Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB771 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/15/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0771*  
  
HOUSE BILL 771 
F2   	4lr2278 
    	CF SB 741 
By: Delegate Henson 
Introduced and read first time: January 31, 2024 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Reassigned: Appropriations, February 2, 2024 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 5, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions – Pregnant and Parenting 2 
Students – Policy Plan Requirements 3 
(Pregnant and Parenting Support Act) 4 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring each certain public senior higher education institution 5 
institutions to adopt a policy plan regarding pregnant and parenting students using 6 
certain guidelines; requiring each public senior higher education institution to post 7 
the policy plan on the institution’s website; and generally relating to pregnant and 8 
parenting students and certain public senior higher education institutions. 9 
 
BY adding to 10 
 Article – Education 11 
Section 15–138 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
Article – Education 17 
 
15–138. 18 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 771  
 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 1 
INDICATED.  2 
 
 (2) “PREGNANT AND PARENTIN G STUDENT ” MEANS A STUDENT 3 
ENROLLED AT A PUBLIC SENIOR HIGHER EDUCAT ION INSTITUTION WHO : 4 
 
 (I) IS PREGNANT; OR 5 
 
 (II) EXERCISES CARE , CUSTODY, OR CONTROL OVER A CH ILD.  6 
 
 (3) (I) “PUBLIC SENIOR HIGHER EDUCATION INSTITUTIO N” HAS 7 
THE MEANING STATED IN § 15–136 OF THIS SUBTITLE MEANS: 8 
 
 1. THE CONSTITUENT INSTI TUTIONS OF THE 9 
UNIVERSITY SYSTEM OF MARYLAND; 10 
 
 2. MORGAN STATE UNIVERSITY; AND 11 
 
 3. ST. MARY’S COLLEGE OF MARYLAND. 12 
 
 (II) “PUBLIC SENIOR HIGHER EDUCATION INSTITUTIO N” DOES 13 
NOT INCLUDE: 14 
 
 1. THE UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CENTER FOR 15 
ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES;  16 
 
 2. THE UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND GLOBAL CAMPUS; 17 
OR 18 
 
 3. THE UNIVERSITY OF BALTIMORE. 19 
 
 (B) THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY FINDS THAT A LL STUDENTS AT AN 20 
INSTITUTION OF HIGHE R EDUCATION IN THE STATE, REGARDLESS OF THEIR 21 
GENDER, SHALL ENJOY FREEDOM FROM DISCRIMINATION OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING 22 
PREGNANCY DISCRIMINA TION AS DESCRIBED IN TITLE IX OF THE EDUCATION 23 
AMENDMENTS OF 1972. 24 
 
 (C) (1) EACH PUBLIC SENIOR HI GHER EDUCATION INSTI TUTION SHALL 25 
ADOPT A POLICY PLAN REGARDING PREGNANT A ND PARENTING STUDENT S THAT IS 26 
CONSISTENT WITH TITLE IX OF THE FEDERAL HIGHER EDUCATION ACT.  27 
 
 (2) THE POLICY PLAN REQUIRED UNDER PARAG RAPH (1) OF THIS 28 
SUBSECTION SHALL INC LUDE: 29 
   	HOUSE BILL 771 	3 
 
 
 (I) REFERRAL TO ON –CAMPUS OR OFF –CAMPUS SERVICES TO 1 
ASSIST REGARDING THE AVAILABILITY OF OR E LIGIBILITY FOR GOVER NMENT 2 
ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS , INCLUDING: 3 
 
 1. THE SPECIAL SUPPLEMENTAL NUTRITION 4 
ASSISTANCE PROGRAM FOR WOMEN, INFANTS, AND CHILDREN; 5 
 
 2. THE CHILD CARE SCHOLARSHIP PROGRAM;  6 
 
 3. THE MARYLAND MEDICAL ASSISTANCE PROGRAM; 7 
 
 4. THE MARYLAND CHILDREN’S HEALTH INSURANCE 8 
PROGRAM; AND 9 
 
 5. ANY OTHER PROGRAMS , SCHOLARSHIPS , OR 10 
SUBSIDIES FOR PREGNA NT AND PARENTING STU DENTS; 11 
 
 (II) THE PROVISION OF INFO RMATION ABOUT OR REF ERRALS 12 
TO RESOURCES REGARDI NG ADOPTION SERVICES ; 13 
 
 (III) THE AVAILABILITY OF I NSTITUTIONAL AC COMMODATIONS 14 
FOR PREGNANT AND PAR ENTING STUDENTS , INCLUDING PRIORITY C LASS 15 
REGISTRATION AND FLE XIBLE SCHEDULING OPT IONS; AND 16 
 
 (IV) A REFERRAL NETWORK OF ON–CAMPUS AND OFF –CAMPUS 17 
HEALTH CARE SERVICE PROVIDERS. 18 
 
 (D) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 1, 2025, EACH PUBLIC SENIOR H IGHER 19 
EDUCATION INSTITUTIO N SHALL POST THE POLICY PLAN ADOPTED UNDER 20 
SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION ON T HE INSTITUTION’S WEBSITE.  21 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 22 
1, 2024.  23 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.