Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB98 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/08/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0098*  
  
SENATE BILL 98 
C9   	4lr0721 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Senator Salling 
Requested: September 27, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Housing and Community Development – Food Desert Study 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to 3 
conduct a study and make recommendations on reducing the number of food deserts 4 
in the State; and generally relating to food deserts. 5 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 
That: 7 
 
 (a) In this section, “food desert” has the meaning stated in § 6–301 of the Housing 8 
and Community Development Article. 9 
 
 (b) The Department of Housing and Community Development shall:  10 
 
 (1) study food deserts in the State; and  11 
 
 (2) make recommendations to reduce the number of food deserts in the 12 
State. 13 
 
 (c) In conducting the study and making the recommendations, the Department 14 
shall: 15 
 
 (1) review the food desert projects funded under § 6–308.3 of the Housing 16 
and Community Development Article; 17 
 
 (2) analyze the location of food deserts in the State; and 18 
 
 (3) determine the impact of food deserts on the local population and 19 
economy. 20 
  2 	SENATE BILL 98  
 
 
 (d) On or before November 30, 2024, the Department shall submit a report of its 1 
findings and recommendations, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 2 
Article, to the Senate Committee on Education, Energy, and the Environment and the 3 
House Environment and Transportation Committee. 4 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 5 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 6 
Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 7 
further force and effect.  8