Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB693 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/14/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDED TO EXIS TING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0693*  
  
SENATE BILL 693 
R2   	3lr1640 
    	CF HB 1049 
By: Senator Waldstreicher 
Introduced and read first time: February 6, 2023 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments 
Read second time: March 4, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Transportation – Assaults on Public Transit Operators – Report 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to submit a certain 3 
annual report on assaults on public transit operators to certain persons; and 4 
generally relating to assaults on public transit operators. 5 
 
BY adding to 6 
 Article – Transportation 7 
Section 7–714 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 10 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 
 
Article – Transportation 13 
 
7–714. 14 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 15 
INDICATED.  16 
 
 (2) “LOCAL EXECUTIVE AUTHO RITY” MEANS:  17 
 
 (I) 1. THE CHIEF EXECUTIVE O FFICER OF A COUNTY ; OR  18  2 	SENATE BILL 693  
 
 
 
 2. IF A COUNTY DOES NOT HAVE A CHIEF EXECUTI VE 1 
OFFICER, THE COUNTY GOVERNING BODY; AND 2 
 
 (II) IF A MUNICIPALITY OPE RATES A TRANSIT SYST EM: 3 
 
 1. THE CHIEF EXECUTIVE O	FFICER OF THE 4 
MUNICIPALITY; OR 5 
 
 2. IF THE MUNICIPALITY D OES NOT HAVE A CHIEF 6 
EXECUTIVE OFFICER , THE GOVERNING BODY O F THE MUNICIPALITY . 7 
 
 (3) (I) “PUBLIC TRANSIT OPERA TOR” MEANS AN INDIVIDUAL WHO 8 
IS: 9 
 
 1. EMPLOYED BY THE ADMINISTRATION , THE 10 
WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY, OR A POLITICAL 11 
SUBDIVISION; AND  12 
 
 2. ENGAGED IN PROVIDING PUBLIC TRANSPORTATIO N 13 
SERVICES, INCLUDING:  14 
 
 A. BUS SERVICE;  15 
 
 B. TRAIN SERVICE;  16 
 
 C. LIGHT RAIL SERVICE ; AND  17 
 
 D. SUBWAY SERVICE .  18 
 
 (II) “PUBLIC TRANSIT OPERAT OR” INCLUDES A TRANSIT 19 
STATION MANAGER .  20 
 
 (B) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL SUBMIT AN ANNUAL REP ORT ON 21 
ASSAULTS ON PUBLIC T RANSIT OPERATORS AS REQUIRED BY THIS SEC TION.  22 
 
 (C) THE REPORT SHALL INCL UDE THE FOLLOWING IN FORMATION FOR THE 23 
IMMEDIATELY PRECEDIN G 12 MONTHS CALENDAR YEAR 12 MONTHS:  24 
 
 (1) FOR EACH ASSAULT ON A PUBLIC TRANSIT OPERA TOR:  25 
 
 (I) THE NATURE OF THE ASS AULT;  26 
 
 (II) THE MODE OF TRANSIT W HERE THE ASSAULT OCC URRED;  27 
   	SENATE BILL 693 	3 
 
 
 (III) THE LOCATION OF THE A SSAULT;  1 
 
 (IV) WHETHER POLICE WERE I NVOLVED IN RESPONDIN G TO THE 2 
ASSAULT; AND  3 
 
 (V) THE OUTCOME OF ANY IN VESTIGATION INTO THE ASSAULT, 4 
INCLUDING ANY DISCIP LINARY ACTION TAKEN , IF THE INFORMATION I S AVAILABLE;  5 
 
 (2) A COMPARISON OF THE AG GREGATE DATA COMPILE D UNDER 6 
ITEM (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION W ITH AT LEAST TWO OTH ER STATES WITH SI MILAR 7 
TRANSIT SYSTEMS OR P OPULATIONS; AND  8 
 
 (3) A REVIEW OF CURRENT TR ANSIT INDUSTRY BEST PRACTICES TO 9 
PREVENT AND MITIGATE ASSAULTS ON PUBLIC T RANSIT OPERATORS .  10 
 
 (D) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1 EACH YEAR ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 31, 11 
2024 DECEMBER 1, 2023, AND EACH JANUARY 31 DECEMBER 1 THEREAFTER , THE 12 
ADMINISTRATION SHALL SUBMIT THE REPORT UN DER THIS SECTION TO :  13 
 
 (1) EACH LOCAL EXECUTIVE AUTHORITY;  14 
 
 (2) THE STATE’S ATTORNEY FOR EACH COU NTY; AND  15 
 
 (3) THE FOLLOWING COMMITT EES OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY, IN 16 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE:  17 
 
 (I) THE SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS COMMITTEE;  18 
 
 (II) THE SENATE FINANCE COMMITTEE;  19 
 
 (III) THE HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE; AND  20 
 
 (IV) THE HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION 21 
COMMITTEE.  22 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the report due on December 23 
1, 2023, January 31, 2024 December 1, 2023, under § 7–714 of the Transportation Article 24 
as enacted by Section 1 of this Act shall include, in addition to the information required by 25 
§ 7–714 of the Transportation Article as enacted by Section 1 of this Act, the following 26 
information: 27 
 
 (1) the data described in § 7–714(c)(1) of the Transportation Article as 28 
enacted by Section 1 of this Act for each of the immediately preceding 5 years;  29 
  4 	SENATE BILL 693  
 
 
 (2) an evaluation of assault prevention and mitigation technology and 1 
policies for each transit system operated by a political subdivision;  2 
 
 (3) recommendations to improve the existing assault prevention and 3 
mitigation technology and policies for each transit system operated by a political 4 
subdivision; and  5 
 
 (4) an evaluation of the feasibility of establishing a statewide local transit 6 
safety officer to provide guidance to transit systems operated by political subdivisions on 7 
best practices to prevent and mitigate assaults on public transit operators.  8 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 9 
1, 2023.  10 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.