Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB151 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/20/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0151*  
  
SENATE BILL 151 
J1, L2   	4lr1154 
SB 966/23 – FIN 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 358 
By: Senator Muse 
Requested: October 25, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 11, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Prince George’s County – Workgroup on Health and Wellness 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing a Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s 3 
County to review and evaluate certain information and make certain 4 
recommendations related to health and wellness in Prince George’s County; and 5 
generally relating to the Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s 6 
County. 7 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 
That: 9 
 
 (a) There is a Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s County. 10 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 11 
 
 (1) the Chair of the Prince George’s County Senate Delegation, or the 12 
Chair’s designee; 13 
 
 (2) the Chair of the Prince George’s County House Delegation, or the 14 
Chair’s designee; 15 
 
 (3) the Chair of the Prince George’s County Council, or the Chair’s 16 
designee; 17 
  2 	SENATE BILL 151  
 
 
 (4) one representative of the Prince George’s County Parks and Recreation 1 
Department, designated by the Chair of the Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning 2 
Commission; 3 
 
 (5) the following members, appointed by the Chair of the Prince George’s 4 
County Senate Delegation: 5 
 
 (i) two representatives of small and local health and wellness 6 
businesses; and 7 
 
 (ii) one integrative health and wellness practitioner; and 8 
 
 (5) (6) the following members, appointed by the Prince George’s County 9 
Executive: 10 
 
 (i) one certified dietitian providing services in Prince George’s 11 
County; 12 
 
 (ii) two health and wellness practitioners in Prince George’s County;  13 
 
 (iii) one representative of the Prince George’s County Food Equity 14 
Council;  15 
 
 (iv) one representative from Nonprofit Prince George’s County; and 16 
 
 (v) one representative from the South County Economic 17 
Development Association. 18 
 
 (c) The Prince George’s County Health Officer shall designate the chair of the 19 
Workgroup. 20 
 
 (d) The Prince George’s County Health Department shall provide staff for the 21 
Workgroup. 22 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup or a subgroup established under subsection (g) of 23 
this section: 24 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup or 25 
subgroup; but 26 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 27 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 28 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall: 29 
 
 (1) review the availability of health and wellness practices in Prince 30 
George’s County; 31   	SENATE BILL 151 	3 
 
 
 
 (2) review available options for integrative health and wellness programs 1 
in Prince George’s County; 2 
 
 (3) review programs that promote healthy eating within the Prince 3 
George’s County government agencies; 4 
 
 (4) make recommendations regarding the best practices in health and 5 
wellness community programming, including strategies and programs that: 6 
 
 (i) promote healthy eating; 7 
 
 (ii) improve equitable access to healthy, affordable, and accessible 8 
food retailers; 9 
 
 (iii) improve equitable access to environments that are built and 10 
promote physical activity, including: 11 
 
 1. gymnasiums; 12 
 
 2. recreation centers; 13 
 
 3. athletic fields and facilities; 14 
 
 4. playgrounds; 15 
 
 5. sidewalks; and 16 
 
 6. bicycle and walking paths; 17 
 
 (iv) reduce the density in specified areas of calorie–dense and fast 18 
food restaurants and retailers; and 19 
 
 (v) promote healthy eating, physical activity, and nonsedentary 20 
habits for obesity prevention; 21 
 
 (5) make recommendations for incentives that may be provided to 22 
employers, businesses, and Prince George’s County agencies to promote health and 23 
wellness strategies and programs identified under item (4) of this subsection; 24 
 
 (6) review and report on the benefits of incorporating integrative health 25 
into various aspects of Prince George’s County; and 26 
 
 (7) evaluate the benefit and feasibility of creating integrative health and 27 
wellness hubs in Prince George’s County. 28 
  4 	SENATE BILL 151  
 
 
 (g) (1) The Workgroup may establish a subgroup to assist in carrying out its 1 
duties, including conducting research and producing reports. 2 
 
 (2) A subgroup established under paragraph (1) of this subsection may 3 
include an individual who is not a member of the Workgroup, such as a representative of a 4 
relevant expert. 5 
 
 (h) On or before December 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 6 
recommendations to the Prince George’s County Executive, the Chair of the Prince George’s 7 
County Council, the Governor, and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 8 
Article, the General Assembly. 9 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTE D, That this Act shall take effect July 10 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2026, 11 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 12 
of no further force and effect.  13 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.