Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB98 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/27/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0098*  
  
SENATE BILL 98 
C9   	4lr0721 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Senator Salling 
Requested: September 27, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 17, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Housing and Community Development Interagency Food Desert 2 
Advisory Committee – Food Desert Study 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development 4 
Interagency Food Desert Advisory Committee to conduct a study and make 5 
recommendations on reducing the number of food deserts in the State; and generally 6 
relating to food deserts. 7 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 
That: 9 
 
 (a) In this section, “food desert” has the meaning stated in § 6–301 of the Housing 10 
and Community Development Article. 11 
 
 (b) The Department of Housing and Community Development Interagency Food 12 
Desert Advisory Committee shall:  13 
 
 (1) study food deserts in the State; and  14 
 
 (2) make recommendations: 15 
 
 (i) to reduce the number of food deserts in the State; and 16 
  2 	SENATE BILL 98  
 
 
 (ii) regarding available funding sources for fresh food financing 1 
initiatives and programs in the State. 2 
 
 (c) In conducting the study and making the recommendations, the Department 3 
Committee shall: 4 
 
 (1) review the food desert projects funded under § 6–308.3 of the Housing 5 
and Community Development Article; 6 
 
 (2) analyze the location of food deserts in the State; and 7 
 
 (3) determine the impact of food deserts on the local population and 8 
economy; 9 
 
 (4) develop strategies to attract grocery stores and supermarket retailers 10 
to food deserts, including identifying and analyzing anticipated costs; and 11 
 
 (5) review existing incentives and available financing programs 12 
throughout the State to encourage the establishment of grocery stores and supermarket 13 
retailers in identified food deserts. 14 
 
 (d) On or before November 30, 2024, the Department Committee shall submit a 15 
report of its findings and recommendations, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 16 
Government Article, to the Senate Committee on Education, Energy, and the Environment, 17 
the Senate Finance Committee, and the House Environment and Transpor tation 18 
Committee. 19 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 20 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 21 
Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 22 
further force and effect.  23 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.