Maryland 2025 2025 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB86 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 01/28/2025

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0086*  
  
SENATE BILL 86 
C7   	5lr0641 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Senator Waldstreicher 
Requested: July 24, 2024 
Introduced and read first time: January 8, 2025 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: January 24, 2025 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Online Sports Wagering – Problem Gambling Resources – Required Contact 2 
Information 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring a mobile sports wagering licensee to publish certain contact 4 
information for the Maryland Center of Excellence on Problem Gambling on the 5 
homepage landing page of its online sports wagering website and mobile application; 6 
and generally relating to online sports wagering. 7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 8 
 Article – State Government 9 
Section 9–1E–11(b) 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – State Government 15 
 
9–1E–11. 16 
 
 (b) (1) For online sports wagering, a mobile sports wagering licensee shall: 17 
 
 [(1)] (I) have in place technical and operational measures to prevent 18  2 	SENATE BILL 86  
 
 
access by individuals who are underage or physically located outside the State, including: 1 
 
 [(i)] 1. age verification procedures, which may require the use of 2 
a reputable independent third party that is in the business of verifying an individual’s 3 
personally identifiable information; and 4 
 
 [(ii)] 2. the use of geolocation technology to verify a bettor’s 5 
geographic location; 6 
 
 [(2)] (II) include on its online sports wagering website a description of the 7 
possible repercussions for an underage or out–of–state bettor, which may include 8 
immediate stoppage of play, account closure, and forfeiture and confiscation of winnings; 9 
[and] 10 
 
 [(3)] (III) PUBLISH PROMINENTLY ON THE HOMEPAGE LANDING PAGE 11 
OF ITS ONLINE SPORTS WAGERING WEBSITE AND MOBILE APPLICATION THE 12 
STATEMENT “IF YOU OR SOMEONE YOU KNOW HAS A GAMBLING PROBLEM, CLICK 13 
HERE OR CALL 1–800–GAMBLER FOR HELP”, OR OTHER COMPARABLE LANGUAGE 14 
APPROVED BY THE COMMISSION; AND 15 
 
 (IV) establish procedures to prevent prohibited individuals from 16 
wagering on sporting events. 17 
 
 (2) THE WORDS “CLICK HERE” REQUIRED TO BE PUBLI SHED UNDER 18 
PARAGRAPH (1)(III) OF THIS SUBSECTION S HALL CONTAIN A LINK TO THE WEBSITE 19 
OF THE MARYLAND CENTER OF EXCELLENCE ON PROBLEM GAMBLING. 20 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED , That this Act shall take effect 21 
October 1, 2025.  22 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.