Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB615 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/08/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDE D TO EXISTING LAW . 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0615*  
  
SENATE BILL 615 
E4   	3lr2769 
    	CF HB 759 
By: Senator Hettleman 
Introduced and read first time: February 6, 2023 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services – Sexual 2 
Assault Evidence Collection Kit Reporting Program 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim 4 
Services to establish and administer a certain reporting program relating to sexual 5 
assault evidence collection kits; requiring a law enforcement agency and a person 6 
with control or possession of a sexual assault evidence collection kit to report certain 7 
information to the program and comply with certain regulations; clarifying the uses 8 
for the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund; and generally relating to a sexual assault 9 
evidence collection kit reporting program.  10 
 
BY adding to 11 
 Article – Criminal Procedure 12 
Section 11–926.1 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 15 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 16 
 Article – Public Safety 17 
Section 4–401 18 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 19 
 (2022 Replacement Volume) 20 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 21 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 22 
 
Article – Criminal Procedure 23 
 
11–926.1. 24 
  2 	SENATE BILL 615  
 
 
 (A) (1) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 1 
VICTIM SERVICES SHALL ESTABLISH AND ADMINISTER A REPORTING PROGRAM FOR 2 
TRACKING THE LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY FOR SEXUAL ASSAULT 3 
EVIDENCE COLLECTION KITS.  4 
 
 (2) THE REPORTING PROGRAM SHALL: 5 
 
 (I) TRACK THE LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF 6 
SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KITS IN THE STATE;  7 
 
 (II) RECEIVE INFORMATION RELATING TO THE LOCA TION, 8 
STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY FROM ANY LAW ENFORCE MENT AGENCY OR 9 
PERSON WITH CONTROL OR POSSESSIO N OF A SEXUAL ASSAUL T EVIDENCE 10 
COLLECTION KIT ; AND 11 
 
 (III) ALLOW FOR A VICTIM O R A VICTIM’S REPRESENTATIVE TO 12 
TRACK THE LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT 13 
EVIDENCE COLLECTION KIT CONTAINING SAMPL ES TAKEN FROM THE VI CTIM. 14 
 
 (3) (I) INFORMATION CONTAINED IN THE REPORTING SYS TEM IS 15 
NOT OPEN TO PUBLIC I NSPECTION. 16 
 
 (II) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 17 
YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES MAY DISCLOSE INFORMATION CONTAINED IN THE 18 
REPORTING SYSTEM ONL Y TO: 19 
 
 1. THE VICTIM ABOUT WHOM TH E INFORMATION 20 
PERTAINS;  21 
 
 2. A VICTIM’S REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE VICTIM ABOUT 22 
WHOM THE INFORMATION PERTAINS;  23 
 
 3. A SEXUAL ASSAULT CRI SIS PROGRAM ESTABLIS HED 24 
UNDER § 11–923 OF THIS SUBTITLE; 25 
 
 4. A CHILD ADVOCACY CEN TER ESTABLISHED UNDE R § 26 
11–928 OF THIS SUBTITLE;  27 
 
 5. A LAW ENFORCEMENT AG ENCY;  28 
 
 6. A STATE’S ATTORNEY;  29 
   	SENATE BILL 615 	3 
 
 
 7. A PERSON AUTHORIZED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE 1 
OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES TO RECEIVE T HE 2 
INFORMATION ; OR 3 
 
 8. A PERSON ENTITLED TO RECEIVE THE INFORMAT ION 4 
BY FEDERAL OR STATE LAW, SUBPOENA, COURT RULE, OR COURT ORDER .  5 
 
 (B) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , BEGINNING 6 
OCTOBER 1, 2023, A LAW ENFORCEMENT AG ENCY OR ANY PERSON, INCLUDING A 7 
HEALTH CARE PROVIDER , FORENSIC LABORATORY , OR STATE’S ATTORNEY, THAT 8 
HAS CONTROL OR POSSE SSION OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT EVI DENCE COLLECTION KIT 9 
SHALL: 10 
 
 (I) REPORT LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY 11 
INFORMATION TO THE R EPORTING PROGRAM EST ABLISHED UNDER THIS SECTION 12 
IN A MANNER REQUIRED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 13 
YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES; AND 14 
 
 (II) COMPLY WITH ALL REGULATIONS DEVELOPED BY THE 15 
GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES 16 
UNDER THIS SECTION .  17 
 
 (2) A LAW ENFORCEMENT AGEN CY OR A PERSON, INCLUDING A 18 
HEALTH CARE PROVIDER , FORENSIC LABORATORY , OR STATE’S ATTORNEY, THAT 19 
HAD CONTROL OR POSSESSIO N OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KIT 20 
BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, AND HAS CONTROL OR P OSSESSION OF THE SEX UAL 21 
ASSAULT EVIDENCE COL LECTION KIT ON OR AF TER OCTOBER 1, 2023, SHALL 22 
REPORT LOCATION, STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY INF ORMATION TO THE 23 
REPORTING PROGRAM ES TABLISHED UNDER THIS SECTION ON OR BEFORE 24 
DECEMBER 31, 2025. 25 
 
 (C) (1) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 26 
VICTIM SERVICES, IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MARYLAND SEXUAL ASSAULT 27 
EVIDENCE KIT POLICY AND FUNDING COMMITTEE, SHALL ADOPT ANY 28 
REGULATIONS NECESSARY TO CARRY OUT THIS SE CTION.  29 
 
 (2) REGULATIONS ADOPTED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME 30 
PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS SECTION 31 
SHALL INCLUDE: 32 
 
 (I) REQUIREMENTS FOR REPORTING THE LOCATION AND 33 
CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT EVI DENCE COLLECTION KIT TO THE 34  4 	SENATE BILL 615  
 
 
PROGRAM ESTABLIS HED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 1 
YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES UNDER THIS S ECTION; AND 2 
 
 (II) PROCEDURES FOR DISCL OSING INFORMATION ABOUT 3 
SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KITS INCLUDED IN THE REPO RTING 4 
PROGRAM, INCLUDING DISCLOSURE TO PARTIES AUTHORIZED T O RECEIVE 5 
INFORMATION CONTAINE D IN THE REPORTING S YSTEM.  6 
 
Article – Public Safety 7 
 
4–401. 8 
 
 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 9 
 
 (2) “Forensic laboratory” means a facility, an entity, or a site that offers or 10 
performs forensic analysis and is owned or operated by the State, a county or municipal 11 
corporation in the State, or another governmental entity. 12 
 
 (3) “Fund” means the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund. 13 
 
 (4) “Law enforcement agency” means the Department of State Police or a 14 
police department of a county or municipal corporation in the State. 15 
 
 (b) There is a Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund. 16 
 
 (c) The purpose of the Fund is to provide law enforcement agencies with funding 17 
to pay for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits by forensic laboratories. 18 
 
 (d) The Executive Director of the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, 19 
and Victim Services shall: 20 
 
 (1) administer the Fund; 21 
 
 (2) establish and publish procedures for the distribution of funding to law 22 
enforcement agencies; 23 
 
 (3) ensure each jurisdiction in the State that has a forensic laboratory is 24 
able to access the Fund; 25 
 
 (4) consider the number of sexual assault incidents that were investigated 26 
by a law enforcement agency in the prior fiscal year when distributing funding; and 27 
 
 (5) submit a report with information on the distribution of funding to the 28 
General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, before 29 
September 1 each year. 30 
   	SENATE BILL 615 	5 
 
 
 (e) (1) The Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund that is not subject to § 7–302 of 1 
the State Finance and Procurement Article. 2 
 
 (2) The State Treasurer shall hold the Fund separately, and the 3 
Comptroller shall account for the Fund. 4 
 
 (f) The Fund consists of: 5 
 
 (1) money appropriated in the State budget to the Fund; 6 
 
 (2) any interest earnings of the Fund; and 7 
 
 (3) any other money from any other source accepted for the benefit of the 8 
Fund. 9 
 
 (g) (1) The Fund may be used only for equipment, supplies, personnel, and 10 
outsourcing necessary for the testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits in forensic 11 
laboratories. 12 
 
 (2) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE FUND 13 
MAY BE USED FOR EQUI PMENT, SUPPLIES, PERSONNEL, AND OUTSOURCING 14 
NECESSARY FOR THE TE STING OF SEXUAL ASSA ULT EVIDENCE COLLECT ION KITS 15 
COLLECTED BEFORE OR AFTER THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE FUND.  16 
 
 (h) (1) The State Treasurer shall invest the money of the Fund in the same 17 
manner as other State money may be invested. 18 
 
 (2) Any interest earnings of the Fund, including interest earnings under 19 
subsection (f) of this section, shall be credited to the Fund. 20 
 
 (i) Expenditures from the Fund may be made only in accordance with the State 21 
budget. 22 
 
 (j) Money expended from the Fund for testing of sexual assault evidence 23 
collection kits is supplemental to and is not intended to take the place of funding that 24 
otherwise would be appropriated for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits. 25 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 26 
October 1, 2023. 27