Maine 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Maine House Bill LD1155 Introduced / Bill

                    Printed on recycled paper
131st MAINE LEGISLATURE
FIRST REGULAR SESSION-2023
Legislative Document	No. 1155H.P. 727House of Representatives, March 14, 2023
An Act to Address Legislative Salaries
Reference to the Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
ROBERT B. HUNT
Clerk
Presented by Representative WOODSOME of Waterboro.
Cosponsored by Representatives: BRIDGEO of Augusta, MOONEN of Portland, OSHER of 
Orono, TERRY of Gorham, Senator BRENNER of Cumberland and
Representatives: FREDERICKS of Sanford, LANIGAN of Sanford, SAMPSON of Alfred. Page 1 - 131LR1149(01)
1
2 as amended by PL 2023, c. 2, §2, is further amended 
3 to read:
4 Each member of the Senate and House of Representatives, beginning with the first 
5 Wednesday of December 2000 and thereafter until the day before the first Wednesday of 
6 December 2024, is entitled to $10,815 in the first year and $7,725 in the 2nd year of each 
7 biennium, except that if a Legislator who is a recipient of retirement benefits from the 
8 federal Social Security Administration files a written request with the Executive Director 
9 of the Legislative Council within one week after the biennium commences, the Legislator 
10 is entitled to $9,270 in each year of the biennium.  Beginning with the first Wednesday of 
11 December 2024, each member of the Senate and House of Representatives is entitled to 
12 $25,000 in the first year and $20,000 in the 2nd year of each biennium, except that if a 
13 Legislator who is a recipient of retirement benefits from the federal Social Security 
14 Administration files a written request with the Executive Director of the Legislative 
15 Council within one week after the biennium commences, the Legislator is entitled to 
16 $22,500 in each year of the biennium. Each member of the Senate and the House of 
17 Representatives must receive a cost-of-living adjustment in annual legislative salary, 
18 except that the percentage increase may not exceed 5% in any year, and except that the 
19 percentage increase may not exceed 3% beginning with the fiscal year ending June 30, 
20 2014.  Beginning December 1, 2001, the salary for each legislative session must be adjusted 
21 each December 1st by the percentage change in the Consumer Price Index for the most 
22 recently concluded fiscal year; except that a member of the Senate or the House of 
23 Representatives may not receive a cost-of-living adjustment in annual legislative salary for 
24 the Second Regular Session of the 124th Legislature, and except that a member of the 
25 Senate or the House of Representatives may not receive a cost-of-living adjustment in 
26 annual legislative salary for the Second Regular Session of the 125th Legislature and the 
27 First Regular Session and the Second Regular Session of the 126th Legislature, and any 
28 percentage change in the Consumer Price Index for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2011, 
29 June 30, 2012 and June 30, 2013 may not be applied to the base salary.  In addition, each 
30 Legislator is entitled to be paid mileage for travel at each legislative session to and from 
31 that Legislator's place of abode at a rate of 55¢ per mile or the federal standard mileage 
32 rate, whichever is lower, the mileage to be determined by the most reasonable direct route, 
33 except that Legislators may be reimbursed for tolls paid for travel on the Maine Turnpike 
34 as long as they have a receipt for payment of the tolls, such tolls to be reimbursed when 
35 Legislators use the Maine Turnpike in traveling to and from sessions of the Legislature or 
36 in performance of duly authorized committee assignments.  Each Legislator is entitled to 
37 mileage on the first day of the session, and those amounts of salary and expenses at such 
38 times as the Legislature may determine during the session, and the balance at the end of the 
39 session.
40
41 This bill, starting with the 132nd Legislature, increases the salary of Legislators to 
42 $25,000 in the first year of each biennium and to $20,000 in the 2nd year of each biennium.
41
42