Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB167 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/17/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0167*  
  
HOUSE BILL 167 
F1   	4lr0420 
HB 15/20 – W&M 	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Delegate Harrison 
Requested: August 2, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 8, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Schools – Student Health – Certificate of Dental Health Information on 2 
Accessible Dental Health 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning in a certain school year, certain students to submit 4 
a certificate of dental health to their school on a certain schedule; requiring the State 5 
Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, 6 
to adopt certain regulations and to develop and disseminate a certain form to county 7 
boards of education and certain parents and guardians; requiring the State 8 
Department of Education to support and facilitate each county board of education in 9 
publishing certain information on dental health in a certain manner; and generally 10 
relating to public schools and a certificate of dental health.  11 
 
BY adding to 12 
 Article – Education 13 
Section 7–402.1 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 17 
 Article – Education 18 
Section 4–111.2 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement)  21 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 167  
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Education 3 
 
7–402.1. 4 
 
 (A) BEGINNING IN THE 2026–2027 SCHOOL YEAR , EACH STUDENT 5 
ENROLLED IN A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY OR SECOND ARY SCHOOL IN THE STATE SHALL 6 
SUBMIT TO THE SCHOOL A CERTIFICATE OF DENTAL HEALTH ON A S CHEDULE 7 
ESTABLISHED BY THE DEPARTMENT . 8 
 
 (B) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 9 
 
 (1) IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF 10 
HEALTH, ADOPT REGULATIONS TO ESTABLISH: 11 
 
 (I) STANDARDS FOR PERIODI C DENTAL EXAMINATION S; AND 12 
 
 (II) A SCHEDULE FOR THE SUBMISSION OF A CERTIFICATE OF 13 
DENTAL HEALTH BY STU DENTS; AND 14 
 
 (2) DEVELOP AND DISSEMINA TE A STANDARD FORM F	OR A 15 
CERTIFICATE OF DENTA L HEALTH AS REQUIRED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS 16 
SECTION TO THE COUNT Y BOARDS AND THE PAR ENTS AND GUARDIANS O F STUDENTS 17 
IN PUBLIC ELEMENTARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOL S. 18 
 
4–111.2. 19 
 
 The Department shall: 20 
 
 (1) Support and facilitate oral health education, including oral disease 21 
prevention and dental health promotion, in every county; 22 
 
 (2) Develop a process to monitor implementation of oral health education; 23 
[and] 24 
 
 (3) SUPPORT AND FACILITAT E EACH COUNTY BOARD IN PUBLISHING 25 
INFORMATION ON FINAN CIALLY ACCESSIBLE DE NTAL HEALTH AVAILABL E IN THE 26 
COUNTY IN STUDENT HA NDBOOKS AND ON LOCAL SCHOOL SYSTEM WEBSITES ; AND 27 
 
 [(3)] (4) On or before December 1, 2015, and every 5 years thereafter, 28 
submit to the Governor and, subject to § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the 29 
General Assembly a summary of the information reported by the Department to the State 30 
Superintendent during the certification of the Health Education State Curriculum.  31   	HOUSE BILL 167 	3 
 
 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1 
October 1, 2024. 2 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.