Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB211 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/21/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0211*  
  
HOUSE BILL 211 
C2, C3   	4lr1283 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 648 
By: Delegate Taveras 
Requested: October 30, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Economic Matters 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted with floor amendments 
Read second time: February 21, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Business Regulation – Contractors, Subcontractors, and Brokers – Prohibited 2 
Conduct  3 
 
FOR the purpose of prohibiting a person from serving or acting as a contractor, a 4 
subcontractor, or a broker between a contractor and subcontractor during a certain 5 
period after the person was convicted of a certain offense under federal or state law; 6 
and generally relating to contractors, subcontractors, and brokers. 7 
 
BY adding to 8 
 Article – Business Regulation 9 
Section 19–107 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – Business Regulation 15 
 
19–107. 16 
 
 A PERSON MAY NOT SERVE OR ACT AS A CONTRACTOR , A SUBCONTRACTOR , OR 17 
A BROKER BETWEEN A CON TRACTOR AND SUBCONTR ACTOR IN THE STATE DURING 18 
THE 5–YEAR PERIOD IMMEDIAT ELY FOLLOWING THE DA TE THE PERSON WAS 19  2 	HOUSE BILL 211  
 
 
CONVICTED OF AN OFFE	NSE CONSTITUTING CRI MINAL MALFEASANCE , 1 
MISFEASANCE , OR NONFEASANCE UNDER ANY FEDERAL OR STATE LAW. 2 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 3 
October 1, 2024.  4 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.