Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB222 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/06/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0222*  
  
SENATE BILL 222 
J2   	4lr0167 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF 4lr0168 
By: Chair, Finance Committee (By Request – Departmental – Health) 
Requested: September 13, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 3, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
State Board of Environmental Health Specialists – Quorum, Examination, and 2 
Apprenticeships 3 
 
FOR the purpose of clarifying that a quorum of the State Board of Environmental Health 4 
Specialists consists of a majority of appointed members; altering the circumstances 5 
under which an applicant for licensure is qualified to take the examination by adding 6 
completion of an apprenticeship approved by the Board as an alternative to obtaining 7 
experience in an environmental health specialist–in–training program; authorizing 8 
the Board to approve an examination provider to administer the examination, rather 9 
than administering the examination itself; and generally relating to the State Board 10 
of Environmental Health Specialists. 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 
 Article – Health Occupations 13 
Section 21–101(a) 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 
 
BY adding to 17 
 Article – Health Occupations 18 
Section 21–101(a–1) 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 21 
  2 	SENATE BILL 222  
 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 1 
 Article – Health Occupations 2 
Section 21–204(a), 21–301(b)(1), 21–304, and 21–305 3 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 4 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 5 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 7 
 
Article – Health Occupations 8 
 
21–101. 9 
 
 (a) In this title the following words have the meanings indicated. 10 
 
 (A–1) “APPRENTICESHIP ” MEANS A PROGRAM OF T RAINING AND EXP ERIENCE 11 
UNDER THE SUPERVISIO N OF A LICENSED ENVI RONMENTAL HEALTH SPE CIALIST 12 
THAT IS PART OF THE REQUIREMENTS FOR A BOARD–APPROVED BACCALAUREA TE 13 
DEGREE FROM AN ACCRE DITED COLLEGE OR UNI VERSITY. 14 
 
21–204. 15 
 
 (a) A majority of the APPOINTED MEMBERS OF THE Board is a quorum TO DO 16 
BUSINESS. 17 
 
21–301. 18 
 
 (b) This section does not apply to: 19 
 
 (1) An environmental health specialist–in–training PARTICIPATING IN 20 
AN ENVIRONMENTAL HEA LTH SPECIALIST –IN–TRAINING PROGRAM OR AN 21 
INDIVIDUAL PARTICIPA TING IN AN APPRENTICESHIP as provided for under § 21–305 of 22 
this subtitle; 23 
 
21–304. 24 
 
 (a) An applicant who otherwise qualifies for licensure is entitled to be examined 25 
as provided in this section. 26 
 
 (b) An applicant qualifies to take the examination if the applicant: 27 
 
 (1) (i) Has graduated from an accredited college or university with a 28 
baccalaureate degree that includes: 29 
   	SENATE BILL 222 	3 
 
 
 1. A minimum of 30 semester credit hours or the equivalent 1 
quarter credit hours of chemical, physical, biological, and environmental sciences 2 
acceptable to the Board; 3 
 
 2. A course in mathematics; and 4 
 
 3. Laboratory coursework as required in regulations adopted 5 
by the Board; and 6 
 
 (ii) Has [obtained]: 7 
 
 1. OBTAINED 12 months of experience in an environmental 8 
health specialist–in–training program approved by the Board; or 9 
 
 2. COMPLETED AN APPRENTICESHIP APP ROVED BY THE 10 
BOARD; OR 11 
 
 (2) Has graduated from an accredited college or university with a master’s 12 
degree in public or environmental health science that includes: 13 
 
 (i) A minimum of 30 semester credit hours or 45 quarter credit 14 
hours of chemical, physical, biological, or environmental sciences acceptable to the Board 15 
and obtained at the baccalaureate or master’s level;  16 
 
 (ii) A course in mathematics;  17 
 
 (iii) 3 months of internship approved by the Board if not previously 18 
completed; and 19 
 
 (iv) Laboratory coursework as required in regulations adopted by the 20 
Board. 21 
 
 (c) (1) This subsection does not alter the requirement that an applicant 22 
demonstrate completion of a baccalaureate or master’s degree to qualify for examination. 23 
 
 (2) The Board may waive any of the specific course requirements for an 24 
applicant to qualify for examination in subsection (b) of this section if the Board determines 25 
that an applicant: 26 
 
 (i) Has obtained an equivalent number of credit hours in a course 27 
relevant to practice as an environmental health specialist; or 28 
 
 (ii) Has work experience that is an acceptable substitute for a course 29 
required in subsection (b) of this section. 30 
  4 	SENATE BILL 222  
 
 
 (d) The examination required by the Board shall include a written examination 1 
in the physical, biological, and environmental sciences that relates to practices and 2 
principles of environmental health. 3 
 
 (e) The Board shall [administer]:  4 
 
 (1) ADMINISTER examinations to applicants at least once a year, at the 5 
times and places that the Board determines; OR 6 
 
 (2) APPROVE AN EXAMINATIO N PROVIDER TO ADMINI STER THE 7 
EXAMINATION TO APPLI CANTS. 8 
 
 [(f) The Board shall notify each qualified applicant of the time and place of 9 
examination.] 10 
 
 [(g)] (F) [The] IF THE BOARD ADMINISTERS THE EXAMINATION , THE Board 11 
shall: 12 
 
 (1) NOTIFY EACH QUALIFIED APPLICANT OF THE TIM E AND PLACE OF 13 
THE EXAMINATION ; 14 
 
 [(1)] (2) Determine the subjects, scope, form, and passing score for 15 
examinations; and 16 
 
 [(2)] (3) Use professional examinations prepared by recognized 17 
examination agencies. 18 
 
 (G) IF A BOARD–APPROVED EXAMINATION PROVIDER ADMINISTERS THE 19 
EXAMINATION , THE BOARD SHALL NOTIFY EA CH QUALIFIED APPLICA NT OF THE 20 
REGISTRATION PROCEDURE FOR THE EX AMINATION. 21 
 
 (h) An applicant who fails an examination may retake the examination as 22 
provided in the rules and regulations adopted by the Board. 23 
 
 (i) The Board may waive any examination requirement under this section if the 24 
Board recognizes the applicant as being outstanding in the field of environmental health. 25 
 
21–305. 26 
 
 The Board shall adopt regulations that include: 27 
 
 (1) (i) The establishment of an environmental health  28 
specialist–in–training program for applicants to obtain the necessary experience to qualify 29 
to take the examination; and 30 
   	SENATE BILL 222 	5 
 
 
 (ii) A condition that a person may not participate in an 1 
environmental health specialist–in–training program for more than 3 years, unless granted 2 
an extension by the Board; [and] 3 
 
 (2) (i) The establishment of a seasonal environmental health 4 
specialist–in–training program for individuals to be temporarily employed as 5 
environmental health specialists; and 6 
 
 (ii) A condition that an individual may not participate in a seasonal 7 
environmental health specialist–in–training program for more than 6 months within a 8 
consecutive 12–month period; AND 9 
 
 (3) (I) THE REQUIREMENTS FOR BOARD APPROVAL OF AN 10 
APPRENTICESHIP ; AND  11 
 
 (II) THE MINIMUM AND MAXIM	UM DURATION OF AN 12 
APPRENTICESHIP . 13 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 14 
October 1, 2024. 15 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.