Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB209 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/04/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0209*  
  
HOUSE BILL 209 
E5, E4, F5   	4lr1292 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 623 
By: Delegate Amprey Delegates Amprey, Conaway, Kaufman, Williams, Embry, 
Phillips, and Taylor 
Requested: October 31, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Judiciary 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 22, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission to 3 
develop recommendations relating to education and its impact on the criminal justice 4 
system; and generally relating to the Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission.  5 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 
That: 7 
 
 (a) There is a Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission. 8 
 
 (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 9 
 
 (1) three members of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President 10 
of the Senate; 11 
 
 (2) three members of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of 12 
the House; 13 
 
 (3) the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services, or the 14 
Secretary’s designee; 15 
 
 (4) the Secretary of Juvenile Services, or the Secretary’s designee; 16  2 	HOUSE BILL 209  
 
 
 
 (5) the Attorney General, or the Attorney General’s designee; 1 
 
 (6) the Public Defender of Maryland, or the Public Defender’s designee; 2 
 
 (7) a representative of the Maryland Judiciary, appointed by the Chief 3 
Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland; 4 
 
 (8) the Secretary of the Maryland Higher Education Commission, or the 5 
Secretary’s designee; 6 
 
 (9) the Secretary of Labor, or the Secretary’s designee; 7 
 
 (10) the State Superintendent of Schools, or the State Superintendent’s 8 
designee; and 9 
 
 (11) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 10 
 
 (i) a national expert on correctional education issues; 11 
 
 (ii) a representative of a foundation with expertise in correctional 12 
education systems; 13 
 
 (iii) a representative of local law enforcement agencies; 14 
 
 (iv) a representative of the Maryland State’s Attorney’s Association; 15 
 
 (v) a representative of an adult prison services provider bureau; 16 
 
 (vi) a representative from a restorative justice organization; 17 
 
 (vii) a representative from the Goucher College Prison Education 18 
Partnership; 19 
 
 (viii) a representative of Maryland Correctional Enterprises;  20 
 
 (vii) (ix) two individuals who are or were under the supervision of 21 
the Division of Correction; and 22 
 
 (viii) (x) any other member with expertise relevant to the work of 23 
the Commission. 24 
 
 (c) The Governor shall appoint the chair of the Commission. 25 
 
 (d) The Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services shall 26 
provide staff for the Commission. 27 
   	HOUSE BILL 209 	3 
 
 
 (e) A member of the Commission may not receive compensation as a member of 1 
the Commission. 2 
 
 (f) The Commission shall: 3 
 
 (1) convene an advisory stakeholder group that includes organizations 4 
with experience in: 5 
 
 (i) criminal justice policy reform; 6 
 
 (ii) advocating for individuals with learning disabilities and those 7 
from marginalized communities; and 8 
 
 (iii) restorative justice; and 9 
 
 (iv) peer recovery and support services;  10 
 
 (2) work with the advisory stakeholder group, including conducting 11 
roundtable discussion forums seeking public input in all geographic regions of the State; 12 
 
 (3) develop an education–focused statewide framework of policies to invest 13 
in strategies to increase public safety and reduce recidivism of adult offenders, using a 14 
data–driven approach; 15 
 
 (4) research best practices for the primary, secondary, postsecondary, and 16 
career or vocational education of those who are subject to the criminal and juvenile justice 17 
systems; 18 
 
 (5) identify measures to mitigate risk factors that contribute to adult 19 
contact with the criminal justice system, with a focus on education; and 20 
 
 (6) evaluate current workforce programs in which incarcerated individuals 21 
participate and the programs’ effectiveness in training for employment opportunities that 22 
result in living wages; and  23 
 
 (6) (7) request technical assistance from: 24 
 
 (i) the Abell Foundation; 25 
 
 (ii) the Annie E. Casey Foundation; 26 
 
 (iii) the Council of State Governments; 27 
 
 (iv) the Vera Institute of Justice; 28 
 
 (v) the Coalition on Adult Basic Education; 29 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 209  
 
 
 (vi) the RAND Corporation; and 1 
 
 (vii) other organizations similar to the organizations under items (i) 2 
through (vi) of this item. 3 
 
 (g) (1) On or before June 1, 2025, the Commission shall submit an interim 4 
report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with §  5 
2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 6 
 
 (2) On or before January 1, 2026, the Commission shall submit a final 7 
report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with §  8 
2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 9 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, Th at this Act shall take effect June 10 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and 1 month and, at the end of June 11 
30, 2026, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 12 
abrogated and of no further force and effect.  13 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.