Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB154 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/13/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0154*  
  
HOUSE BILL 154 
Q1   	4lr0014 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 286 
By: Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request – Departmental – Assessments 
and Taxation) 
Requested: September 10, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 13, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension for 2 
Homeowner Protection Program Enrollees 3 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to 4 
accept an application for the homeowners’ property tax credit submitted by a certain 5 
homeowner within a certain period of time if the homeowner is enrolled in the 6 
Homeowner Protection Program; and generally relating to the homeowners’ property 7 
tax credit. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 9 
 Article – Tax – Property 10 
 Section 9–104(u) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Tax – Property 16 
 
9–104. 17 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 154  
 
 
 (u) (1) Under the conditions set forth in this subsection, the Department may 1 
accept an application from a homeowner within: 2 
 
 (i) 1 year after April 15 of the taxable year for which the property 3 
tax credit under this section is sought, if the homeowner: 4 
 
 1. is applying for the first time; or 5 
 
 2. has filed an application on or before October 1 in each of 6 
the 3 taxable years immediately preceding the taxable year for which the credit is sought; 7 
or 8 
 
 (ii) 3 years after April 15 of the taxable year for which a credit is 9 
sought, if the homeowner IS: 10 
 
 1. A. [is] at least 70 years old as of the taxable year for 11 
which a credit is sought; [and] OR 12 
 
 B. ENROLLED IN THE HOMEOWNER PROTECTION 13 
PROGRAM ESTABLISH ED UNDER TITLE 14, SUBTITLE 8, PART VII OF THIS ARTICLE; 14 
AND 15 
 
 2. was eligible for the credit under this section for the taxable 16 
year for which the credit is sought.  17 
 
 (2) A homeowner may apply to the Department for a property tax credit 18 
under this section by filing an application on the form that the Department provides. 19 
 
 (3) The homeowner shall state under oath that the facts in the application 20 
are true. 21 
 
 (4) To substantiate the application, the Department may require the 22 
homeowner to provide a copy of an income tax return, or other evidence detailing gross 23 
income or net worth. 24 
 
 (5) On certification by the Department, the Comptroller shall pay to the 25 
homeowner the property tax credit due under this section. 26 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED , That this Act shall take effect June 27 
1, 2024, and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024. 28