Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1451 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/09/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1451*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1451 
C8   	4lr3473 
    	CF SB 764 
By: Delegate Embry 
Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2024 
Assigned to: Appropriations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Workgroup to study how arts and 3 
cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally relating to the Arts 4 
Incubator Workgroup.   5 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 
That: 7 
 
 (a) There is an Arts Incubator Workgroup. 8 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 9 
 
 (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate; 10 
 
 (2) one individual, appointed by the Speaker of the House; and 11 
 
 (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 12 
 
 (i) two artists; 13 
 
 (ii) one artist who is an arts educator; 14 
 
 (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 15 
audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people; 16 
 
 (iv) two members of local arts councils; 17 
 
 (v) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 18 
audience of more than 250 people; and 19 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1451  
 
 
 (vi) two members of the public who support the arts.  1 
 
 (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the 2 
members of the Workgroup. 3 
 
 (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 4 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup: 5 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 6 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 7 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 8 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall study how arts and cultural institutions can support 9 
local artists. 10 
 
 (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024, the Workgroup shall submit a preliminary 11 
report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind 12 
services that are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in 13 
accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 14 
 
 (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report 15 
on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that 16 
are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with 17 
§ 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 18 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 19 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of 20 
December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall 21 
be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 22