Maryland 2025 2025 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB84 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/11/2025

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0084*  
  
SENATE BILL 84 
E5   	5lr1053 
SB 860/24 – JPR 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 22 
By: Senator Corderman 
Requested: October 2, 2024 
Introduced and read first time: January 8, 2025 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 2, 2025 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services – Study on Location of 2 
Individuals Prior to and Following Incarceration 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services 4 
to conduct a certain study examining certain data regarding an individual’s 5 
residence prior to incarceration and on release from a State correctional facility; and 6 
generally relating to State correctional facilities. 7 
 
BY adding to 8 
 Article – Correctional Services 9 
Section 9–618 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – Correctional Services 15 
 
9–618. 16 
 
 (A) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2026, AND EACH OCTOBER 1 THEREAFTER , 17 
THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COND UCT A STUDY ON THE L OCATION OF INDIVIDUA LS 18  2 	SENATE BILL 84  
 
 
BEFORE AND FOLLOWING IN CARCERATION IN A STATE CORRECTIONAL FA CILITY 1 
AND REPORT THE RESUL TS OF THE STUDY TO T HE SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS 2 
COMMITTEE, THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE, THE HOUSE 3 
JUDICIARY COMMITTEE, AND THE HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE, IN 4 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE. 5 
 
 (B) THE STUDY SHALL INCLU DE: 6 
 
 (1) DATA ON THE COUNTY O F RESIDENCE OF EACH INDIVIDUAL 7 
RELEASED DURING THE PREVIOUS YEAR , AS REPORTED BY THE I NDIVIDUAL ON 8 
INTAKE TO THE FACILI TY; 9 
 
 (2) DATA ON THE COUNTY O F RELEASE FOLLOWING INCARCERATION ; 10 
 
 (3) FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO WERE TRANSFERRED FRO M ONE STATE 11 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y TO ANOTHER PRIOR T O RELEASE, THE NUMBER OF DAYS 12 
THAT THE TRANSFER OC CURRED BEFORE RELEAS E; AND 13 
 
 (4) A COMPARISON OF : 14 
 
 (I) THE NUMBER OF INDIVI DUALS RELEASED FROM A STATE 15 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y INTO THE SAME COUN TY IN WHICH THEY RES IDED PRIOR 16 
TO INCARCERATION ; 17 
 
 (II) THE NUMBER OF INDIVI DUALS RELEASED FROM A STATE 18 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y INTO THE SAME COUN TY IN WHICH CON VICTION 19 
OCCURRED; AND 20 
 
 (III) THE NUMBER OF INDIVI DUALS RELEASED FROM A STATE 21 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y INTO THE COUNTY IN WHICH THEY WERE INCA RCERATED 22 
AT THE TIME OF RELEA SE. 23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 24 
October 1, 2025. 25