Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1451 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/06/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LA W. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
         Italics indicate opposite chamber/conference committee amendments. 
          *hb1451*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1451 
C8   	(4lr3473) 
ENROLLED BILL 
— Appropriations/Finance — 
Introduced by Delegate Embry 
 
Read and Examined by Proofreaders: 
 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
 
Sealed with the Great Seal and presented to the Governor, for his approval this 
  
_______ day of _______________ at _________________ _______ o’clock, ________M. 
  
______________________________________________ 
Speaker.  
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing 2 
Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really 4 
Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup to 5 
study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally 6 
relating to the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing 7 
Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup.  8 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9 
That: 10 
 
 (a) There is an Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really 11 
Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art an Arts Incubator Workgroup. 12 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1451  
 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 1 
 
 (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate; 2 
 
 (2) one individual, appointed by the Speaker of the House; and 3 
 
 (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 4 
 
 (i) two three artists; 5 
 
 (ii) one artist who is an arts educator; 6 
 
 (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 7 
audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people; 8 
 
 (iv) two members of local arts councils; 9 
 
 (v) one member of the Maryland State Arts Council; 10 
 
 (vi) two members of local arts districts, each from a different 11 
geographical area of the State; 12 
 
 (vii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 13 
audience of more than 250 people; and 14 
 
 (vi) (vii) (viii) two members of the public who support the arts.  15 
 
 (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the 16 
members of the Workgroup. 17 
 
 (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 18 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup: 19 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 20 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 21 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 22 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall study how arts and cultural institutions can support 23 
local artists. 24 
 
 (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall 25 
submit a preliminary report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, 26 
facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists 27 
findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support 28   	HOUSE BILL 1451 	3 
 
 
artists in other areas to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 1 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 2 
 
 (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report 3 
on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that 4 
are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with 5 
§ 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 6 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHE R ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 7 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of 8 
December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall 9 
be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 10 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.