Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB618 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/03/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0618*  
  
HOUSE BILL 618 
E4   	4lr2939 
HB 308/23 – APP   	CF SB 380 
By: Delegates Munoz and Toles 
Introduced and read first time: January 25, 2024 
Assigned to: Appropriations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 20, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning  1 
 
Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup to study 3 
issues and factors potentially contributing to the decline in police retention 4 
statewide; and generally relating to the Police Recruitment and Retention 5 
Workgroup. 6 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASS EMBLY OF MARYLAND, 7 
That: 8 
 
 (a) There is a Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup. 9 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 10 
 
 (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the Chair of the 11 
Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee; 12 
 
 (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Chair of the 13 
House Judiciary Committee; 14 
 
 (3) the Secretary of the Department of State Police, or the Secretary’s 15 
designee; 16 
 
 (4) the Public Defender, or the Public Defender’s designee; 17 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 618  
 
 
 (5) the Attorney General, or the Attorney General’s designee;  1 
 
 (6) the President of the Maryland State’s Attorneys’ Association, or the 2 
President’s designee;  3 
 
 (7) the President of the Maryland Chiefs of Police Association, or the 4 
President’s designee; 5 
 
 (8) one member with expertise in the field of effective policing, designated 6 
by the President of the Fraternal Order of Police;  7 
 
 (9) the Executive Director of the Maryland Commission on Criminal 8 
Sentencing Policy, or the Executive Director’s designee;  9 
 
 (10) the President of the Maryland chapter of the National Organization of 10 
Black Law Enforcement Executives, or the President’s designee; 11 
 
 (11) the President of the Hispanic American Law Enforcement Association, 12 
or the President’s designee;  13 
 
 (10) (12) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 14 
 
 (i) one representative of the Fraternal Order of Police; 15 
 
 (ii) one representative from the National Association for the 16 
Advancement of Colored People; and  17 
 
 (iii) one representative with expertise in human resources; 18 
 
 (iv) one representative with expertise in police practices; 19 
 
 (v) one representative with expertise in police retention and 20 
recruitment; and  21 
 
 (vi) one two citizen representative representatives; 22 
 
 (11) (13) the following members, appointed by the Maryland Association 23 
of Counties:  24 
 
 (i) one representative of a police department for an urban county; 25 
and  26 
 
 (ii) one representative of a sheriff’s office for a rural county; and  27 
 
 (12) (14) the following members, appointed by the Maryland Municipal 28 
League: 29 
   	HOUSE BILL 618 	3 
 
 
 (i) one representative of a police department for an urban 1 
municipality; and 2 
 
 (ii) one representative of a police department for a rural 3 
municipality. 4 
 
 (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Workgroup. 5 
 
 (d) The Department of State Police shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 6 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup: 7 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 8 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 9 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 10 
 
 (f) A member of the Workgroup serves at the pleasure of the person who 11 
appointed the member to the Workgroup. 12 
 
 (g) At the first meeting of the Workgroup, the Workgroup shall vote to adopt a 13 
code of conduct providing for the acceptable conduct of Workgroup members. 14 
 
 (h) The Workgroup shall identify and examine issues and factors potentially 15 
contributing to recruitment challenges and the decline in police officer retention statewide, 16 
including: 17 
 
 (1) the number of police officers retiring annually; 18 
 
 (2) the number of cadets completing police academy training annually; 19 
 
 (3) training hour requirements for police officers; 20 
 
 (4) police training academy acceptance requirements; 21 
 
 (5) recruitment techniques; 22 
 
 (6) requirements for advancement within police departments; 23 
 
 (7) the impact of current State and local laws on policing and police 24 
departments; 25 
 
 (8) current salary ranges, health benefits, and retirement benefits for 26 
police officers statewide; 27 
 
 (9) to the extent that information is available:  28 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 618  
 
 
 (i) the migration of police officers between departments;  1 
 
 (ii) the attrition rates of newly certified police officers; 2 
 
 (iii) the average length of active service for police officers; and  3 
 
 (iv) the number of actively employed police officers who have retired 4 
from another police department in State or local government; and 5 
 
 (10) perceptions of the occupation among potential recruits.  6 
 
 (g) (i) The Workgroup shall:  7 
 
 (1) explore recruitment and retention strategies used successfully in other 8 
states and countries;  9 
 
 (2) design a statewide joint apprenticeship and training council including 10 
multiple departments and unions to operate a police–registered apprenticeship beginning 11 
in high school; and  12 
 
 (3) provide recommendations for reviewing the decline in police retention 13 
statewide.  14 
 
 (h) (j) On or before December 30, 2025, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 15 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 16 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 17 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 18 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2026, 19 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 20 
of no further force and effect.  21 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.