EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDE D TO EXISTING LAW . [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *sb0615* SENATE BILL 615 E4 3lr2769 CF HB 759 By: Senator Hettleman Introduced and read first time: February 6, 2023 Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings Committee Report: Favorable Senate action: Adopted Read second time: March 6, 2023 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services – Sexual 2 Assault Evidence Collection Kit Reporting Program 3 FOR the purpose of requiring the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim 4 Services to establish and administer a certain reporting program relating to sexual 5 assault evidence collection kits; requiring a law enforcement agency and a person 6 with control or possession of a sexual assault evidence collection kit to report certain 7 information to the program and comply with certain regulations; clarifying the uses 8 for the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund; and generally relating to a sexual assault 9 evidence collection kit reporting program. 10 BY adding to 11 Article – Criminal Procedure 12 Section 11–926.1 13 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 15 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 16 Article – Public Safety 17 Section 4–401 18 Annotated Code of Maryland 19 (2022 Replacement Volume) 20 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 21 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 22 2 SENATE BILL 615 Article – Criminal Procedure 1 11–926.1. 2 (A) (1) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 3 VICTIM SERVICES SHALL ESTABLISH AND ADMINISTER A REPORTING PROGRAM FOR 4 TRACKING THE LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY FOR SEXUAL ASSAULT 5 EVIDENCE COLLECTION KITS. 6 (2) THE REPORTING PROGRAM SHALL: 7 (I) TRACK THE LOCATION, STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF 8 SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KITS IN THE STATE; 9 (II) RECEIVE INFORMATION RELATING TO THE LOCA TION, 10 STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY FROM ANY LAW ENFORCE MENT AGENCY OR 11 PERSON WITH CONTROL OR POSSESSIO N OF A S EXUAL ASSAULT EVIDEN CE 12 COLLECTION KIT ; AND 13 (III) ALLOW FOR A VICTIM O R A VICTIM’S REPRESENTATIVE TO 14 TRACK THE LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT 15 EVIDENCE COLLECTION KIT CONTAINING SAMPL ES TAKEN FROM THE VI CTIM. 16 (3) (I) INFORMATION CONTAINED IN THE REPORTING SYS TEM IS 17 NOT OPEN TO PUBLIC I NSPECTION. 18 (II) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 19 YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES MAY DISCLOSE INFORMATION CONTAINED IN THE 20 REPORTING SYSTEM ONL Y TO: 21 1. THE VICTIM ABOUT WHOM TH E INFORMATION 22 PERTAINS; 23 2. A VICTIM’S REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE VICTIM ABOUT 24 WHOM THE INFORMATION PERTAINS; 25 3. A SEXUAL ASSAULT CRI SIS PROGRAM ESTABLIS HED 26 UNDER § 11–923 OF THIS SUBTITLE; 27 4. A CHILD ADVOCACY CEN TER ESTABLI SHED UNDER § 28 11–928 OF THIS SUBTITLE; 29 5. A LAW ENFORCEMENT AG ENCY; 30 SENATE BILL 615 3 6. A STATE’S ATTORNEY; 1 7. A PERSON AUTHORIZED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE 2 OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES TO RECEIVE T HE 3 INFORMATION ; OR 4 8. A PERSON ENTITLED TO RECEIVE THE INFORMAT ION 5 BY FEDERAL OR STATE LAW, SUBPOENA, COURT RULE, OR COURT ORDER . 6 (B) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , BEGINNING 7 OCTOBER 1, 2023, A LAW ENFORCEMENT AG ENCY OR ANY PERSON, INCLUDING A 8 HEALTH CARE PROVIDER, FORENSIC LABORATORY , OR STATE’S ATTORNEY, THAT 9 HAS CONTROL OR POSSE SSION OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT EVI DENCE COLLECTION KIT 10 SHALL: 11 (I) REPORT LOCATION , STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY 12 INFORMATION TO THE R EPORTING PROGRAM EST ABLISHED UNDER THIS SECTION 13 IN A MANNER REQUIRED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 14 YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES; AND 15 (II) COMPLY WITH ALL REGULATIONS DEVELOPED BY THE 16 GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES 17 UNDER THIS SECTION . 18 (2) A LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY O R A PERSON, INCLUDING A 19 HEALTH CARE PROVIDER , FORENSIC LABORATORY , OR STATE’S ATTORNEY, THAT 20 HAD CONTROL OR POSSESSIO N OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KIT 21 BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, AND HAS CONTROL OR P OSSESSION OF THE SEX UAL 22 ASSAULT EVIDENCE COLLECTI ON KIT ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2023, SHALL 23 REPORT LOCATION, STATUS, AND CHAIN OF CUSTODY INF ORMATION TO THE 24 REPORTING PROGRAM ES TABLISHED UNDER THIS SECTION ON OR BEFORE 25 DECEMBER 31, 2025. 26 (C) (1) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 27 VICTIM SERVICES, IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MARYLAND SEXUAL ASSAULT 28 EVIDENCE KIT POLICY AND FUNDING COMMITTEE, SHALL ADOPT ANY 29 REGULATIONS NECESSARY TO CARRY OUT THIS SE CTION. 30 (2) REGULATIONS ADOPTED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME 31 PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS SECTION 32 SHALL INCLUDE: 33 4 SENATE BILL 615 (I) REQUIREMENTS FOR REPORTING THE LOCATION AND 1 CHAIN OF CUSTODY OF A SEXUAL ASSAULT EVI DENCE COLLECTION KIT TO THE 2 PROGRAM ESTABLISHED BY THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 3 YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES UNDER THIS S ECTION; AND 4 (II) PROCEDURES FOR DISCL OSING INFORMATION ABOUT 5 SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDE NCE COLLECTION KITS INCLUDED IN THE REPO RTING 6 PROGRAM, INCLUDING D ISCLOSURE TO PARTIES AUTHORIZED T O RECEIVE 7 INFORMATION CONTAINE D IN THE REPORTING S YSTEM. 8 Article – Public Safety 9 4–401. 10 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 11 (2) “Forensic laboratory” means a facility, an entity, or a site that offers or 12 performs forensic analysis and is owned or operated by the State, a county or municipal 13 corporation in the State, or another governmental entity. 14 (3) “Fund” means the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund. 15 (4) “Law enforcement agency” means the Department of State Police or a 16 police department of a county or municipal corporation in the State. 17 (b) There is a Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund. 18 (c) The purpose of the Fund is to provide law enforcement agencies with funding 19 to pay for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits by forensic laboratories. 20 (d) The Executive Director of the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, 21 and Victim Services shall: 22 (1) administer the Fund; 23 (2) establish and publish procedures for the distribution of funding to law 24 enforcement agencies; 25 (3) ensure each jurisdiction in the State that has a forensic laboratory is 26 able to access the Fund; 27 (4) consider the number of sexual assault incidents that were investigated 28 by a law enforcement agency in the prior fiscal year when distributing funding; and 29 SENATE BILL 615 5 (5) submit a report with information on the distribution of funding to the 1 General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, before 2 September 1 each year. 3 (e) (1) The Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund that is not subject to § 7–302 of 4 the State Finance and Procurement Article. 5 (2) The State Treasurer shall hold the Fund separately, and the 6 Comptroller shall account for the Fund. 7 (f) The Fund consists of: 8 (1) money appropriated in the State budget to the Fund; 9 (2) any interest earnings of the Fund; and 10 (3) any other money from any other source accepted for the benefit of the 11 Fund. 12 (g) (1) The Fund may be used only for equipment, supplies, personnel, and 13 outsourcing necessary for the testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits in forensic 14 laboratories. 15 (2) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE FUND 16 MAY BE USED FOR EQUI PMENT, SUPPLIES, PERSONNEL, AND OUTSOURCING 17 NECESSARY FOR THE TE STING OF SEXUAL ASSA ULT EVIDENCE COLLECT ION KITS 18 COLLECTED BEFORE OR AFTER THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE FUND. 19 (h) (1) The State Treasurer shall invest the money of the Fund in the same 20 manner as other State money may be invested. 21 (2) Any interest earnings of the Fund, including interest earnings under 22 subsection (f) of this section, shall be credited to the Fund. 23 (i) Expenditures from the Fund may be made only in accordance with the State 24 budget. 25 (j) Money expended from the Fund for testing of sexual assault evidence 26 collection kits is supplemental to and is not intended to take the place of funding that 27 otherwise would be appropriated for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits. 28 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 29 October 1, 2023. 30