Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1451 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/15/2024

                     	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 613 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 613 
(House Bill 1451) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing 
Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really 
Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup to 
study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally 
relating to the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing 
Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup.  
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That: 
 
 (a) There is an Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really 
Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art an Arts Incubator Workgroup. 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 
 
 (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate; 
 
 (2) one individual, appointed by the Speaker of the House; and 
 
 (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 
 
 (i) two three artists; 
 
 (ii) one artist who is an arts educator; 
 
 (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 
audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people; 
 
 (iv) two members of local arts councils; 
 
 (v) one member of the Maryland State Arts Council; 
 
 (vi) two members of local arts districts, each from a different 
geographical area of the State; 
 
 (vii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 
audience of more than 250 people; and 
 
 (vi) (vii) (viii) two members of the public who support the arts.   Ch. 613 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 
 (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the 
members of the Workgroup. 
 
 (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup: 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall study how arts and cultural institutions can support 
local artists. 
 
 (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall 
submit a preliminary report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, 
facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists 
findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support 
artists in other areas to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 
 
 (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report 
on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that 
are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with 
§ 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of 
December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall 
be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 
 
Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024.