EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDED TO EXIS TING LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *sb0183* SENATE BILL 183 P2 4lr0757 (PRE–FILED) CF HB 342 By: Senator Bailey Requested: September 28, 2023 Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 Assigned to: Finance Reassigned: Budget and Taxation, January 11, 2024 Committee Report: Favorable with amendments Senate action: Adopted Read second time: February 18, 2024 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 State Procurement – Prompt Payment of Suppliers 2 FOR the purpose of providing that certain provisions requiring prompt payments for State 3 procurement contracts apply to payments owed by a contractor or subcontractor to a 4 supplier; and generally relating to the prompt payment of suppliers that have 5 supplied labor or materials for work done under State procurement contracts. 6 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 Article – State Finance and Procurement 8 Section 15–226 9 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 11 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 Article – State Finance and Procurement 14 15–226. 15 (a) (1) In this section[, “undisputed] THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE 16 MEANINGS INDICATED . 17 2 SENATE BILL 183 (2) “SUPPLIER” MEANS A PERSON THAT HAS SUPPLIED LABOR O R 1 MATERIALS TO A CONTR ACTOR OR SUBCONTRACTOR IN THE PROSECUTION O F 2 WORK PROVIDED FOR IN A STATE PROCUREMENT CON TRACT. 3 (3) “UNDISPUTED amount” means an amount owed by a contractor to a 4 subcontractor OR SUPPLIER for which there is no good faith dispute, including any 5 retainage withheld. 6 (b) It is the policy of the State that, for work under a State procurement contract: 7 (1) a contractor shall promptly pay to a subcontractor OR SUPPLIER any 8 undisputed amount to which the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER is entitled; and 9 (2) a subcontractor shall promptly pay to a lower tier subcontractor OR 10 SUPPLIER any undisputed amount to which the lower tier subcontractor is entitled. 11 (c) (1) A contractor shall pay a subcontractor OR SUPPLIER an undisputed 12 amount to which the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER is entitled within 10 days of receiving a 13 progress or final payment from the State. 14 (2) If a contractor withholds payment from a subcontractor OR SUPPLIER, 15 within the time period in which payment normally would be made, the contractor shall: 16 (i) notify the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER in writing and state the 17 reason why payment is being withheld; and 18 (ii) provide a copy of the notice to the procurement officer. 19 (d) (1) If a subcontractor OR SUPPLIER does not receive a payment within the 20 required time period, the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER may give written notice of the 21 nonpayment to the procurement officer. 22 (2) The notice shall: 23 (i) indicate the name of the contractor, the project under which the 24 dispute exists, and the amount in dispute; 25 (ii) provide an itemized description on which the amount is based; 26 and 27 (iii) if known, provide an explanation for any dispute concerning 28 payment by the contractor. 29 (e) (1) Within 2 business days of receipt of written notice from a subcontractor 30 OR SUPPLIER , a representative of the unit designated by the procurement officer shall 31 SENATE BILL 183 3 verbally contact the contractor to ascertain whether the amount withheld is an undisputed 1 amount. 2 (2) If the representative of the unit decides that a part or all of the amount 3 withheld is an undisputed amount, the representative of the unit shall instruct the 4 contractor to pay the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER the undisputed amount within 3 5 business days. 6 (3) The representative of the unit shall verbally communicate to the 7 subcontractor OR SUPPLIER the results of discussions with the contractor. 8 (4) If the contractor is instructed to pay the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER 9 and the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER is not paid within the time instructed under 10 paragraph (2) of this subsection, the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER may report the 11 nonpayment in writing to the procurement officer. 12 (f) (1) If the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER notifies the procurement officer 13 under subsection (e)(4) of this section that payment has not been made, the representative 14 of the unit shall schedule a meeting to discuss the dispute with the unit’s project manager, 15 the contractor, and the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER: 16 (i) at a time and location designated by the representative of the 17 unit; but 18 (ii) not later than 10 days after receiving notice from the 19 subcontractor OR SUPPLIER under subsection (e)(4) of this section. 20 (2) The purpose of the meeting is to establish why the contractor has not 21 paid the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER in the required time period. 22 (3) The representative of the unit shall require the parties to provide at the 23 meeting any information that the representative believes necessary to evaluate the dispute. 24 (4) If the representative of the unit determines that the contractor is 25 delinquent in payment of an undisputed amount to the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER , 26 further progress payments to the contractor may be withheld until the subcontractor OR 27 SUPPLIER is paid. 28 (5) If payment is not paid to the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER within 7 days 29 after the representative of the unit determines that the contractor is delinquent in paying 30 the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER under this subsection, the representative shall schedule 31 a second meeting to address the dispute: 32 (i) at a time and location designated by the representative of the 33 unit; but 34 4 SENATE BILL 183 (ii) not later than 5 days after the close of the 7–day period. 1 (6) If, at the completion of the second meeting, the representative of the 2 unit determines that the contractor continues to be delinquent in payments owed to the 3 subcontractor OR SUPPLIER, the representative: 4 (i) shall order that further payments to the contractor not be 5 processed until payment to the subcontractor is verified; 6 (ii) may order that work under the contract be suspended based on 7 the failure of the contractor to meet obligations under the contract; and 8 (iii) subject to paragraph (7) of this subsection, may require that the 9 contractor pay a penalty to the subcontractor OR SUPPLIER, in an amount not exceeding 10 $100 per day, from the date that payment was required under subsection (e)(2) of this 11 section. 12 (7) A penalty may not be imposed under paragraph (6)(iii) of this 13 subsection for any period that the representative of the unit determines the subcontractor 14 OR SUPPLIER was not diligent in reporting nonpayment to the procurement officer. 15 (g) (1) A contractor [or], a subcontractor, OR A SUPPLIER may appeal a 16 decision under subsection (f)(6) of this section to the procurement officer. 17 (2) The contractor shall comply with the procurement officer’s decision. 18 (h) An act, failure to act, or decision of a procurement officer or a representative 19 of a unit concerning a payment dispute between a contractor and subcontractor or 20 SUPPLIER, OR between subcontractors, OR BETWEEN A SUBCONT RACTOR AND 21 SUPPLIER under this section may not: 22 (1) affect the rights of the contracting parties under any other provision of 23 law; 24 (2) be used as evidence on the merits of a dispute between the unit and the 25 contractor [or], the contractor and subcontractor , OR CONTRACTOR OR 26 SUBCONTRACTOR AND SUPPLIER in any other proceeding; or 27 (3) result in liability against or prejudice the rights of the unit. 28 (i) A decision of a procurement officer or a representative of the unit designated 29 by the procurement officer under this section is not subject to judicial review or the 30 provisions of Part III of this subtitle. 31 (j) (1) A unit shall include in each State procurement contract a provision: 32 SENATE BILL 183 5 (i) governing prompt payment to subcontractors; and 1 (ii) requiring inclusion of a similar provision in each subcontract at 2 any tier. 3 (2) The contract provision shall establish procedures and remedies for the 4 resolution of payment disputes similar to the process and remedies prescribed in 5 subsections (c) through (g) of this section. 6 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall ta ke effect 7 October 1, 2024. 8 Approved: ________________________________________________________________________________ Governor. ________________________________________________________________________________ President of the Senate. ________________________________________________________________________________ Speaker of the House of Delegates.