EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *sb0497* SENATE BILL 497 P1, L6 5lr3274 CF 5lr1937 By: Senator Ellis Introduced and read first time: January 23, 2025 Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Department of Information Technology – Maryland OneStop – Required State, 2 County, and Municipal Information 3 FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Information Technology, on or before a 4 certain date and periodically thereafter, to update certain information available on 5 the Maryland OneStop portal; requiring, beginning on a certain date, each county 6 and municipal corporation, in coordination with the Department, to make available 7 on Maryland OneStop certain information; requiring each county and municipal 8 corporation to periodically update certain information available on Maryland 9 OneStop; and generally relating to State, county, and municipal information 10 available on Maryland OneStop. 11 BY adding to 12 Article – State Finance and Procurement 13 Section 3.5–319 14 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 16 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 Article – State Finance and Procurement 19 3.5–319. 20 (A) IN THIS SECTION , “MARYLAND ONESTOP” MEANS THE 21 INTERNET–BASED STATEWIDE LICE NSING PORTAL MANAGED BY THE DEPARTMENT 22 OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY . 23 2 SENATE BILL 497 (B) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2025, AND EVERY 2 MONTHS 1 THEREAFTER , IN COORDINATION WITH EACH UNIT OF STATE GOVERNMENT , THE 2 DEPARTMENT SHALL UPDA TE AS NEEDED ALL LIC ENSES, FORMS, CERTIFICATES, 3 PERMITS, APPLICATIONS, AND REGIS TRATIONS AVAILABLE O N MARYLAND 4 ONESTOP. 5 (C) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2026, IN COORDINATION WITH THE 6 DEPARTMENT , EACH COUNTY AND MUNI CIPAL CORPORATION SH ALL MAKE 7 AVAILABLE ON MARYLAND ONESTOP ALL COUNTY OR MU NICIPAL LICENSES , 8 FORMS, CERTIFICATES, PERMITS, APPLICATIONS, AND REGISTRATIONS . 9 (2) ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 1, 2026, AND EVERY 2 MONTHS 10 THEREAFTER , EACH COUNTY AND MUNI CIPAL CORPORATION SH ALL UPDATE AS 11 NEEDED ALL COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL LICENSES , FORMS, CERTIFICATES, PERMITS, 12 APPLICATIONS, AND REGISTRAT IONS AVAILABLE ON MARYLAND ONESTOP. 13 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 14 October 1, 2025. 15