Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB970 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/12/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0970*  
  
SENATE BILL 970 
Q3, M3   	4lr2829 
    	CF HB 1214 
By: Senator Guzzone 
Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2024 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 26, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Energy Storage Systems – Income Tax Credit and Grant Program – Sunset 2 
Extension  3 
 
FOR the purpose of extending the termination date for a credit against the State income 4 
tax for the installation of certain energy storage systems; delaying the establishment 5 
of the Energy Storage System Grant Program in the Maryland Energy 6 
Administration; and generally relating to an income tax credit and grant program 7 
for energy storage systems.  8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 9 
 Article – Tax – General 10 
Section 10–719(g) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – State Government 15 
Section 9–2012(h) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18 
 (As enacted by Chapter 246 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2022) 19 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 20 
 Chapter 246 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2022 21 
Section 4, 5, and 6 22  2 	SENATE BILL 970  
 
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Tax – General 3 
10–719. 4 
 
 (g) The credit under this section may not be claimed for an energy storage system 5 
installed before January 1, 2018, or after December 31, [2024] 2026. 6 
 
Article – State Government 7 
 
9–2012. 8 
 
 (h) A grant under this section may not be awarded for an energy storage system 9 
installed before January 1, [2025] 2027. 10 
 
Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2022 11 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 12 
 
 (a) Section 1 of this Act shall be applicable to taxable years beginning after 13 
December 31, 2021, but before January 1, [2025] 2027.  14 
 
 (b) Section 3 of this Act shall be applicable to taxable years beginning after 15 
December 31, [2024] 2026.  16 
 
 SECTION 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall take 17 
effect July 1, [2024] 2026.  18 
 
 SECTION 6. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 3 of this Act shall take 19 
effect July 1, [2025] 2027.  20 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 21 
1, 2024. 22