Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1509 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/02/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1509*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1509 
M3   	4lr3470 
    	CF SB 1174 
By: Delegate Stein Delegates Stein, Allen, Guyton, and Ruth 
Introduced and read first time: February 21, 2024 
Assigned to: Rules and Executive Nominations 
Re–referred to: Environment and Transportation, February 26, 2024 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 18, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Baltimore Regional Water Governance Model Workgroup – Established 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Baltimore Regional Water Governance Model 3 
Workgroup to study the regional water governance approach in the Baltimore region; 4 
and generally relating to the Baltimore Regional Water Governance Model 5 
Workgroup. 6 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 7 
That: 8 
 
 (a) There is a Baltimore Regional Water Governance Model Workgroup. 9 
 
 (b) (1) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 10 
 
 (i) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the 11 
President of the Senate; 12 
 
 (ii) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker 13 
of the House; 14 
 
 (iii) two members appointed by the Governor; 15 
 
 (iv) five members appointed by the Mayor of Baltimore City, 16 
including: 17  2 	HOUSE BILL 1509  
 
 
 
 1. one member who represents the current workforce 1 
responsible for the operation and maintenance of the water distribution system; and 2 
 
 2. one member from a labor organization that is the exclusive 3 
representative for Baltimore City employees; 4 
 
 (v) three members appointed by the County Executive of Baltimore 5 
County; and 6 
 
 (vi) one member from either Anne Arundel County, Carroll County, 7 
Howard County, or Harford County, appointed by the Chair of the Baltimore Metropolitan 8 
Council. 9 
 
 (2) Each member shall: 10 
 
 (i) have knowledge of: 11 
 
 1. water resources management and protection; 12 
 
 2. the management and operation of water or wastewater 13 
systems or comparable expertise; 14 
 
 3. environmental finance; 15 
 
 4. human resources management; or 16 
 
 5. environmental justice and equity; or 17 
 
 (ii) represent ratepayers in their respective jurisdictions. 18 
 
 (c) The Mayor of Baltimore City and the County Executive of Baltimore County 19 
shall jointly designate a chair of the Workgroup. 20 
 
 (d) The Mayor of Baltimore City and the County Executive of Baltimore County 21 
shall jointly provide staff for the Workgroup. 22 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup: 23 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 24 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 25 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 26 
 
 (f) (1) The Workgroup shall strive for consensus among its members. 27 
 
 (2) An affirmative vote of 10 members is needed for the Workgroup to act. 28   	HOUSE BILL 1509 	3 
 
 
 
 (g) The Workgroup shall: 1 
 
 (1) review the report of the Baltimore Regional Water Governance Task 2 
Force submitted in accordance with Chapter 179 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 3 
2023; 4 
 
 (2) analyze the issues relevant to implementing a regional water 5 
governance model in the Baltimore region, including: 6 
 
 (i) 1. developing an equity analysis to analyze how the shift to 7 
a regional water governance model affects vulnerable residents in the area; and 8 
 
 2. recommending programs to assist potentially affected 9 
residents during the implementation; 10 
 
 (ii) developing a financial transition plan to analyze how 11 
implementing a regional water governance model affects the finances of each jurisdiction 12 
within the governance area, including pension and benefit commitments and debt service; 13 
 
 (iii) assessing the available workforce for a regional water 14 
governance model, including hiring new employees and transitioning existing employees 15 
from Baltimore City and applicable counties to a regional water governance model; 16 
 
 (iv) reviewing any legal and legislative actions required for 17 
transitioning to a regional water governance model, including analyzing changes needed to 18 
the applicable city and county codes and charters; and 19 
 
 (v) assessing the administrative and operational changes required 20 
for implementing a regional water governance model, including whether stormwater 21 
management would fall under the purview of a regional water governance model; 22 
 
 (3) analyze whether creating a City–County Rate Board is necessary to: 23 
 
 (i) ensure fairness for consumers; and 24 
 
 (ii) balance city and county rates; and 25 
 
 (4) review the regional governance models recommended in the report of 26 
the Baltimore Regional Water Governance Task Force submitted in accordance with 27 
Chapter 179 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2023 and other existing and potential 28 
regional water and wastewater governance models to assess how different regional 29 
approaches may improve: 30 
 
 (i) management; 31 
 
 (ii) operations; 32  4 	HOUSE BILL 1509  
 
 
 
 (iii) employee recruitment; 1 
 
 (iv) retention and training; 2 
 
 (v) billing and collections; 3 
 
 (vi) planning for capital improvements; 4 
 
 (vii) emergency management; and 5 
 
 (viii) rate stability for customers. 6 
 
 (h) (1) The Workgroup shall hire independent consultants to facilitate the 7 
requirements of subsection (g) of this section, including: 8 
 
 (i) outside counsel to assist with the analysis of issues related to 9 
regional governance; and 10 
 
 (ii) experts in equity analysis. 11 
 
 (2) For fiscal year 2026, the Governor shall include in the annual budget 12 
bill an appropriation of $500,000 for the purpose of hiring independent consultants under 13 
paragraph (1) of this subsection. 14 
 
 (i) On or before June 30, 2027, the Workgroup shall report its findings to the 15 
Mayor of Baltimore City, the County Executive of Baltimore County, the Governor, and, in 16 
accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 17 
 
 (j) In developing the report required under subsection (i) of this section, the 18 
Workgroup: 19 
 
 (1) shall consult with the Office of the Attorney General and the 20 
Department of the Environment; and 21 
 
 (2) may not consider or make recommendations related to a privately 22 
operated regional water governance model. 23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 24 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 3 years and, at the end of June 30, 2027, 25 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 26 
of no further force and effect.  27