EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *hb1060* HOUSE BILL 1060 D2 4lr2207 CF SB 965 By: Carroll County Delegation Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2024 Assigned to: Judiciary A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary 2 FOR the purpose of altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to be equal 3 to the salary of a Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest 4 available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan 5 beginning in a certain year; providing for a certain change in the annual salary of 6 the Sheriff of Carroll County under certain circumstances; and generally relating to 7 the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County. 8 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 10 Section 2–320(a) 11 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 15 Section 2–320(b) 16 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 21 2–320. 22 (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 23 2 HOUSE BILL 1060 (b) (1) The Sheriff of Carroll County shall receive an annual salary of[: 1 (1) $110,000 beginning December 3, 2019; 2 (2) $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022; and 3 (3)] $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023[, and thereafter]. 4 (2) BEGINNING IN 2026, THE SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE 5 EQUAL TO THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE LIEUTENANT 6 COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT COLONEL AT THE 7 DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY BEFO RE THE DAY 8 THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS THE NE W TERM OF OFFICE . 9 (3) BEGINNING IN 2030 AND EVERY 4 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE 10 SALARY OF THE SHERIFF OF CARROLL COUNTY SHALL BE THE L ESSER OF: 11 (I) THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE 12 LIEUTENANT COLONEL , AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT 13 COLONEL AT THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY 14 BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A TERM OF OFFICE IN THAT YEAR; OR 15 (II) A 110% OF THE SALARY OF THE SHERIFF ON THE DAY 16 BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A NEW TERM OF OFFICE . 17 (4) ANY CHANGE IN THE SAL ARY PAID UNDER THE DEPARTMENT OF 18 STATE POLICE PAY PLAN DURIN G THE TERM OF OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF MAY NO T 19 APPLY TO THE INCUMBE NT SHERIFF, BUT THE CHANGED RATE SHALL TAKE EFFECT 20 AT THE BEGINNING OF THE NEXT FOLLOWING T ERM OF OFFICE. 21 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, in accordance with Article 22 III, § 35 of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to 23 the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a term of office 24 beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act concerning the 25 salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County shall take effect at the beginning of 26 the next following term of office. This limitation does not apply to an individual appointed 27 or elected after the effective date of this Act to fill out an unexpired term. 28 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 29 October 1, 2024. 30