Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4295 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 09/20/2023

                    Act No. 122 
Public Acts of 2023 
Approved by the Governor 
September 18, 2023 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
September 19, 2023 
EFFECTIVE DATE: September 19, 2023 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2023 
Introduced by Reps. Farhat, Hope, Brixie, Young, Hill, Grant, Breen, Byrnes, Hoskins, Morgan, 
Skaggs, Paiz, Brabec and McKinney 
 
ENROLLED HOUSE BILL No. 4295 
AN ACT to amend 1897 PA 180, entitled “An act to provide for the issuance of marriage licenses and 
certificates without publicity in certain cases; and to provide criminal and civil penalties for violation of this act,” 
by amending section 1 (MCL 551.201), as amended by 1983 PA 199. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
Sec. 1. (1) When an individual desires to keep the exact date of his or her marriage to an individual of the 
opposite sex a secret, the probate judge may issue, without publicity, a marriage license to any individual making 
application, under oath, if there is good reason expressed in the application and determined to be sufficient by the 
probate judge. 
(2) The probate judge may authorize an order nunc pro tunc regarding the date to appear on the marriage 
license. 
 
Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless all of the following bills of the 
102nd Legislature are enacted into law: 
(a) Senate Bill No. 209. 
(b) Senate Bill No. 212. 
(c) House Bill No. 4294. 
(d) House Bill No. 4296. 
 
 
 
(60)   
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
This act is ordered to take immediate effect. 
 
Secretary of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
 
 
Compiler's note: The bills referred to in enacting section 1 were enacted into law as follows: 
 
Senate Bill No. 209 was filed with the Secretary of State July 12, 2023, and became 2023 PA 71, Eff. Sept. 19, 2023. 
 
Senate Bill No. 212 was filed with the Secretary of State July 12, 2023, and became 2023 PA 72, Imd. Eff. July 12, 
2023. 
 
House Bill No. 4294 was filed with the Secretary of State September 19, 2023, and became 2023 PA 121, Imd. Eff. 
Sept. 19, 2023. 
 
House Bill No. 4296 was filed with the Secretary of State September 19, 2023, and became 2023 PA 123, Imd. Eff. 
Sept. 19, 2023. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
2