Maryland 2025 2025 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1120 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/05/2025

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1120*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1120 
P1, L6   	5lr1937 
    	CF SB 497 
By: Delegates Vogel and Schmidt 
Introduced and read first time: February 5, 2025 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Information Technology – Maryland OneStop – Required State, 2 
County, and Municipal Information 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Information Technology, on or before a 4 
certain date and periodically thereafter, to update certain information available on 5 
the Maryland OneStop portal; requiring, beginning on a certain date, each county 6 
and municipal corporation, in coordination with the Department, to make available 7 
on Maryland OneStop certain information; requiring each county and municipal 8 
corporation to periodically update certain information available on Maryland 9 
OneStop; and generally relating to State, county, and municipal information 10 
available on Maryland OneStop. 11 
 
BY adding to 12 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 13 
Section 3.5–319 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 16 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 19 
 
3.5–319. 20 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION , “MARYLAND ONESTOP” MEANS THE 21 
INTERNET–BASED STATEWIDE LICENSING P ORTAL MANAGED BY THE DEPARTMENT 22 
OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY . 23 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1120  
 
 
 (B) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2025, AND EVERY 2 MONTHS 1 
THEREAFTER , IN COORDINATION WITH EACH UNIT OF STATE GOVERNMENT , THE 2 
DEPARTMENT SHALL UPDATE AS NEEDED ALL LICENSES, FORMS, CERTIFICATES, 3 
PERMITS, APPLICATIONS, AND REGISTRATIONS AV AILABLE ON MARYLAND 4 
ONESTOP. 5 
 
 (C) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2026, IN COORDINATION WITH THE 6 
DEPARTMENT , EACH COUNTY AND MUNI CIPAL CORPORATION SH ALL MAKE 7 
AVAILABLE ON MARYLAND ONESTOP ALL COUNTY OR MUNICI PAL LICENSES , 8 
FORMS, CERTIFICATES, PERMITS, APPLICATIONS, AND REGISTRATIONS . 9 
 
 (2) ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 1, 2026, AND EVERY 2 MONTHS 10 
THEREAFTER , EACH COUNTY AND MUNI CIPAL CORPORATION SHALL UPDATE AS 11 
NEEDED ALL COUNTY OR MUNICI PAL LICENSES, FORMS, CERTIFICATES, PERMITS, 12 
APPLICATIONS, AND REGISTRATIONS AV AILABLE ON MARYLAND ONESTOP. 13 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 14 
October 1, 2025. 15