Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1206 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/16/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1206*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1206 
C8   	4lr2589 
      
By: Delegates Kerr, Watson, Bagnall, Baker, Barnes, Bhandari, Bouchat, Boyce, 
Chang, Clippinger, Crosby, Cullison, Ebersole, Embry, Fair, Feldmark, 
Fisher, Foley, Forbes, Fraser–Hidalgo, Grossman, Guzzone, Healey, Hill, 
Hinebaugh, Hornberger, Howard, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kipke, Lehman, 
J. Long, McComas, Miller, T. Morgan, Phillips, Pruski, Qi, Reilly, Roberson, 
Rose, Rosenberg, Ruff, Ruth, Shetty, Simpson, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, 
Terrasa, Toles, Tomlinson, Valderrama, Valentine, White Holland, 
Williams, Wivell, and Ziegler Ziegler, Alston, Chisholm, Hutchinson, Kaiser, 
R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena–Melnyk, Szeliga, Taveras, and 
Woods 
Introduced and read first time: February 8, 2024 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 5, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission – Establishment 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Maryland –Ireland Trade Commission in the 3 
Department of Commerce to study and make recommendations regarding certain 4 
trade relations between Maryland and Ireland; and generally relating to the 5 
Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission. 6 
 
BY adding to 7 
 Article – Economic Development 8 
 Section 5–2501 through 5–2504 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 25. 9 
 Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission” 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 12 
 
Preamble 13 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1206  
 
 
 WHEREAS, Over 9% of Maryland’s population is of Irish descent; and 1 
 
 WHEREAS, The ties that bind Ireland to Maryland are deep and lasting; and 2 
 
 WHEREAS, Irish heritage has been the fortunate lot of many great Marylanders; 3 
and 4 
 
 WHEREAS, Ireland and Maryland are attempting to reinvent their economies for 5 
success in the twenty–first century; and 6 
 
 WHEREAS, Marylanders have both historic and practical reasons to desire the 7 
building of firmer commercial links with Ireland; now, therefore, 8 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 10 
 
Article – Economic Development 11 
 
SUBTITLE 25. MARYLAND–IRELAND TRADE COMMISSION. 12 
 
5–2501. 13 
 
 IN THIS SUBTITLE, “COMMISSION” MEANS THE MARYLAND–IRELAND TRADE 14 
COMMISSION. 15 
 
5–2502. 16 
 
 (A) THERE IS A MARYLAND–IRELAND TRADE COMMISSION IN THE 17 
DEPARTMENT . 18 
 
 (B) THE PURPOSE OF THE COMMISSION IS TO STUD Y AND PROMOTE TRADE 19 
BETWEEN MARYLAND AND IRELAND. 20 
 
5–2503. 21 
 
 (A) THE COMMISSION CONSISTS O F THE FOLLOWING MEMB ERS: 22 
 
 (1) THE SECRETARY, OR THE SECRETARY’S DESIGNEE; 23 
 
 (2) THE SECRETARY OF STATE, OR THE SECRETARY OF STATE’S 24 
DESIGNEE; 25 
 
 (3) TWO MEMBERS OF THE SENATE OF MARYLAND, APPOINTED BY 26 
THE PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE, WHO HAVE KNOWLEDGE O F ORGANIZATIONS THAT 27 
PROMOTE IRISH AFFAIRS, OR CURRENT OR PAST I NVOLVEMENT IN ORGANI ZATIONS 28   	HOUSE BILL 1206 	3 
 
 
THAT PROMOT E IRISH AFFAIRS, OR HAVE AN INTEREST IN THE WELL–BEING OF 1 
TRADE RELATIONS BETW EEN MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 2 
 
 (4) TWO MEMBERS OF THE HOUSE OF DELEGATES, APPOINTED BY 3 
THE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE, WHO HAVE KNOWLEDGE O F ORGANIZATIONS THAT 4 
PROMOTE IRISH AFFAIRS, OR CURRENT OR PAST INVO LVEMENT IN ORGANIZAT IONS 5 
THAT PROMOTE IRISH AFFAIRS, OR HAVE AN INTEREST IN THE WELL–BEING OF 6 
TRADE RELATIONS BETW EEN MARYLAND AND IRELAND; AND 7 
 
 (5) THE FOLLOWING MEMBER S, APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR, 8 
WITH THE ADVICE AND CONSENT OF THE SENATE: 9 
 
 (I) ONE REPRESENTATIVE O F A PUBLIC INSTITUTI ON OF 10 
HIGHER EDUCATION ; 11 
 
 (II) ONE REPRESENTATIVE O F THE MARYLAND CHAMBER OF 12 
COMMERCE OR ITS SUCCE SSOR ORGANIZATION ; AND 13 
 
 (III) TWO REPRESENTATIVES OF THE IRISH–AMERICAN 14 
COMMUNITY , WHO MAY NOT BE OF THE SAME POLITICA L PARTY. 15 
 
 (B) THE CHAIR AND VICE CH AIR OF THE COMMISSION SHALL BE E LECTED 16 
FROM AMONG THE MEMBE RS OF THE COMMISSION. 17 
 
 (C) A MEMBER OF THE BOARD: 18 
 
 (1) MAY NOT RECEIVE COMP ENSATION AS A MEMBER OF THE BOARD; 19 
BUT 20 
 
 (2) IS ENTITLED TO R EIMBURSEMENT FOR EXP ENSES UNDER THE 21 
STANDARD STATE TRAVEL REGULATIONS, AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET . 22 
 
 (D) (1) THE TERM OF AN APPOIN TED MEMBER IS 4 YEARS. 23 
 
 (2) THE TERMS OF THE APPO INTED MEMBERS ARE ST AGGERED AS 24 
REQUIRED BY THE TERM S PROVIDED FOR MEMBERS ON OCTOBER 1, 2024. 25 
 
 (3) AT THE END OF A TERM , A MEMBER CONTINUES T O SERVE UNTIL 26 
A SUCCESSOR IS APPOI NTED AND QUALIFIES . 27 
 
 (4) A MEMBER WHO IS APPOIN TED AFTER A TERM HAS BEGUN SERVES 28 
ONLY FOR THE REST OF THE TERM UNTIL A SUC CESSOR IS APPOINTED AND 29 
QUALIFIES. 30 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 1206  
 
 
 (5) THE GOVERNOR MAY REMOVE A N APPOINTED MEMBER F OR 1 
INCOMPETENCE , MISCONDUCT , OR FAILURE TO PERFOR M THE DUTIES OF THE 2 
POSITION. 3 
 
5–2504. 4 
 
 (A) THE COMMISSION SHALL STUD Y AND MAKE RECOMMEND ATIONS 5 
REGARDING: 6 
 
 (1) ADVANCING BILATERAL TRADE AND INVESTMENT BETWE EN 7 
MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 8 
 
 (2) INITIATING JOINT ACT ION ON POLICY ISSUES OF MUTUAL 9 
INTEREST TO MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 10 
 
 (3) PROMOTING BUSINESS A ND ACADEMIC EXCHANGE S BETWEEN 11 
MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 12 
 
 (4) ENCOURAGING MUTUAL E	CONOMIC SUPP ORT BETWEEN 13 
MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 14 
 
 (5) ENCOURAGING MUTUAL I NVESTMENT IN THE INF RASTRUCTURE 15 
OF MARYLAND AND IRELAND; AND 16 
 
 (6) OTHER ISSUES AS DETE RMINED BY THE COMMISSION. 17 
 
 (B) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2025, AND EACH DECEMBER 1 18 
THEREAFTER , THE COMMISSION SHALL REPO RT ITS FINDINGS AND 19 
RECOMMENDATIONS TO T HE GOVERNOR AND , IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF 20 
THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY. 21 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 22 
 
 (a) All initial appointments to the Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission shall be 23 
made not later than February 1, 2025. 24 
 
 (b) The terms of the initial appointed members of the Maryland–Ireland Trade 25 
Commission shall expire as follows: 26 
 
 (1) two members in 2025; and 27 
 
 (2) two members in 2026. 28 
 
 SECTION 3. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 29 
October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of September 30   	HOUSE BILL 1206 	5 
 
 
30, 2026, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 1 
abrogated and of no further force and effect. 2 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.