EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *sb0012* SENATE BILL 12 F4 4lr1404 (PRE–FILED) By: Senator Ellis Requested: November 1, 2023 Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 College of Southern Maryland – Board of Trustees Membership – Alterations 2 FOR the purpose of increasing the membership of the Board of Trustees of the College of 3 Southern Maryland; requiring certain members of the Board of Trustees to be 4 residents of Charles County; and generally relating to the Board of Trustees of the 5 College of Southern Maryland. 6 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 7 Article – Education 8 Section 16–602(a) through (c) and (h) 9 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 11 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 Article – Education 13 Section 16–604 14 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 Article – Education 19 16–602. 20 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 21 (b) “Board of Trustees” means the Board of Trustees of the College of Southern 22 Maryland. 23 2 SENATE BILL 12 (c) “College” means the College of Southern Maryland, formerly known as the 1 Charles County Community College. 2 (h) “Southern Maryland” means the area that includes all of Calvert, Charles, and 3 St. Mary’s counties. 4 16–604. 5 (a) The government of the College is vested in the Board of Trustees. 6 (b) (1) The Board of Trustees consists of [nine] 11 members appointed by the 7 Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate. 8 (2) Of the members: 9 (i) Each shall be a resident of the State; 10 (ii) Each shall have completed at least 60 hours of accredited college 11 work; and 12 (iii) None may be an elected official of the State, a county, a municipal 13 corporation, or a county board. 14 (3) Each of the southern Maryland counties shall be represented by at least 15 one member who is a resident of that county. 16 (4) (I) [By July 1, 2010] SUBJECT TO SUBPARAGRA PH (II) OF THIS 17 PARAGRAPH , each of the southern Maryland counties shall be represented by at least three 18 members who are residents of that county. 19 (II) BY JULY 1, 2026, CHARLES COUNTY SHALL BE 20 REPRESENTED BY AT LE AST FIVE MEMBERS WHO ARE RESI DENTS OF CHARLES 21 COUNTY. 22 (c) (1) The term of a member is 5 years. 23 (2) A member appointed to fill a vacancy in an unexpired term serves for 24 the remainder of that term. 25 (3) A member may not serve more than two consecutive full terms. 26 (d) Each member of the Board of Trustees is entitled to receive up to $600 a year 27 for expenses. 28 SENATE BILL 12 3 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the initial terms of the two 1 additional members of the College of Southern Maryland Board of Trustees who represent 2 Charles County, as enacted by Section 1 of this Act, shall be as follows: 3 (1) One term shall begin July 1, 2024; and 4 (2) One term shall begin July 1, 2026. 5 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 6 1, 2024. 7