Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB2 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/14/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0002*  
  
HOUSE BILL 2 
Q2   	4lr0817 
HB 231/23 – W&M 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 138 
By: Delegates Boyce, Clippinger, Conaway, and R. Lewis 
Requested: October 3, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 3, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Baltimore City – Property Taxes – Authority of Counties to Establish a Subclass 2 
and Set a Special Rate for Vacant and Abandoned Property 3 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the 4 
governing body of a county to establish, by law, a subclass of real property consisting 5 
of certain vacant and abandoned property and to set a special property tax rate for 6 
certain vacant and abandoned property; and generally relating to a special property 7 
tax rate for vacant and abandoned property. 8 
 
BY adding to 9 
 Article – Tax – Property 10 
Section 6–202.1 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement)  13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Tax – Property 15 
Section 6–302 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 2  
 
 
Article – Tax – Property 1 
 
6–202.1. 2 
 
 THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE GOVERNING 3 
BODY OF A COUNTY MAY ESTABLISH, BY LAW, A SUBCLASS OF REAL P ROPERTY 4 
CONSISTING OF VACANT LOTS OR IMPROVED PRO PERTY CITED AS VACAN T AND 5 
UNFIT FOR HABITATION OR OTHER AUTHORIZED USE ON A HOUSING OR BUILDING 6 
VIOLATION NOTICE .  7 
 
6–302. 8 
 
 (a) Except as otherwise provided in this section and after complying with § 6–305 9 
of this subtitle, in each year after the date of finality and before the following July 1, the 10 
Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of each county annually 11 
shall set the tax rate for the next taxable year on all assessments of property subject to that 12 
county’s property tax. 13 
 
 (b) (1) Except as provided in subsection (c) of this section[,] AND §§ 6–305 and  14 
6–306 of this subtitle [and § 6–203 of this title]: 15 
 
 (i) there shall be a single county property tax rate for all real 16 
property subject to county property tax except for operating real property described in §  17 
8–109(c) of this article; and 18 
 
 (ii) the county tax rate applicable to personal property and the 19 
operating real property described in § 8–109(c) of this article shall be no more than 2.5 20 
times the rate for real property. 21 
 
 (2) Paragraph (1) of this subsection does not affect a special rate prevailing 22 
in a taxing district or part of a county. 23 
 
 [(c) (1) Intangible personal property is subject to county property tax as 24 
otherwise provided in this title at a rate set annually, if: 25 
 
 (i) the intangible personal property has paid interest or dividends 26 
during the 12 months that precede the date of finality; 27 
 
 (ii) interest or dividends were withheld on the intangible personal 28 
property during the 12 months that precede the date of finality to avoid the tax under this 29 
subsection; 30 
 
 (iii) the intangible personal property consists of newly issued bonds, 31 
certificates of indebtedness, or evidences of debt on which interest is not in default; or 32 
   	HOUSE BILL 2 	3 
 
 
 (iv) a stock dividend has been declared on the intangible personal 1 
property during the 12 months that precede the date of finality. 2 
 
 (2) The county tax rate for the intangible personal property is 30 cents for 3 
each $100 of assessment.] 4 
 
 (C) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 5 
GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY MAY SET A SPECIAL RATE FOR A VACANT LOT OR 6 
IMPROVED PROPERTY CI TED AS VACANT AND UN FIT FOR HABITATION OR OTHER 7 
AUTHORIZED USE ON A HOUSING OR BUILDING VIOLATION NOTICE . 8 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 9 
1, 2024, and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024. 10 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.