Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB214 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/13/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0214*  
  
SENATE BILL 214 
C8   	4lr0099 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF 4lr0100 
By: Chair, Finance Committee (By Request – Departmental – Commerce) 
Requested: September 11, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 8, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Military Installation Council – Membership 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the membership of the Maryland Military Installation Council; 3 
and generally relating to the Maryland Military Installation Council. 4 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 5 
 Article – Economic Development 6 
Section 11–201 7 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 8 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 9 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 10 
 Article – Economic Development 11 
Section 11–203 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
Article – Economic Development 17 
 
11–201. 18 
  2 	SENATE BILL 214  
 
 
 In this subtitle, “Council” means the Maryland Military Installation Council. 1 
 
11–203. 2 
 
 (a) The Council consists of the following members: 3 
 
 (1) three members selected by the President of the Senate of Maryland to 4 
represent community interests, of which: 5 
 
 (i) one shall be a member of the Senate; and 6 
 
 (ii) two shall be citizens representing communities adjacent to 7 
military installations; 8 
 
 (2) three members selected by the Speaker of the House of Delegates to 9 
represent community interests, of which: 10 
 
 (i) one shall be a member of the House of Delegates; and 11 
 
 (ii) two shall be citizens representing communities adjacent to 12 
military installations; 13 
 
 (3) the Secretary, or the designee of the Secretary; 14 
 
 (4) the Secretary of Transportation, or the designee of the Secretary of 15 
Transportation; 16 
 
 (5) the Secretary of the Environment, or the designee of the Secretary of 17 
the Environment; 18 
 
 (6) the Secretary of Planning, or the designee of the Secretary of Planning; 19 
 
 (7) the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, or the designee of the Secretary of 20 
Veterans Affairs; 21 
 
 (8) THE SECRETARY OF LABOR, OR THE DESIGNEE OF THE 22 
SECRETARY OF LABOR; 23 
 
 (9) THE STATE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS, OR THE DESIGNEE 24 
OF THE STATE SUPERINTENDENT ; 25 
 
 [(8)] (10) the Adjutant General of the Maryland National Guard, or the 26 
designee of the Adjutant General; 27 
 
 [(9)] (11) the President of the Southern Maryland Navy Alliance; 28 
   	SENATE BILL 214 	3 
 
 
 [(10)] (12) the President of the Army Alliance; 1 
 
 [(11)] (13) the President of the [Indian Head Defense Alliance] MILITARY 2 
ALLIANCE COUNCIL OF CHARLES COUNTY; 3 
 
 [(12)] (14) the President of the Maritime TECHNOLOGY Alliance; 4 
 
 [(13)] (15) the President of the Fort Detrick Alliance; 5 
 
 [(14)] (16) the President of the Fort Meade Alliance; 6 
 
 [(15)] (17) the President of the Andrews Business and Community Alliance; 7 
and 8 
 
 [(16)] (18) [five] SIX members selected by the Governor, OF WHICH AT 9 
LEAST ONE IS A SPOUSE OF A SERVICE MEMBER . 10 
 
 (b) (1) The President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Delegates 11 
shall each appoint three members representing community interests to serve as members 12 
of the Council. 13 
 
 (2) The chair may appoint: 14 
 
 (i) additional members who are presidents of other military base 15 
advocacy groups that are nonprofit organizations and recognized by the Department; and 16 
 
 (ii) ex officio members as necessary to address specific issues, 17 
including a representative of the Maryland National Guard. 18 
 
 (c) (1) The term of an appointed member is 4 years. 19 
 
 (2) The terms of the appointed members are staggered as required by the 20 
terms provided for appointed members of the Council on July 1, 2010. 21 
 
 (d) A member of the Council: 22 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Council; but 23 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 24 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 25 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 26 
1, 2024. 27