOT AD JUST THE GLOBAL WARM ING 24 
POTENTIAL UPWARD FOR ANY CATEGORY OF ELIG IBLE MATERIAL. 25 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 26 
as follows: 27 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 28 
 
4–904. 29 
 
 (A) (1) FOR ANY SOLICITATION FOR A CONTRACT FOR A N ELIGIBLE 30 
PROJECT, A UNIT OF STATE GOVERNMENT SHAL L SPECIFY THE ELIGIB LE 31 
MATERIALS THAT WILL BE USED IN THE PROJE CT AND THE REASONABL E MINIMUM 32  4 	SENATE BILL 424  
 
 
USAGE THRESHO LDS BELOW WHICH THE REQUIREMENTS OF THIS SECTION DO NOT 1 
APPLY. 2 
 
 (2) A UNIT OF STATE GOVERNMENT MAY INCLUDE IN A SOLICIT ATION 3 
FOR AN ELIGIBLE PROJ ECT A GLOBAL WARMING POTENTIAL FOR ANY EL IGIBLE 4 
MATERIAL THAT IS LOW ER THAN THE MAXIMUM ACCEPTABLE GLOBAL WA RMING 5 
POTENTIAL FOR THAT M ATERIAL AS DETERMINE D UNDER § 4–903 OF THIS 6 
SUBTITLE. 7 
 
 (B) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL REQU IRE A SUCCESSFUL BID DER OR 8 
OFFEROR OF AN ELIGIB LE PROJECT TO SUBMIT , FOR EACH ELIGIBLE MA TERIAL 9 
PROPOSED TO BE USED IN THE ELIGIBLE PROJ ECT: 10 
 
 (1) A CURRENT ENVIRONMEN TAL PRODUCT DECLARAT ION, TYPE III, 11 
AS DEFINED BY THE INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDIZATION 12 
STANDARD 14025; OR 13 
 
 (2) A SIMILARLY ROBUST L IFE CYCLE ASSESSMENT METHOD THAT 14 
INCLUDES UNIFORM STA NDARDS IN DATA COLLE CTION. 15 
 
 (C) A CONTRACTOR MAY NOT I NSTALL ANY ELIGIBLE MATERIALS ON THE 16 
ELIGIBLE PROJECT UNT IL THE CONTRACTOR SU BMITS A FACILITY –SPECIFIC 17 
ENVIRONMENTAL PRODUC T DECLARATION FOR TH AT ELIGIBLE MATERIAL AS 18 
REQUIRED UNDER SUBSE CTION (B) OF THIS SECTION. 19 
 
 (D) IF AN ENVIRONMEN TAL PRODUCT DECLARAT ION IS NOT AVAILABLE FOR 20 
AN ELIGIBLE MATERIAL , THE CONTRACTOR SHALL NOTIFY THE UNIT AND USE AN 21 
ALTERNATIVE ELIGIBLE MATERIAL WITH AN ENV IRONMENTAL PRODUCT 22 
DECLARATION .  23 
 
 (E) THE DEPARTMENT MAY WAIVE THE REQUIREMENTS OF THIS SECTION 24 
IF IT DETERMINES THAT R EQUIRING THE RELEVAN T ELIGIBLE MATERIALS WOULD: 25 
 
 (1) BE TECHNICALLY INFEA SIBLE; 26 
 
 (2) RESULT IN A SIGNIFIC ANT INCREASE IN PROJ ECT COST; 27 
 
 (3) RESULT IN A SIGNIFIC ANT DELAY IN PROJECT COMPLETION ; OR  28 
 
 (4) RESULT IN ONLY ONE S OURCE OR MANUFACTURER BEIN G ABLE 29 
TO PROVIDE THE NECES SARY MATERIALS . 30 
 
4–905. 31   	SENATE BILL 424 	5 
 
 
 
 (A) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2025, AND EACH YEAR THEREA FTER, THE 1 
DEPARTMENT SHALL SUBM IT AN ANNUAL REPORT , IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 2 
OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, TO THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY THAT 3 
INCLUDES: 4 
 
 (1) WHAT THE DEPARTMENT HAS LEARNE D ABOUT HOW TO IDENT IFY 5 
AND QUANTIFY EMBODIE D CARBON IN BUILDING MATERIALS, INCLUDING LIFE 6 
CYCLE COSTS; AND 7 
 
 (2) ANY OBSTACLES THE DEPARTMENT , BIDDERS, OR OFFERORS 8 
HAVE ENCOUNTERED IN IDENTIFYING AND QUANTIFYING E MBODIED CARBON IN 9 
BUILDING MATERIALS . 10 
 
 (B) THE REPORT SUBMITTED ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2025, SHALL 11 
INCLUDE A DESCRIPTIO N OF THE METHOD THAT THE DEPARTMENT USED TO 12 
DEVELOP THE MAXIMUM ACCEPTABLE GLOBAL WA RMING POTENTIAL FOR EACH 13 
CATEGORY OF ELIGIBLE MATE RIALS. 14 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall take 15 
effect July 1, 2025. 16 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, except as provided in Section 17 
3 of this Act, this Act shall take effect July 1, 2023. 18