Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB84 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/05/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0084*  
  
HOUSE BILL 84 
J3, J1   	4lr0471 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 332 
By: Delegate Kerr Delegates Kerr, Pena–Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, 
Bhandari, Chisholm, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kipke, R. Lewis, 
Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White 
Holland, and Woods 
Requested: July 27, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 26, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers – Sepsis Protocol 2 
(Lochlin’s Law) 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring, on or before a certain date, each hospital and urgent care 4 
center in the State to implement a certain protocol for the early recognition and 5 
treatment of a patient with sepsis, severe sepsis, or septic shock; requiring hospitals 6 
and urgent care centers to require periodic training in the implementation of the 7 
protocol for certain staff; and generally relating to sepsis protocols in hospitals and 8 
urgent care centers. 9 
 
BY adding to 10 
 Article – Health – General 11 
Section 19–310.4 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
Article – Health – General 17 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 84  
 
 
19–310.4. 1 
 
 (A) (1) ON SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPHS (1) AND (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , 2 
ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2025, EACH HOSPITAL AND UR GENT CARE CENTER IN 3 
THE STATE SHALL IMPLEMENT AN EVIDENCE–BASED PROTOCOL FOR T HE EARLY 4 
RECOGNITION AND TREA TMENT OF A PATIENT W ITH SEPSIS, SEVERE SEP SIS, OR 5 
SEPTIC SHOCK THAT IS BASED ON GENERALLY A CCEPTABLE STANDARDS OF CARE. 6 
 
 (2) THE EVIDENCE –BASED PROTOCOL IMPLE	MENTED FOR 7 
HOSPITALS UNDER PARA GRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION S HALL COMPLY WITH THE 8 
CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION SEPSIS GUI DELINES. 9 
 
 (3) A HOSPITAL THAT IS A S PECIALTY PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL SHALL 10 
ESTABLISH A PROCESS FOR THE SCREENING AN D EARLY RECOGNITION OF A 11 
PATIENT WITH SEPSIS , SEVERE SEPSIS, OR SEPTIC SHOCK , AND PROCEDURES TO 12 
TRANSFER THE PATIENT TO THE APPROPRIATE S ETTING.  13 
 
 (2) THE PROTOCOL SHALL : 14 
 
 (I) INCLUDE COMPONENTS SP ECIFIC TO THE IDENTI FICATION, 15 
CARE, AND TREATMENT OF ADU LTS AND CHILDREN ; AND 16 
 
 (II) FOR A HOSPITAL , CLEARLY IDENTIFY WHE RE AND WHEN 17 
THE COMPONENTS WILL DIFFER FOR ADULTS AN D CHILDREN SEEKING T REATMENT 18 
IN THE EMERGENCY DEP ARTMENT OR AS AN INP ATIENT.  19 
 
 (3) THE COMPONENTS REQUIR ED UNDER PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS 20 
SUBSECTION SHALL INC LUDE: 21 
 
 (I) A PROCESS FOR THE SCRE ENING AND EARLY RECO GNITION 22 
OF A PATIENT WITH SE PSIS, SEVERE SEPSIS, OR SEPTIC SHOCK ; 23 
 
 (II) A PROCESS TO IDENTIFY AND DOCUMENT INDIVID UALS 24 
APPROPRIATE FOR TREA TMENT THROUGH SEPSIS PROTOCOLS, INCLUDING 25 
EXPLICIT CRITERIA DE FINING WHICH PATIENT S SHOULD BE EXCLUDED FROM THE 26 
PROTOCOL, SUCH AS A PATIENT WI TH CERTAIN CLINICAL CONDITIONS OR A PATIENT 27 
WHO HAS CHOSEN PALLI ATIVE CARE; 28 
 
 (III) GUIDELINES FOR HEMODY NAMIC SUPPORT WITH E XPLICIT 29 
PHYSIOLOGIC AND TREA TMENT GOALS , METHODOLOGY FOR INVA SIVE OR 30 
NONINVASIVE HEMODYNA MIC MONITORING , AND TIME FRAME GOALS ; 31 
 
 (IV) FOR INFANTS AND CHILD REN, GUIDELINES FOR FLUID 32 
RESUSCITATION CONSIS TENT WITH CURRENT , EVIDENCE–BASED GUIDELINES FOR 33   	HOUSE BILL 84 	3 
 
 
SEVERE SEPSIS AND SE PTIC SHOCK WITH DEFI NED THERAPEUTIC GOAL S FOR 1 
CHILDREN; 2 
 
 (V) IDENTIFICATION OF THE INFECTIOUS SOURCE AN D 3 
DELIVERY OF EARLY BR OAD–SPECTRUM ANTIBIOTICS WITH TIM ELY REEVALUATION 4 
TO ADJUST TO NARROW –SPECTRUM ANTIBIOTICS TARGETED TO IDENTIFI ED 5 
INFECTIOUS SOURCES ; AND 6 
 
 (VI) CRITERIA FOR USE , BASED ON ACCEPTED EV IDENCE OF 7 
VASOACTIVE AGENTS .  8 
 
 (B) A HOSPITAL THAT SUBMIT S SEPSIS DATA TO THE CENTERS FOR 9 
MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES HOSPITAL INPATIENT QUALITY REPORTING 10 
PROGRAM IS PRESUMED T O MEET THE REQUIREME NTS OF SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS 11 
SECTION. 12 
 
 (C) EACH HOSPITAL AND URG ENT CARE CENTER SHAL L: 13 
 
 (1) REQUIRE PERIODIC TRAI NING IN THE IMPLEMENTATION OF TH E 14 
SEPSIS PROTOCOL REQU IRED UNDER SUBSECTIO N (A) OF THIS SECTION FOR 15 
PROFESSIONAL STAFF W ITH DIRECT PATIENT C ARE RESPONSIBILITIES AND, AS 16 
APPROPRIATE , FOR STAFF WITH INDIR ECT PATIENT CARE RES PONSIBILITIES, 17 
INCLUDING LABORATORY AND PHARMA CY STAFF; AND 18 
 
 (2) ENSURE THAT THE STAFF RECEIVE UPDATED TRAI NING IF THE 19 
HOSPITAL OR URGENT C ARE CENTER MAKES A S UBSTANTIVE CHANGE TO THE 20 
SEPSIS PROTOCOL . 21 
 
 (D) EACH HOSPITAL AND URG ENT CARE CENTER SHAL L COLLECT AND USE 22 
QUALITY MEASURES REL ATED TO THE RE COGNITION AND TREATM ENT OF SEVERE 23 
SEPSIS FOR THE PURPO SE OF INTERNAL QUALI TY IMPROVEMENT . 24 
 
 (E) ON REQUEST , A HOSPITAL OR AN URG ENT CARE CENTER SHAL L 25 
PROVIDE THE PROTOCOL REQUIRED UNDER SUBSE CTION (A) OF THIS SECTION TO 26 
THE DEPARTMENT . 27 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 28 
October 1, 2024.  29