Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB139 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/20/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0139*  
  
HOUSE BILL 139 
N1, O1   	4lr0832 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 171 
By: Delegate Charkoudian Delegates Charkoudian , Allen, Foley, Holmes, 
Lehman, J. Long, Love, Ruth, Stewart, and Terrasa 
Requested: October 3, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 20, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Landlord and Tenant – Office of Home Energy Programs Notice of Utility Bills 2 
in Residential Leases – Financial Assistance Gas and Electric Services 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring a landlord to accept financial assistance from the Office of 4 
Home Energy Programs in the Department of Human Services for the cost of utility 5 
services that a tenant is required to pay; requiring a landlord, under certain 6 
circumstances, to provide a tenant with utility service documentation that is 7 
necessary for the Office to determine the eligibility of the tenant for financial 8 
assistance adding gas and electric utility services to the types of utility services for 9 
which certain landlords are required to provide a certain notice in a written lease 10 
and a copy of a certain receipt or bill summary under certain circumstances; and 11 
generally relating to landlords, tenants, and the Office of Home Energy Programs 12 
required provisions in written leases. 13 
 
BY adding to repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Real Property 15 
Section 8–220 8–205.1 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 139  
 
 
Article – Real Property 1 
 
8–205.1. 2 
 
 (a) In this section, “utility service provider” means a public service company or a 3 
unit of State or local government that provides water [or], sewer, GAS, OR ELECTRIC 4 
utility services. 5 
 
 (b) [(1) This section applies only to a landlord of a building that contains one or 6 
two residential dwelling units. 7 
 
 (2)] This section does not apply to a landlord [that]: 8 
 
 (1) THAT requires a tenant, under an oral or written lease, to pay water 9 
[or], sewer, GAS, OR ELECTRIC bills directly to the utility service provider; OR 10 
 
 (2) FOR ANY UTILITY THAT IS ALLOCATED USING A RATIO UTILITY 11 
BILLING SYSTEM , AS DEFINED IN § 8–212.4 OF THIS SUBTITLE . 12 
 
 (c) A landlord that requires a tenant to make payments for water [or], sewer, 13 
GAS, OR ELECTRIC utility services to the landlord shall: 14 
 
 (1) Use a written lease that provides notice that the tenant is responsible 15 
for making payments for water [or], sewer, GAS, OR ELECTRIC utility services to the 16 
landlord; and 17 
 
 (2) (I) Provide a copy of the water [or], sewer, GAS, OR ELECTRIC bill 18 
to the tenant; OR 19 
 
 (II) BEFORE THE BEGINNING OF THE INITIAL LEASE AND EACH 20 
TERM THEREAFTER FOR THE DURATION OF THE TENANCY, NOTIFY THE TENANT IN 21 
WRITING OF THE TOTAL UTILITY COSTS BILLED TO THE LANDLORD IN THE 22 
IMMEDIATELY PRECEDIN G YEAR FOR WATER , SEWER, GAS, OR ELECTRIC UTILITY 23 
SERVICES, DISAGGREGATED BY UTI LITY TYPE. 24 
 
8–220. 25 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 26 
INDICATED. 27 
 
 (2) “OFFICE” MEANS THE OFFICE OF HOME ENERGY PROGRAMS IN 28 
THE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES. 29 
   	HOUSE BILL 139 	3 
 
 
 (3) “UTILITY SERVICE” MEANS FUEL, GAS, ELECTRIC, HEAT, WATER, 1 
OR A SIMILAR SERVICE PROVIDED BY A PUBLIC SERVICE COMPA NY THAT IS 2 
REGULATED BY THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION. 3 
 
 (B) A LANDLORD SHALL ACCEPT FINANCI AL ASSISTANCE FROM T HE 4 
OFFICE FOR THE COST OF UTILITY SERVICES THAT A TENANT IS REQUIRED TO PAY. 5 
 
 (C) (1) SUBJECT TO THE CONFIDENTIALITY REQU IREMENTS OF STATE 6 
AND FEDERAL LAW , AND ON THE REQUEST OF A TENANT , A LANDLORD SHALL 7 
PROVIDE A TENANT WITH UTILITY SERVICE DOCUMENTATION THAT IS: 8 
 
 (I) ACCESSIBLE TO THE LANDLORD , BUT OTHERWISE 9 
INACCESSIBLE TO THE TENANT; AND 10 
 
 (II) NECESSARY FOR THE OFFICE TO DETERMINE THE 11 
ELIGIBILITY OF THE TENANT FOR FINANCIAL ASSIST ANCE. 12 
 
 (2) UTILITY SERVICE DOCUMENTATION UNDER P ARAGRAPH (1) OF 13 
THIS SUBSECTION SHALL: 14 
 
 (I) BE PROVIDED AT NO COS T TO THE TENANT ; AND 15 
 
 (II) INCLUDE BILLS AND OTHER STATEMENTS RELATED TO 16 
UTILITY SERVICES . 17 
 
 (D) (1) FOR EACH VIOLATION OF THIS SECTION BY A LANDLORD , THE 18 
DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES MAY IMPOSE: 19 
 
 (I) FOR A FIRST OFFENSE , AN ADMINISTRATIVE PEN ALTY OF 20 
$500; OR 21 
 
 (II) FOR A SECOND OR SUBSE	QUENT OFFENSE , AN 22 
ADMINISTRATIVE PENAL TY OF $1,000. 23 
 
 (2) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL PAY ANY PENALTY COLLECTED UNDER 24 
THIS SUBSECTION INTO THE GENERAL FUND OF THE STATE. 25 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 26 
October 1, 2024. 27