Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB965 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0965*  
  
SENATE BILL 965 
D2   	4lr2205 
    	CF HB 1060 
By: Carroll County Senators 
Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2024 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to be equal 3 
to the salary of a Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest 4 
available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan 5 
beginning in a certain year; providing for a certain change in the annual salary of 6 
the Sheriff of Carroll County under certain circumstances; and generally relating to 7 
the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 10 
Section 2–320(a) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 15 
Section 2–320(b) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 
 
Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 21 
 
2–320. 22 
 
 (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 23 
  2 	SENATE BILL 965  
 
 
 (b) (1) The Sheriff of Carroll County shall receive an annual salary of[: 1 
 
 (1) $110,000 beginning December 3, 2019; 2 
 
 (2) $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022; and 3 
 
 (3)] $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023[, and thereafter]. 4 
 
 (2) BEGINNING IN 2026, THE SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE 5 
EQUAL TO THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE LIEUTENANT 6 
COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT COLONEL AT TH E 7 
DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY BEFORE THE D AY 8 
THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS THE NEW TERM OF OFFICE . 9 
 
 (3) BEGINNING IN 2030 AND EVERY 4 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE 10 
SALARY OF THE SHERIFF OF CARROLL COUNTY SHALL BE THE LESSER OF: 11 
 
 (I) THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE 12 
LIEUTENANT COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT 13 
COLONEL AT THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY 14 
BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A TERM OF OFFICE IN THAT YEAR; OR 15 
 
 (II) A 110% OF THE SALARY OF THE SHERIFF ON THE DAY 16 
BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A NEW TERM OF OFFICE . 17 
 
 (4) ANY CHANGE IN THE SAL ARY PAID UNDER THE DEPARTMENT OF 18 
STATE POLICE PAY PLAN DURIN G THE TERM OF OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF MAY NOT 19 
APPLY TO THE INCUMBE NT SHERIFF, BUT THE CHANGED RATE SHALL TAKE EFFECT 20 
AT THE BEGINNING OF THE NEXT FOLLOWING T ERM OF OFFICE. 21 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, in accordance with Article 22 
III, § 35 of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to 23 
the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a term of office 24 
beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act concerning the 25 
salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County shall take effect at the beginning of 26 
the next following term of office. This limitation does not apply to an individual appointed 27 
or elected after the effective date of this Act to fill out an unexpired term. 28 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 29 
October 1, 2024. 30