Maine 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Maine Senate Bill LD1660 Chaptered / Bill

                    Page 1 - 131LR1000(03)
STATE OF MAINE
_____
IN THE YEAR OF OUR LORD
TWO THOUSAND TWENTY-FOUR
_____
S.P. 665 - L.D. 1660
An Act to Ensure Proper Regulation of Chemical Plastic Processing
Be it enacted by the People of the State of Maine as follows:
Sec. 1.  38 MRSA §1303-C, sub-§2-C is enacted to read:
2-C. Chemical plastic processing. 
processing of plastic waste using chemical or molecular methods into basic raw materials, 
feedstock chemicals, fuel for combustion, waxes or lubricants. "Chemical plastic 
processing" does not include plastic-to-plastic recycling.
Sec. 2.  38 MRSA §1303-C, sub-§19-D is enacted to read:
19-D.  Plastic. 
through a chemical reaction to create a polymer chain, including material derived from 
either petroleum or a biologically based polymer, such as corn or other plant sources.
Sec. 3.  38 MRSA §1303-C, sub-§19-E is enacted to read:
19-E. Plastic-to-plastic recycling. 
production from plastic waste of new plastic material, designed to be used as industrial 
feedstock in place of raw material for the manufacture of new products made of or 
containing plastic, by processing the plastic waste in a manner that, in producing the new 
plastic material:
A.  Retains the chemical structure of the plastic waste; or
B.  Deconstructs the plastic waste into molecular precursors or intermediates and then 
reconstitutes the precursors or intermediates into plastic polymers using methods that 
result exclusively in the production of new plastic material.
"Plastic-to-plastic recycling" does not include chemical plastic processing.
Sec. 4.  38 MRSA §1303-C, sub-§32-A, as enacted by PL 2007, c. 583, §1, is 
amended to read:
32-A.  Solid waste processing facility. 
area, structure, equipment, machine, device, system or combination thereof, other than an 
incineration facility, that is operated to reduce the volume or change the chemical or 
LAW WITHOUT
GOVERNOR'S
SIGNATURE
 
MARCH 5, 2024
CHAPTER
517
PUBLIC LAW Page 2 - 131LR1000(03)
physical characteristics of solid waste.  "Solid waste processing facility" includes but is not 
limited to a facility that processes plastic waste through chemical plastic processing and a 
facility that employs shredding, baling, mechanical and magnetic separation or composting 
or other stabilization technique to reduce or otherwise change the nature of solid waste.
Sec. 5.  38 MRSA §1310-N, sub-§5-A, ¶B, as amended by PL 2023, c. 283, §1, is 
further amended by amending subparagraph (2) to read:
(2)  A solid waste processing facility that generates residue requiring disposal shall 
recycle or process into fuel for combustion through methods other than chemical 
plastic processing all waste accepted at the facility to the maximum extent 
practicable, but in no case at a rate less than 50%.  For purposes of this subsection, 
"recycle" includes does not include chemical plastic processing and does include, 
but is not limited to, plastic-to-plastic recycling; the reuse of waste generated 
within the State as defined in section 1303‑C, subsection 40‑A, paragraph C; the 
recovery of metals from waste; the use of waste or waste-derived product as 
material substitutes in construction; and the use of waste as boiler fuel substitutes.
At least 50% of the waste that a solid waste processing facility characterizes as 
recycled under this subparagraph must have been reused or recycled by the facility 
through methods other than placement of the waste in a solid waste landfill, except 
that a solid waste processing facility that was in operation during calendar year 
2018, that accepts exclusively construction and demolition debris and that accepted 
more than 200,000 tons of such debris in calendar year 2018 shall:
(a)  Reuse or recycle at least 15% of such debris through methods other than 
placement in a solid waste landfill by July 1, 2024;
(b)  Reuse or recycle at least 20% of such debris through methods other than 
placement in a solid waste landfill by July 1, 2025;
(c)  Reuse or recycle at least 30% of such debris through methods other than 
placement in a solid waste landfill by July 1, 2026;
(d)  Reuse or recycle at least 40% of such debris through methods other than 
placement in a solid waste landfill by July 1, 2027; and
(e)  Reuse or recycle at least 50% of such debris through methods other than 
placement in a solid waste landfill by July 1, 2028.
Sec. 6.  38 MRSA §1310-N, sub-§5-A, , is 
further amended by enacting at the end a new first blocked paragraph to read:
For the purposes of this subsection, a solid waste processing facility that processes plastic 
waste through chemical plastic processing is deemed to generate residue requiring disposal.
Sec. 7.  38 MRSA §1310-Y, first ¶, as amended by PL 2001, c. 575, §1, is further 
amended to read:
An owner or operator of a solid waste processing facility that processes plastic waste 
through chemical plastic processing that is licensed under section 1310-N or of a solid 
waste disposal facility that is licensed under section 1310‑N shall provide the department 
assurance of its financial ability to satisfy the estimated cost of corrective action for known 
releases from the facility and its financial capacity to satisfy the estimated cost of closure 
and postclosure care and maintenance at the facility for a period of at least 30 years after  Page 3 - 131LR1000(03)
closure.  The board may adopt rules that increase or decrease that postclosure care period, 
as long as those rules are consistent with applicable federal rules.  The department may 
consider the use of more than one acceptable form of financial assurance per facility to 
satisfy the financial assurance requirement of this section. This section applies to all 
privately owned solid waste disposal facilities licensed by the department, including 
facilities licensed by the department before June 16, 1993, and to all solid waste processing 
facilities that process plastic waste through chemical plastic processing.  This section does 
not apply to a municipally owned or operated solid waste disposal facility that accepts 
exclusively special waste, construction and demolition debris, land-clearing debris or any 
combination of those types of waste or to a municipally owned or operated solid waste 
disposal facility licensed before June 16, 1993.
Sec. 8.  38 MRSA §1310-Y, sub-§2, as enacted by PL 1993, c. 378, §9, is amended 
to read:
2.  Report. 
plastic waste through chemical plastic processing or of a solid waste disposal facility shall 
annually prepare a report containing a sworn statement providing the year-end balance of 
any escrow, trust or reserve account established under this section.  That report must be 
submitted to the commissioner by March 31st of each year or such other date as the 
commissioner may designate.