Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB133 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/08/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0133*  
  
HOUSE BILL 133 
P1   	4lr0433 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Delegates Bouchat, Boyce, Hill, Hinebaugh, Lehman, McComas, and Ruth 
Requested: June 20, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission to Study African American Civil War 3 
Soldiers in Maryland to study the history of the African American soldiers who 4 
fought for the Union Army and make certain recommendations regarding a memorial 5 
dedicated to African American Civil War soldiers; and generally relating to the 6 
Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland. 7 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 
That: 9 
 
 (a) There is a Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in 10 
Maryland. 11 
 
 (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 12 
 
 (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 13 
the Senate; 14 
 
 (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of the 15 
House; and 16 
 
 (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 17 
 
 (i) one representative from the State Archives; 18 
 
 (ii) one representative from the Department of Planning; 19 
 
 (iii) one representative from the Governor’s Commission on 20 
Maryland Military Monuments; 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 133  
 
 
 
 (iv) one representative from the Commission on African American 1 
History and Culture; 2 
 
 (v) one representative from Preservation Maryland, Inc.; and 3 
 
 (vi) one representative from the Heart of the Civil War Heritage 4 
Area, Inc. 5 
 
 (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Commission. 6 
 
 (d) The State Archives shall provide staff for the Commission. 7 
 
 (e) A member of the Commission: 8 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Commission; but 9 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 10 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 11 
 
 (f) The Commission shall: 12 
 
 (1) study the history of African American Civil War soldiers who fought for 13 
the Union Army in Maryland, including muster rolls, locations of service, and all 14 
distinguished honors and recognitions awarded; and 15 
 
 (2) make findings and recommendations regarding the funding, design, 16 
construction, and location of an appropriate memorial dedicated to the African American 17 
Civil War soldiers in Maryland. 18 
 
 (g) On or before December 1, 2024, the Commission shall report its findings and 19 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 20 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 21 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 22 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 23 
Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 24 
further force and effect. 25