EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *hb1199* HOUSE BILL 1199 R2 4lr2185 CF SB 891 By: Delegate Edelson Delegates Edelson, Allen, Addison, Boyce, Guyton, Healey, Lehman, T. Morgan, Ruth, and Terrasa Introduced and read first time: February 8, 2024 Assigned to: Environment and Transportation Committee Report: Favorable with amendments House action: Adopted Read second time: March 7, 2024 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Transportation – MobilityLink Paratransit Service Improvements – Study 2 FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Transportation Institute at the University of 3 Maryland to conduct a study to identify methods to improve the Maryland Transit 4 Administration’s ADA MobilityLink paratransit service; requiring the Maryland 5 Department of Transportation to incorporate the findings and recommendations of 6 the study conducted under this Act into a certain transportation plan; and generally 7 relating to the study to identify methods to improve the Administration’s ADA 8 MobilityLink paratransit service. 9 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 That: 11 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 12 (2) “ADA” means the federal Americans with Disabilities Act. 13 (3) “Administration” means the Maryland Transit Administration. 14 (b) The Maryland Transportation Institute at the University of Maryland shall 15 conduct a study to identify methods to improve the Maryland Transit Administration’s 16 ADA MobilityLink paratransit service. 17 (c) The study shall: 18 2 HOUSE BILL 1199 (1) summarize and compare the Administration’s MobilityLink service to 1 similar entities nationwide that provide ADA paratransit services; 2 (2) identify the service structure of ADA paratransit services in other 3 service areas nationwide and whether a public entity, private contractor, or hybrid model 4 is used to provide the service, including consideration of how the following services are 5 provided: 6 (i) fleet ownership; 7 (ii) fleet maintenance; 8 (iii) dispatch; 9 (iv) reservations; 10 (v) scheduling; 11 (vi) operators; 12 (vii) mechanics; 13 (viii) customer service; 14 (ix) quality assurance and control; and 15 (x) any other relevant aspects as the Maryland Transportation 16 Institute deems necessary; 17 (3) analyze both the short– and long–term fiscal costs and savings 18 associated with each type of ADA paratransit service model, including a comparison of the 19 quality of service and reliability of each service model; 20 (4) analyze the performance metrics associated with the ADA paratransit 21 services in various service areas nationwide based on the Federal Transit Administration’s 22 ADA Guidance for metrics, including: 23 (i) on–time performance for pick–ups and drop–offs; 24 (ii) missed trips; 25 (iii) onboard transit times; 26 (iv) excessive trip lengths; 27 (v) call center hold times and performance; 28 HOUSE BILL 1199 3 (vi) rate of customer complaints and resolution; and 1 (vii) safety conditions and practices on paratransit vehicles; 2 (5) analyze the workforce metrics among the ADA paratransit services in 3 various service areas nationwide, including: 4 (i) turnover rate; 5 (ii) average length of employment; 6 (iii) absenteeism rate; 7 (iv) accidents and preventable accident rates; 8 (v) workplace injury rates; 9 (vi) workers’ compensation claims rates; 10 (vii) career training opportunities; 11 (viii) career advancement opportunities; 12 (ix) average wages and benefits; 13 (x) morale and satisfaction; and 14 (xi) any other relevant aspects as the Maryland Transportation 15 Institute deems necessary; 16 (6) in consultation with the Maryland Commission on Disabilities and the 17 State Coordinating Committee for Human Services Transportation, solicit input and 18 comments from the public and riders of the Administration’s MobilityLink paratransit 19 service; and 20 (7) develop recommendations for service improvements to the 21 Administration’s MobilityLink paratransit service, considering long–term costs and 22 benefits alongside a qualitative analysis to enhance the delivery of high–quality service to 23 MobilityLink riders; 24 (8) develop recommendations for service improvements to individuals in 25 areas outside of three–quarters of a mile of a fixed transportation route; and 26 (9) develop recommendations to address interjurisdictional restrictions to 27 paratransit services, including restrictions relating to medical appointments that cross 28 jurisdictional lines. 29 4 HOUSE BILL 1199 (d) The Governor may include in the fiscal year 2026 budget bill an appropriation 1 of at least $150,000 for the purpose of carrying out the study required under subsection (b) 2 of this section. 3 (e) On or before July 1, 2025, the Maryland Transportation Institute shall submit 4 a report on its findings and recommendations to: 5 (1) the Governor; 6 (2) in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article: 7 (i) the General Assembly; 8 (ii) the members of the Anne Arundel County Delegation to the 9 Maryland General Assembly; 10 (iii) the members of the Baltimore County Delegation to the 11 Maryland General Assembly; and 12 (iv) the members of the Baltimore City Delegation to the Maryland 13 General Assembly; 14 (3) the County Executive and County Council of Anne Arundel County; 15 (4) the County Executive and County Council of Baltimore County; and 16 (5) the Maryland Department of Transportation; and 17 (5) (6) the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City. 18 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Maryland Department of 19 Transportation shall incorporate the findings and recommendations of the study conducted 20 under Section 1 of this Act into the 2050 Maryland Transportation Plan. 21 SECTION 2. 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 22 July 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months 2 years and, at 23 the end of December 31, 2025 June 30, 2026, this Act, with no further action required by 24 the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 25