EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *sb0508* SENATE BILL 508 J5, J1, J4 5lr3070 CF HB 381 By: Senator Henson Introduced and read first time: January 23, 2025 Assigned to: Finance A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Required 2 Coverage for Aesthetic Services and Restorative Care for Victims of Domestic 3 Violence 4 (Healing Our Scars Act) 5 FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and certain 6 insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, and 7 managed care organizations to provide coverage to victims of domestic violence for 8 certain aesthetic services and restorative care; and generally relating to coverage for 9 aesthetic services and restorative care for victims of domestic violence by the 10 Maryland Medical Assistance Program and health insurance carriers. 11 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 Article – Family Law 13 Section 4–501(a) and (d) and 4–513 14 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 16 BY adding to 17 Article – Health – General 18 Section 15–102.3(m) and 15–103(a)(2)(xxv) 19 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 21 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 22 Article – Health – General 23 Section 15–103(a)(1) 24 Annotated Code of Maryland 25 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 26 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 27 2 SENATE BILL 508 Article – Health – General 1 Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxiii) and (xxiv) 2 Annotated Code of Maryland 3 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 4 BY adding to 5 Article – Insurance 6 Section 15–861 7 Annotated Code of Maryland 8 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 9 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 11 Article – Family Law 12 4–501. 13 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 14 (d) “Cohabitant” means a person who has had a sexual relationship with the 15 respondent and resided with the respondent in the home for a period of at least 90 days 16 within 1 year before the filing of the petition. 17 4–513. 18 In this Part III of this subtitle, “victim of domestic violence” means an individual 19 who has received deliberate, severe, and demonstrable physical injury, or is in fear of 20 imminent deliberate, severe, and demonstrable physical injury from a current or former 21 spouse, or a current or former cohabitant, as defined in § 4–501 of this subtitle. 22 Article – Health – General 23 15–102.3. 24 (M) THE PROVISIONS OF § 15–861 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE APPLY TO 25 MANAGED CARE ORGANIZ ATIONS IN THE SAME M ANNER THEY APPLY TO CARRIERS. 26 15–103. 27 (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 28 Program. 29 (2) The Program: 30 SENATE BILL 508 3 (xxiii) Beginning on July 1, 2025, shall provide, subject to the 1 limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, coverage for biomarker 2 testing in accordance with § 15–859 of the Insurance Article; [and] 3 (xxiv) Beginning on January 1, 2025, shall provide coverage for 4 prostheses in accordance with § 15–844 of the Insurance Article; AND 5 (XXV) BEGINNING ON JANUARY 1, 2026, SHALL PROVIDE 6 COVERAGE TO VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FOR AESTHETIC SERVIC ES AND 7 RESTORATIVE CARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 15–861 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE. 8 Article – Insurance 9 15–861. 10 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “VICTIM OF DOMESTIC V IOLENCE” HAS THE MEANING 11 STATED IN § 4–513 OF THE FAMILY LAW ARTICLE. 12 (B) THIS SECTION APPLIES TO: 13 (1) INSURERS AND NONPROFIT HEALTH SERVICE PLANS THAT 14 PROVIDE HOSPITAL , MEDICAL, OR SURGICAL BENEFITS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GR OUPS 15 ON AN EXPENSE –INCURRED BASIS UNDER HEALTH INSURANCE POL ICIES OR 16 CONTRACTS THAT ARE I SSUED OR DELIVERED I N THE STATE; AND 17 (2) HEALTH MA INTENANCE ORGANIZATI ONS THAT PROVIDE 18 HOSPITAL, MEDICAL, OR SURGICAL BENEFITS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GR OUPS UNDER 19 CONTRACTS THAT ARE I SSUED OR DELIVERED I N THE STATE. 20 (C) AN ENTITY SUBJECT TO THIS SECTION SHALL P ROVIDE COVERAGE TO 21 VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FOR AESTHETIC SERVIC ES AND RESTORATIVE 22 CARE: 23 (1) PROVIDED FOR THE TRE ATMENT OF PHYSICAL I NJURIES CAUSED 24 BY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ; AND 25 (2) DETERMINED TO BE MED ICALLY NECESSARY BY A PHYSICIAN WHO 26 IS LICENSED TO PRACT ICE MEDICINE UNDER T HE HEALTH OCCUPATIONS ARTICLE. 27 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall apply to all 28 policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or 29 after January 1, 2026. 30 4 SENATE BILL 508 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1 January 1, 2026. 2