Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB154 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/09/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
         Italics indicate opposite chamber/conference committee amendments. 
          *hb0154*  
  
HOUSE BILL 154 
Q1   	(4lr0014) 
ENROLLED BILL 
— Ways and Means/Budget and Taxation — 
Introduced by Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request – Departmental – 
Assessments and Taxation) 
 
Read and Examined by Proofreaders: 
 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
 
Sealed with the Great Seal and presented to the Governor, for his ap proval this 
  
_______ day of _______________ at ________________________ o’clock, ________M. 
  
______________________________________________ 
Speaker.  
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension for 2 
Homeowner Protection Program Enrollees  3 
Homeowners’ and Homestead Property Tax Credits – Application Filing Deadline 4 
– Extension 5 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to 6 
accept an application for the homeowners’ property tax credit submitted by a certain 7 
homeowner within a certain period of time if the homeowner is enrolled in the 8 
Homeowner Protection Program; providing for the calculation of the homestead 9 
property tax credit for certain homeowners under certain circumstances; and 10 
generally relating to the homeowners’ and homestead property tax credit credits. 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 
 Article – Tax – Property 13  2 	HOUSE BILL 154  
 
 
 Section 9–104(u) 1 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 2 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 3 
 
BY adding to 4 
 Article – Tax – Property 5 
Section 9–105(d)(8) 6 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 7 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement)  8 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 10 
 
Article – Tax – Property 11 
 
9–104. 12 
 
 (u) (1) Under the conditions set forth in this subsection, the Department may 13 
accept an application from a homeowner within: 14 
 
 (i) 1 year after April 15 of the taxable year for which the property 15 
tax credit under this section is sought, if the homeowner: 16 
 
 1. is applying for the first time; or 17 
 
 2. has filed an application on or before October 1 in each of 18 
the 3 taxable years immediately preceding the taxable year for which the credit is sought; 19 
or 20 
 
 (ii) 3 years after April 15 of the taxable year for which a credit is 21 
sought, if the homeowner IS: 22 
 
 1. A. [is] at least 70 years old as of the taxable year for 23 
which a credit is sought; [and] OR 24 
 
 B. ENROLLED IN THE HOMEOWNER PROTECTION 25 
PROGRAM ESTABLISHED U NDER TITLE 14, SUBTITLE 8, PART VII OF THIS ARTICLE; 26 
AND 27 
 
 2. was eligible for the credit under this section for the taxable 28 
year for which the credit is sought.  29 
 
 (2) A homeowner may apply to the Department for a property tax credit 30 
under this section by filing an application on the form that the Department provides. 31 
   	HOUSE BILL 154 	3 
 
 
 (3) The homeowner shall state under oath that the facts in the application 1 
are true. 2 
 
 (4) To substantiate the application, the Department may require the 3 
homeowner to provide a copy of an income tax return, or other evidence detailing gross 4 
income or net worth. 5 
 
 (5) On certification by the Department, the Comptroller shall pay to the 6 
homeowner the property tax credit due under this section. 7 
 
9–105. 8 
 
 (d) (8) (I) THIS PARAGRAPH SHALL BE INTERPRETED BROAD LY TO 9 
APPLY TO ANY HOMEOWN ER WHO: 10 
 
 1. IS AT LEAST 70 YEARS OF AGE;  11 
 
 2. WAS ELIGIBLE FOR THE CREDIT IN THE PRIOR 12 
TAXABLE YEAR BUT FAI LED TO FILE AN APPLI CATION FOR THE CREDI T; AND 13 
 
 3. APPLIES FOR A CREDIT FOR THE CURRENT TAXA BLE 14 
YEAR. 15 
 
 (II) FOR HOMEOWNERS THAT M EET THE CRITERIA UND ER 16 
SUBPARAGRAPH (I) OF THIS PARAGRAPH , THE DEPARTMENT SHALL CALC ULATE THE 17 
CURRENT YEAR ’S TAXABLE ASSESSMENT AS IF THE CREDIT HAD BEEN GRANTED FOR 18 
THE PRIOR TAXABLE YE AR. 19 
 
 (III) A HOMEOWNER WHO MEETS 	THE CRITERIA UNDER 20 
SUBPARAGRAPH (I) OF THIS PARAGRAPH I S NOT DUE A REIMBURS EMENT OF 21 
PROPERTY TAXES PAID IN PRIOR TAXABLE YEA RS. 22 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 23 
 
 (a) Notwithstanding any other provision in § 9–105 of the Tax – Property Article 24 
as enacted under Section 1 of this Act, this Section shall be interpreted broadly to apply to 25 
any homeowner, as defined under § 9–105 of the Tax – Property Article, who: 26 
 
 (1) is at least 70 years of age;  27 
 
 (2) was eligible for the homestead credit in the second prior taxable year but 28 
failed to file an application for the credit; and 29 
 
 (3) on or before May 31, 2025, applies for a credit for the current taxable 30 
year. 31 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 154  
 
 
 (b) For homeowners that meet the criteria under subsection (a) of this section, the 1 
State Department of Assessments and Taxation shall calculate the current year’s taxable 2 
assessment as if the credit had been granted for the two prior taxable years. 3 
 
 (c) A homeowner who meets the criteria of this Section is not due a reimbursement 4 
of property taxes paid in prior taxable years. 5 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall be 6 
applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024. 7 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall be 8 
applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.  9 
 
 SECTION 2. 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 10 
June 1, 2024,. and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024. 11 
Section 2 of this Act shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 1 month and, at the end 12 
of June 30, 2025, Section 2 of this Act, with no further action required by the General 13 
Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 14 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.