Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB411 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/17/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0411*  
  
HOUSE BILL 411 
J1   	4lr1892 
    	CF SB 408 
By: Delegate Kipke Delegates Kipke, Pena–Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, 
Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, 
R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White 
Holland, and Woods 
Introduced and read first time: January 18, 2024 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 7, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Health – Maryland Department of Health – Reports on Standing Orders 2 
and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs – Standing Orders 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring a licensed health care provider, when issuing a standing order 4 
for an opioid reversal drug, to allow an individual to choose any formulation of any 5 
opioid reversal drug approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration; 6 
requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before certain dates, to report 7 
to certain committees of the General Assembly on opioid overdose reversal drugs and 8 
standing orders; and generally relating to reports on standing orders for and opioid 9 
overdose reversal drugs. 10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 11 
 Article – Health – General 12 
Section 13–3101(a) and (e) 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 15 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 16 
 Article – Health – General 17 
Section 13–3106 18 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 19 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 20  2 	HOUSE BILL 411  
 
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: on or before December 1, 2024, December 1, 2 
2025, and December 1, 2026, the Maryland Department of Health shall report to the Senate 3 
Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee, in 4 
accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, on: 5 
 
 (1) current opioid overdose reversal drugs approved by the federal Food 6 
and Drug Administration; and 7 
 
 (2) for any current opioid overdose reversal drug approved by the federal 8 
Food and Drug Administration, whether the Department has added the drug to a standing 9 
order, and if not, the reasons why the drug has not been added.  10 
 
 
Article – Health – General 11 
 
13–3101. 12 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 13 
 
 (e) “Standing order” means a written instruction for the prescribing and 14 
dispensing of an opioid overdose reversal drug approved by the federal Food and Drug 15 
Administration in accordance with § 13–3106 of this subtitle. 16 
 
13–3106. 17 
 
 (a) A licensed health care provider with prescribing authority may prescribe and 18 
dispense an opioid overdose reversal drug approved by the federal Food and Drug 19 
Administration to an individual who: 20 
 
 (1) Is believed by the licensed health care provider to be at risk of 21 
experiencing an opioid overdose; or 22 
 
 (2) Is in a position to assist an individual at risk of experiencing an opioid 23 
overdose. 24 
 
 (b) (1) A licensed health care provider with prescribing authority may 25 
prescribe and dispense opioid overdose reversal drugs approved by the federal Food and 26 
Drug Administration by issuing a standing order if the licensed health care provider: 27 
 
 (i) Is employed by the Department or a local health department; or 28 
 
 (ii) Has a written agreement with an authorized private or public 29 
entity under § 13–3104 of this subtitle. 30 
   	HOUSE BILL 411 	3 
 
 
 (2) WHEN ISSUING A STANDI NG ORDER FOR AN OPIO ID REVERSAL 1 
DRUG UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION , A LICENSED HEALTH CA RE 2 
PROVIDER SHALL ALLOW THE INDIVIDUAL TO CH OOSE ANY FORMULATION OF ANY 3 
OPIOID REVERSAL DRUG APPROVED BY THE FEDE RAL FOOD AND DRUG 4 
ADMINISTRATION . 5 
 
 [(2)] (3) A licensed health care provider with prescribing authority who 6 
issues a standing order under paragraph (1) of this subsection may delegate the dispensing 7 
of opioid overdose reversal drugs approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration to 8 
an employee or a volunteer of an authorized private or public entity in accordance with a 9 
written agreement under § 13–3104 of this subtitle. 10 
 
 [(3)] (4) Any licensed health care provider who has dispensing authority 11 
also may dispense an opioid overdose reversal drug approved by the federal Food and Drug 12 
Administration to any individual in accordance with a standing order issued by a licensed 13 
health care provider with prescribing authority in accordance with this subsection. 14 
 
 (c) A pharmacist may dispense opioid overdose reversal drugs approved by the 15 
federal Food and Drug Administration in accordance with a therapy management contract 16 
under Title 12, Subtitle 6A of the Health Occupations Article. 17 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 18 
October 1, 2024.  19 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.