Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB707 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/26/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0707*  
  
HOUSE BILL 707 
E4   	4lr3024 
    	CF 4lr3283 
By: Delegates Simmons, Addison, Bouchat, Chisholm, Conaway, Grammer, Ruff, 
Schmidt, Taveras, and Young 
Introduced and read first time: January 26, 2024 
Assigned to: Judiciary 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Safety – Law Enforcement – Use of Body–Worn Cameras 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering certain provisions of law to require a certain law enforcement 3 
agency to require the use of body–worn cameras, subject to a certain policy, by each 4 
sworn law enforcement officer, regardless of rank, employed by the law enforcement 5 
agency while the officer is in uniform, in public, and conducting law enforcement 6 
related duties; and generally relating to the use of body–worn cameras by law 7 
enforcement officers. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 9 
 Article – Public Safety 10 
Section 3–511(c) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Public Safety 16 
 
3–511. 17 
 
 (c) (1) (i) This paragraph applies to: 18 
 
 1. the Department of State Police; 19 
 
 2. the Anne Arundel County Police Department; 20 
 
 3. the Howard County Police Department; and 21 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 707  
 
 
 4. the Harford County Sheriff’s Office. 1 
 
 (ii) [On or before July 1, 2023, a] A law enforcement agency to which 2 
this paragraph applies shall require the use of body–worn cameras, subject to the policy on 3 
the use of body–worn cameras developed by the law enforcement agency, by each SWORN 4 
law enforcement officer, REGARDLESS OF RANK , employed by the law enforcement agency 5 
[who regularly interacts with members of the public as part of the law enforcement officer’s 6 
official duties] WHILE THE OFFICER IS IN UNIFORM, IN PUBLIC, AND CONDUCTING 7 
LAW ENFORCEMENT RELA TED DUTIES. 8 
 
 (2) On or before July 1, 2025, a law enforcement agency of a county, other 9 
than a law enforcement agency described in paragraph (1) of this subsection, shall require 10 
the use of body–worn cameras, subject to the policy on the use of body–worn cameras 11 
developed by the law enforcement agency, by each SWORN law enforcement officer, 12 
REGARDLESS OF RANK , employed by the law enforcement agency [who regularly interacts 13 
with members of the public as part of the law enforcement officer’s official duties] WHILE 14 
THE OFFICER IS IN UNIFORM, IN PUBLIC, AND CONDUCTING LAW ENFOR CEMENT 15 
RELATED DUTIES . 16 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 17 
October 1, 2024. 18