Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB130 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/08/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0130*  
  
HOUSE BILL 130 
P1, M5   	4lr0148 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 258 
By: Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request 	– 
Departmental – General Services) 
Requested: September 18, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of General Services – State Buildings and Facilities – Energy 2 
Conservation and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions 3 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the State’s goals for reducing energy consumption in State 4 
buildings; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to update the High 5 
Performance Green Building Program to ensure that the Program aligns with certain 6 
greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals; requiring the Department of General 7 
Services to identify State–owned facilities that are potential candidates for energy 8 
performance contracts; altering requirements for certain energy audits, data 9 
collection processes, and requests for proposals to address greenhouse gas emissions 10 
from State facilities; requiring each unit of State government to implement projects 11 
and initiatives to conserve energy and reduce the unit’s greenhouse gas emissions; 12 
and generally relating to the conservation of energy in, and reduction of greenhouse 13 
gas emissions from, State buildings and facilities.  14 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 15 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 16 
 Section 4–806 17 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 18 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement)  19 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 20 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 21 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 22 
 
4–806. 23 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 130  
 
 
 (a) So that it can audit and evaluate competing design proposals, the Department 1 
shall set standards for energy performance indices. 2 
 
 (b) As experience develops on the energy performance achieved in State buildings, 3 
the energy performance indices will serve as a measure of building performance with 4 
respect to energy consumption. 5 
 
 (c) The Department, in cooperation with the Maryland Energy Administration, 6 
shall assist State agencies in reducing, by [2029] 2031, the average energy consumption 7 
in State buildings by [10%] 20% from the level in fiscal year 2018. 8 
 
 [(d) Each year, the Department shall: 9 
 
 (1) analyze all State–owned buildings to identify which buildings are the 10 
least energy–efficient; and 11 
 
 (2) conduct an energy audit of at least 2,000,000 square feet of the least 12 
energy–efficient State–owned buildings. 13 
 
 (e) The energy audit shall identify low–cost measures for increasing energy 14 
efficiency that, over the following 5 years, will result in energy cost savings that meet or 15 
exceed the costs of the measures. 16 
 
 (f) The Department shall provide a copy of the energy audit to the head of each 17 
unit of State government that occupies the spaces audited. 18 
 
 (g) Each unit of State government that occupies the space audited shall 19 
implement the measures identified in the energy audit to the fullest extent practicable. 20 
 
 (h) For 1 year following the implementation of the measures identified in the 21 
energy audit, the Department shall: 22 
 
 (1) monitor the unit’s energy use; 23 
 
 (2) track any changes resulting from the measures; and 24 
 
 (3) calculate any savings on energy costs. 25 
 
 (i) (1) In this subsection, “Database” means the Comprehensive Utility 26 
Records Management Database. 27 
 
 (2) The Department shall establish and maintain the Comprehensive 28 
Utility Records Management Database for the purpose of tracking the changes in energy 29 
consumption resulting from the implementation of the measures identified in the energy 30 
audit. 31 
   	HOUSE BILL 130 	3 
 
 
 (3) The Department shall collect the data and information necessary to 1 
fully populate, update, and maintain the Database. 2 
 
 (4) Each month, each unit of State government shall make available to the 3 
Department all available data about its facilities and copies of the unit’s utility bills. 4 
 
 (j) Each unit of State government shall, in support of the unit’s core missions, 5 
implement projects and initiatives to conserve energy and reduce energy consumption. 6 
 
 (k) The Department, the Maryland Energy Administration, the Department of 7 
Budget and Management, and the Department of Information Technology shall collaborate 8 
on designing and implementing other cost–effective and energy–efficient savings 9 
initiatives. 10 
 
 (l) Beginning July 1, 2020, provisions promoting the State’s energy efficiency 11 
goals shall be included in requests for proposals that: 12 
 
 (1) are for the leasing of space to the State; and 13 
 
 (2) would obligate the State to pay the utility bills for the leased space. 14 
 
 (m) Each fiscal year, with the advice and assistance of the Maryland Energy 15 
Administration, the Department shall report to the Governor on the State’s progress 16 
toward achieving the goal of reducing energy consumption in State buildings by 10%.] 17 
 
 (D) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2024, THE MARYLAND GREEN BUILDING 18 
COUNCIL SHALL: 19 
 
 (1) UPDATE THE HIGH PERFORMANCE GREEN BUILDING PROGRAM 20 
AUTHORIZED UNDER § 3–602.1 OF THIS ARTICLE TO ENSUR E THAT ALL NEW 21 
BUILDINGS AND MAJOR RENOVATIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROGRAM ALIGN WITH TH E 22 
STATE’S GOAL OF ACHIEVING NET ZERO GREENHOUSE GAS EMISSIONS BY 2045; AND  23 
 
 (2) SUBMIT A COPY OF THE UPDATED PROGRAM TO THE GOVERNOR 24 
AND, IN ACCORDANC E WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, THE 25 
GENERAL ASSEMBLY. 26 
 
 (E) (1) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL IDEN TIFY STATE–OWNED FACILITIES 27 
THAT ARE POTENTIAL C ANDIDATES FOR ENERGY SAVINGS PERFORMANCE 28 
CONTRACTS.  29 
 
 (2) STATE AGENCIES SHALL PROVIDE ON–SITE SUPPORT TO WORK 30 
WITH THE DEPARTMENT AT FACILIT IES IDENTIFIED AS CA NDIDATES FOR ENERGY 31 
SAVINGS PERFORMANCE CONTRACTS UNDER THIS SUBSECTION. 32 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 130  
 
 
 (F) (1) EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COND UCT AN ENERGY AND 1 
GREENHOUSE GAS EMISS IONS AUDIT OF AT LEA ST 2,000,000 SQUARE FEET OF 2 
STATE–OWNED BUILDINGS . 3 
 
 (2) THE AUDIT SHALL INCLU DE BEST PRACTICES AN D IDENTIFY  4 
LOW–COST MEASURES FOR IN CREASING ENERGY EFFI CIENCY AND REDUCING 5 
GREENHOUSE GAS EMISS IONS. 6 
 
 (3) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL PROV IDE A COPY OF THE AU DIT TO THE 7 
HEAD OF EACH UNIT OF STATE GOVERNMENT THAT OCCUPIES THE SPACE A UDITED.  8 
 
 (4) (I) EACH UNIT OF STATE GOVERNMENT THAT OCCUPIES THE 9 
SPACE AUDITED SHALL , TO THE FULLEST EXTEN T PRACTICABLE , IMPLEMENT THE 10 
MEASURES IDENTIFIED IN THE AUDIT. 11 
 
 (II) FOR 1 YEAR FOLLOWING THE IMPLEMENTATION O F THE 12 
MEASURES IDENTIFIED IN THE AUDIT, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 13 
 
 1. MONITOR THE UNIT ’S ENERGY USE AND GRE ENHOUSE 14 
GAS EMISSIONS; 15 
 
 2. TRACK ANY CHANGES RE	SULTING FROM THE 16 
MEASURES; AND  17 
 
 3. CALCULATE ANY ENERGY COST SAVINGS AND 18 
EMISSIONS REDUCTIONS RESULTING FROM THE M EASURES. 19 
 
 (G) (1) IN THIS SUBSECTION , “DATABASE” MEANS THE COMPREHENSIVE 20 
UTILITY RECORDS MANAGEMENT DATABASE.  21 
 
 (2) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL RECO RD REDUCTIONS IN ENE RGY 22 
CONSUMPTION AND GREE NHOUSE GAS EMISSIONS RESULTING FROM THE 23 
ENERGY–SAVINGS MEASURES IN THE DATABASE. 24 
 
 (3) EACH MONTH OR ON REQU EST BY THE DEPARTMENT , EACH UNIT 25 
OF STATE GOVERNMENT SHAL L PROVIDE THE DEPARTMENT WITH ACCES S TO 26 
AVAILABLE DATA ABOUT THE UNIT’S FACILITIES AND COP IES OF THE UNIT’S UTILITY 27 
BILLS. 28 
 
 (4) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL REPO RT TO THE GOVERNOR 29 
ANNUALLY ON EACH UNI T’S DATA COMPLIANCE . 30 
   	HOUSE BILL 130 	5 
 
 
 (5) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL USE THE FACILITY DATA AN D UTILITY 1 
BILL INFORMATION PRO VIDED UNDER THIS SUB SECTION TO FULLY POP ULATE, 2 
UPDATE, AND MAINTAIN THE DATABASE. 3 
 
 (H) EACH UNIT OF STATE GOVERNMENT SHAL L, IN SUPPORT OF THE UN IT’S 4 
CORE MISSIONS , IMPLEMENT PROJECTS A ND INITIATIVES TO CO NSERVE ENERGY 5 
AND REDUCE THE UNIT ’S GREENHOUSE GAS EMI SSIONS.  6 
 
 (I) PROVISIONS PROMOTING THE STATE’S ENERGY EFFICIENCY AND 7 
GREENHOUSE GAS EMISSIO NS REDUCTION GOALS S HALL BE INCLUDED IN EACH 8 
REQUEST FOR PROPOSAL S THAT: 9 
 
 (1) IS FOR THE LEASING O F SPACE TO THE STATE; AND 10 
 
 (2) WOULD OBLIGATE THE STATE TO PAY THE UTIL ITY BILLS FOR THE 11 
LEASED SPACE . 12 
 
 (J) EACH FISCAL YEAR , THE DEPARTMENT SHALL REPORT TO THE 13 
GOVERNOR ON THE STATE’S PROGRESS TOWARD AC HIEVING THE GOAL OF 14 
REDUCING ENERGY CONS UMPTION IN STATE BUILDINGS BY 20%. 15 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 16 
1, 2024. 17