Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB448 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/13/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0448*  
  
SENATE BILL 448 
P1   	4lr2899 
    	CF HB 133 
By: Senator Muse Senators Muse, Augustine, Brooks, Carozza, Feldman, Gallion, 
Hester, Kagan, Lewis Young, M. Washington, and Ready 
Introduced and read first time: January 22, 2024 
Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments 
Read second time: February 27, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Commission to Study on African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission to Study African American Civil War 3 
Soldiers in Maryland to study requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs, in 4 
coordination with certain entities, to conduct a study on the history of the African 5 
American soldiers who fought for the Union Army and make certain 6 
recommendations regarding a memorial one or more memorials dedicated to African 7 
American Civil War soldiers; and generally relating to the Commission to Study a 8 
study on African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland. 9 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 
That: 11 
 
 (a) There is a Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in 12 
Maryland. 13 
 
 (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 14 
 
 (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 15 
the Senate; 16 
 
 (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of the 17 
House; and 18 
  2 	SENATE BILL 448  
 
 
 (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 1 
 
 (i) one representative from the State Archives; 2 
 
 (ii) one representative from the Department of Planning; 3 
 
 (iii) one representative from the Governor’s Commission on 4 
Maryland Military Monuments; 5 
 
 (iv) one representative from the Commission on African American 6 
History and Culture; 7 
 
 (v) one representative from Preservation Maryland, Inc.; and 8 
 
 (vi) one representative from the Heart of the Civil War Heritage 9 
Area, Inc. 10 
 
 (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Commission. 11 
 
 (d) The State Archives shall provide staff for the Commission. 12 
 
 (e) A member of the Commission: 13 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Commission; but 14 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 15 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 16 
 
 (f) The Commission The Department of Veterans Affairs, in coordination with 17 
the State Archives, the Department of Planning, the Governor’s Commission on Maryland 18 
Military Monuments, the Commission on African American History and Culture, 19 
Preservation Maryland, Inc., and the Heart of the Civil War Heritage Area, Inc., shall: 20 
 
 (1) study the history of African American Civil War soldiers who fought for 21 
the Union Army in Maryland, including muster rolls, locations of service, and all 22 
distinguished honors and recognitions awarded; and 23 
 
 (2) make findings and recommendations regarding the funding, design, 24 
construction, and location of an one or more appropriate memorial memorials dedicated to 25 
the African American Civil War soldiers in Maryland. 26 
 
 (g) (b) On or before December 1, 2024, the Commission Department of Veterans 27 
Affairs shall report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance 28 
with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 29 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 30 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 31   	SENATE BILL 448 	3 
 
 
Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 1 
further force and effect. 2 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.