Maine 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Maine House Bill LD1155 Chaptered / Bill

                    Page 1 - 131LR1149(03)
STATE OF MAINE
_____
IN THE YEAR OF OUR LORD
TWO THOUSAND TWENTY-THREE
_____
H.P. 727 - L.D. 1155
An Act to Address Legislative Salaries
Be it enacted by the People of the State of Maine as follows:
Sec. 1.  3 MRSA §2, first ¶, as amended by PL 2023, c. 2, §2, is further amended 
to read:
Each member of the Senate and House of Representatives, beginning with the first 
Wednesday of December 2000 and thereafter until the day before the first Wednesday of 
December 2024, is entitled to $10,815 in the first year and $7,725 in the 2nd year of each 
biennium, except that if a Legislator who is a recipient of retirement benefits from the 
federal Social Security Administration files a written request with the Executive Director 
of the Legislative Council within one week after the biennium commences, the Legislator 
is entitled to $9,270 in each year of the biennium.  Beginning with the first Wednesday of 
December 2024, each member of the Senate and House of Representatives is entitled to 
$25,000 in the first year and $20,000 in the 2nd year of each biennium, except that if a 
Legislator who is a recipient of retirement benefits from the federal Social Security 
Administration files a written request with the Executive Director of the Legislative 
Council within one week after the biennium commences, the Legislator is entitled to 
$22,500 in each year of the biennium. Each member of the Senate and the House of 
Representatives must receive a cost-of-living adjustment in annual legislative salary, 
except that the percentage increase may not exceed 5% in any year, and except that the 
percentage increase may not exceed 3% beginning with the fiscal year ending June 30, 
2014.  Beginning December 1, 2001, the salary for each legislative session must be adjusted 
each December 1st by the percentage change in the Consumer Price Index for the most 
recently concluded fiscal year; except that a member of the Senate or the House of 
Representatives may not receive a cost-of-living adjustment in annual legislative salary for 
the Second Regular Session of the 124th Legislature, and except that a member of the 
Senate or the House of Representatives may not receive a cost-of-living adjustment in 
annual legislative salary for the Second Regular Session of the 125th Legislature and the 
First Regular Session and the Second Regular Session of the 126th Legislature, and any 
percentage change in the Consumer Price Index for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2011, 
June 30, 2012 and June 30, 2013 may not be applied to the base salary.  In addition, each 
Legislator is entitled to be paid mileage for travel at each legislative session to and from 
APPROVED
JULY 26, 2023
BY GOVERNOR
CHAPTER
446
PUBLIC LAW Page 2 - 131LR1149(03)
that Legislator's place of abode at a rate of 55¢ per mile or the federal standard mileage 
rate, whichever is lower, the mileage to be determined by the most reasonable direct route, 
except that Legislators may be reimbursed for tolls paid for travel on the Maine Turnpike 
as long as they have a receipt for payment of the tolls, such tolls to be reimbursed when 
Legislators use the Maine Turnpike in traveling to and from sessions of the Legislature or 
in performance of duly authorized committee assignments.  Each Legislator is entitled to 
mileage on the first day of the session, and those amounts of salary and expenses at such 
times as the Legislature may determine during the session, and the balance at the end of the 
session.
Sec. 2. Appropriations and allocations. The following appropriations and 
allocations are made.
LEGISLATURE
Legislature 0081
Initiative: Provides funding for the costs of increasing Legislator salaries starting with the 
132nd Legislature to $25,000 in the first year of each biennium and to $20,000 in the 2nd 
year of each biennium.
GENERAL FUND
2023-24 2024-25Personal Services	$0 $1,660,000
 
____________________
GENERAL FUND TOTAL
$0 $1,660,000