Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB151 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/05/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0151*  
  
SENATE BILL 151 
J1, L2   	4lr1154 
SB 966/23 – FIN 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF 4lr1156 
By: Senator Muse 
Requested: October 25, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Prince George’s County – Workgroup on Health and Wellness 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing a Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s 3 
County to review and evaluate certain information and make certain 4 
recommendations related to health and wellness in Prince George’s County; and 5 
generally relating to the Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s 6 
County. 7 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAN	D, 8 
That: 9 
 
 (a) There is a Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s County. 10 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 11 
 
 (1) the Chair of the Prince George’s County Senate Delegation, or the 12 
Chair’s designee; 13 
 
 (2) the Chair of the Prince George’s County House Delegation, or the 14 
Chair’s designee; 15 
 
 (3) the Chair of the Prince George’s County Council, or the Chair’s 16 
designee; 17 
 
 (4) the following members, appointed by the Chair of the Prince George’s 18 
County Senate Delegation: 19 
 
 (i) two representatives of small and local health and wellness 20 
businesses; and 21 
  2 	SENATE BILL 151  
 
 
 (ii) one integrative health and wellness practitioner; and 1 
 
 (5) the following members, appointed by the Prince George’s County 2 
Executive: 3 
 
 (i) one certified dietitian providing services in Prince George’s 4 
County; 5 
 
 (ii) two health and wellness practitioners in Prince George’s County;  6 
 
 (iii) one representative of the Prince George’s County Food Equity 7 
Council;  8 
 
 (iv) one representative from Nonprofit Prince George’s County; and 9 
 
 (v) one representative from the South County Economic 10 
Development Association. 11 
 
 (c) The Prince George’s County Health Officer shall designate the chair of the 12 
Workgroup. 13 
 
 (d) The Prince George’s County Health Department shall provide staff for the 14 
Workgroup. 15 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup or a subgroup established under subsection (g) of 16 
this section: 17 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup or 18 
subgroup; but 19 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 20 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 21 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall: 22 
 
 (1) review the availability of health and wellness practices in Prince 23 
George’s County; 24 
 
 (2) review available options for integrative health and wellness programs 25 
in Prince George’s County; 26 
 
 (3) review programs that promote healthy eating within the Prince 27 
George’s County government agencies; 28 
 
 (4) make recommendations regarding the best practices in health and 29 
wellness community programming, including strategies and programs that: 30 
   	SENATE BILL 151 	3 
 
 
 (i) promote healthy eating; 1 
 
 (ii) improve equitable access to healthy, affordable, and accessible 2 
food retailers; 3 
 
 (iii) improve equitable access to environments that are built and 4 
promote physical activity, including: 5 
 
 1. gymnasiums; 6 
 
 2. recreation centers; 7 
 
 3. athletic fields and facilities; 8 
 
 4. playgrounds; 9 
 
 5. sidewalks; and 10 
 
 6. bicycle and walking paths; 11 
 
 (iv) reduce the density in specified areas of calorie–dense and fast 12 
food restaurants and retailers; and 13 
 
 (v) promote healthy eating, physical activity, and nonsedentary 14 
habits for obesity prevention; 15 
 
 (5) make recommendations for incentives that may be provided to 16 
employers, businesses, and Prince George’s County agencies to promote health and 17 
wellness strategies and programs identified under item (4) of this subsection; 18 
 
 (6) review and report on the benefits of incorporating integrative health 19 
into various aspects of Prince George’s County; and 20 
 
 (7) evaluate the benefit and feasibility of creating integrative health and 21 
wellness hubs in Prince George’s County. 22 
 
 (g) (1) The Workgroup may establish a subgroup to assist in carrying out its 23 
duties, including conducting research and producing reports. 24 
 
 (2) A subgroup established under paragraph (1) of this subsection may 25 
include an individual who is not a member of the Workgroup, such as a representative of a 26 
relevant expert. 27 
 
 (h) On or before December 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 28 
recommendations to the Prince George’s County Executive, the Chair of the Prince George’s 29 
County Council, the Governor, and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 30 
Article, the General Assembly. 31  4 	SENATE BILL 151  
 
 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2026, 2 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 3 
of no further force and effect.  4