Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB787 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/16/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0787*  
  
HOUSE BILL 787 
C8   	4lr3129 
    	CF SB 1134 
By: Delegates Buckel, Baker, and Hinebaugh 
Introduced and read first time: January 31, 2024 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 7, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Allegany County – Allegany Regional Recreational Economic Development 2 
Authority – Established 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Allegany Regional Recreational Economic 4 
Development Authority in Allegany County to support the development and 5 
construction of regional recreation facilities to benefit residents and the economic 6 
development of Allegany County; and generally relating to the Allegany Regional 7 
Recreational Economic Development Authority. 8 
 
BY adding to 9 
 Article – Economic Development 10 
Section 12–1101 through 12–1106 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 11. Allegany 11 
Regional Recreational Economic Development Authority”  12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
Article – Economic Development 17 
 
SUBTITLE 11. ALLEGANY REGIONAL RECREATIONAL ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT 18 
AUTHORITY. 19 
 
12–1101. 20  2 	HOUSE BILL 787  
 
 
 
 IN THIS SUBTITLE , “AUTHORITY” MEANS THE ALLEGANY REGIONAL 1 
RECREATIONAL ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY. 2 
 
12–1102. 3 
 
 THERE IS A N ALLEGANY REGIONAL RECREATIONAL ECONOMIC 4 
DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY IN ALLEGANY COUNTY. 5 
 
12–1103. 6 
 
 THE AUTHORITY CONSISTS OF THE FOLLOWING MEMBER S: 7 
 
 (1) THE PRESIDENT OF THE ALLEGANY COUNTY COMMISSIONERS , 8 
OR THE PRESIDENT’S DESIGNEE; 9 
 
 (2) THE PRESIDENT OF FROSTBURG STATE UNIVERSITY, OR THE 10 
PRESIDENT’S DESIGNEE; 11 
 
 (3) THE PRESIDENT OF ALLEGANY COLLEGE, OR THE PRESIDENT’S 12 
DESIGNEE; 13 
 
 (4) THE MAYOR OF CUMBERLAND , OR THE MAYOR ’S DESIGNEE; 14 
 
 (5) THE MAYOR OF FROSTBURG, OR THE MAYOR ’S DESIGNEE; 15 
 
 (6) THE PRESIDENT OF THE ALLEGANY COUNTY BOARD OF 16 
EDUCATION, OR THE PRESIDENT’S DESIGNEE; AND 17 
 
 (7) ONE MEMBER WHO IS A RESIDENT OF ALLEGANY COUNTY 18 
DESIGNATED BY THE ME MBERS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY T HAT REPRESENT 19 
ALLEGANY COUNTY. 20 
 
12–1104. 21 
 
 (A) THE AUTHORITY MAY MANAGE 	APPROPRIATED FUNDS F ROM 22 
ALLEGANY COUNTY, THE MUNICIPAL CORPOR ATIONS OF CUMBERLAND AND 23 
FROSTBURG, AND THE STATE. 24 
 
 (B) THE AUTHORITY MAY RECEIVE DONATED SERVICES FRO M 25 
PROFESSIONALS AS NECESSARY TO CARR Y OUT THIS SUBTITLE . 26 
   	HOUSE BILL 787 	3 
 
 
 (C) THE AUTHORITY MAY SUPERVI SE, MANAGE, AND TERMINATE STAFF 1 
AND CONSULTANTS AS N ECESSARY. 2 
 
12–1105. 3 
 
 A MEMBER OF THE AUTHORITY: 4 
 
 (1) MAY NOT RECEIVE COMP ENSATION AS A MEMBER OF THE 5 
AUTHORITY; BUT 6 
 
 (2) IS ENTITLED TO REIMBURSEM ENT FOR EXPENSES UND ER THE 7 
STANDARD STATE TRAVEL REGULATIONS, AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET . 8 
 
12–1106. 9 
 
 (A) THE AUTHORITY SHALL SUPPO RT THE DEVELOPMENT A	ND 10 
CONSTRUCTION OF REGI ONAL RECREATION FACI LITIES TO BENEFIT RE SIDENTS 11 
AND THE ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF ALLEGANY COUNTY, INCLUDING: 12 
 
 (1) ATHLETIC FIELDS ; 13 
 
 (2) INDOOR ATHLETIC FACI LITIES; AND 14 
 
 (3) OTHER FACILITIES DES IGNED TO CREATE RECR EATIONAL 15 
TOURISM. 16 
 
 (B) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 31, 2025, AND EACH OCTOBER 31 17 
THEREAFTER , THE AUTHORITY SHALL REPOR T ITS ACTIVITIES TO THE GOVERNOR 18 
AND, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, TO 19 
THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE, THE HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS 20 
COMMITTEE, AND THE HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE. 21 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 22 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 5 years and, at the end of June 30, 2029, 23 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 24 
of no further force and effect. 25